EP3212794 - POLYNUCLEOTIDE AGENTS TARGETING SERPINC1 (AT3) AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genzyme Corporation 50 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2019/07] |
Former [2017/36] | For all designated states Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 300 Third Street, 3rd Floor Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HINKLE, Gregory 300 Third Street 3rd Floor Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2017/36] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2017/36] | Application number, filing date | 15795074.2 | 28.10.2015 | [2017/36] | WO2015US57717 | Priority number, date | US201462072686P | 30.10.2014 Original published format: US 201462072686 P | [2017/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016069694 | Date: | 06.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3212794 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3212794 | Date: | 07.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, A61K31/7088, C07H21/02 | [2017/36] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
C12N2310/11 (EP,US);
C12N2310/315 (EP,US);
C12N2310/3231 (EP,US);
C12N2310/3341 (EP,US);
C12N2310/341 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C12N2310/321, C12N2310/3521 (US,EP);
C12N2310/321, C12N2310/3525 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/36] | Extension states | BA | 30.03.2017 | ME | 30.03.2017 | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYNUKLEOTIDWIRKSTOFFE MIT ABZIELUNG AUF SERPINC1 (AT3) UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2017/36] | English: | POLYNUCLEOTIDE AGENTS TARGETING SERPINC1 (AT3) AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2017/36] | French: | AGENTS POLYNUCLÉOTIDIQUES CIBLANT SERPINC 1 (AT3) ET LEURS MÉTHODES D'UTILISATION | [2017/36] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/36] | 30.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 24.01.2018 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 29.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M04) [2018/33] | 13.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21158656.5 / EP3904519 | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/11] | Request for further processing for: | 29.03.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 29.03.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.04.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.10.2015 | AL | 07.04.2021 | AT | 07.04.2021 | CY | 07.04.2021 | CZ | 07.04.2021 | DK | 07.04.2021 | EE | 07.04.2021 | ES | 07.04.2021 | FI | 07.04.2021 | HR | 07.04.2021 | IT | 07.04.2021 | LT | 07.04.2021 | LV | 07.04.2021 | MC | 07.04.2021 | NL | 07.04.2021 | PL | 07.04.2021 | RO | 07.04.2021 | RS | 07.04.2021 | SE | 07.04.2021 | SI | 07.04.2021 | SK | 07.04.2021 | SM | 07.04.2021 | BG | 07.07.2021 | NO | 07.07.2021 | GR | 08.07.2021 | IS | 07.08.2021 | PT | 09.08.2021 | IE | 28.10.2021 | LU | 28.10.2021 | BE | 31.10.2021 | CH | 31.10.2021 | LI | 31.10.2021 | [2023/30] |
Former [2023/27] | HU | 28.10.2015 | |
AL | 07.04.2021 | ||
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
IE | 28.10.2021 | ||
LU | 28.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
IE | 28.10.2021 | ||
LU | 28.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
LU | 28.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
LU | 28.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
LU | 28.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2009073809 (ALNYLAM PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [A] 38-41* the whole document *; | [A]WO2010144740 (ALNYLAM PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [A] 48-50 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2013159108 (ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [Y] 1-74 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2013163430 (ALNYLAM PHARMACEUTICALS [US], et al) [Y] 1-74 * the whole document *; | [A] - Akin Akinc, "ALN-AT3: An Investigational RNAi Therapeutic Targeting Antithrombin for the Treatment of Hemophilia", (20140515), URL: http://www.alnylam.com/web/assets/ALNY-HemophiliaProgram-WFH-May2014.pdf, (20150805), XP055206418 [A] 1-74 * the whole document * | [A] - H. SAFDAR ET AL, "Acute and severe coagulopathy in adult mice following silencing of hepatic antithrombin and protein C production", BLOOD, (20130523), vol. 121, no. 21, doi:10.1182/blood-2012-11-465674, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 4413 - 4416, XP055206525 [A] 1-74 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2012-11-465674 | Examination | WO2010144740 | WO2013159108 | WO2013163430 | - Akin Akinc, "ALN‐AT3: An Investigational RNAi Therapeutic Targeting Antithrombin for the Treatment of Hemophilia", (20140101), URL: http://www.alnylam.com/web/assets/ALNY-HemophiliaProgram-WFH-May2014.pdf, (20150805), XP055206418 | by applicant | US513030 | US564562 | US3687808 | US4469863 | US4476301 | US4587044 | US4605735 | US4667025 | US4683202 | WO8804924 | US4762779 | US4789737 | US4824941 | US4828979 | US4835263 | US4837028 | US4845205 | US4876335 | US4897355 | US4904582 | US4948882 | US4958013 | US4981957 | US5023243 | US5032401 | US5034506 | WO9116024 | US5082830 | US5109124 | US5112963 | US5118800 | US5118802 | US5134066 | US5138045 | US5166315 | US5171678 | US5175273 | US5177195 | US5185444 | US5188897 | US5214134 | US5214136 | US5216141 | US5218105 | US5235033 | US5245022 | US5254469 | US5258506 | US5262536 | US5264423 | US5264564 | WO9324640 | US5272250 | US5276019 | WO9400569 | US5278302 | US5283185 | WO9402595 | US5286717 | US5292873 | US5317098 | US5319080 | US5321131 | US5359044 | US5367066 | US5371241 | US5391723 | US5393878 | US5399676 | US5405939 | US5405938 | US5414077 | US5416203 | US5432272 | US5434257 | US5446137 | US5445934 | US5451463 | US5453496 | US5455233 | US5457187 | US5459255 | US5466677 | US5466786 | US5470967 | US5476925 | US5484908 | US5486603 | US5489677 | US5502177 | US5510475 | US5512439 | US5512667 | US5514785 | US5519126 | US5519134 | US5525711 | US5525465 | US5536821 | US5539082 | US5541316 | US5541307 | US5541313 | US5543152 | US5545730 | US5550111 | US5552540 | US5552538 | US5561225 | US5563253 | US5565552 | US5567811 | US5567810 | US5571799 | US5574142 | US5576427 | US5578717 | US5578718 | WO9637194 | US5580731 | US5585481 | WO9640964 | US5587361 | US5587469 | US5587371 | US5591722 | US5591584 | US5594121 | US5596086 | US5596091 | US5595726 | US5597909 | US5597696 | US5599923 | US5599928 | US5602240 | US5608046 | US5607677 | US5610289 | US5610300 | US5614617 | US5618704 | WO9713499 | US5623070 | US5625050 | US5627053 | US5633360 | US5639873 | US5646265 | US5658873 | WO9730731 | US5663312 | US5670633 | US5677437 | US5677439 | US5677195 | US5681941 | US5688941 | US5698685 | US5700920 | US5705188 | US5714331 | US5719262 | US5744305 | US5750692 | US5770722 | WO9839359 | US5854033 | US5874219 | WO9914226 | US5976567 | US5981501 | US6015886 | WO0003683 | US6028188 | US6124445 | US6147200 | US6160109 | US6166197 | US6169170 | US6172209 | US6191105 | US6222025 | US6235887 | US6239265 | WO0149687 | US6268490 | US6277603 | US6294664 | US6320017 | US6326199 | US6346614 | US6380368 | US6444423 | US6525191 | US6528640 | US6531590 | US6534639 | US6534484 | US6576752 | US6586410 | US2003144217 | US6608035 | US6617438 | US6639062 | US6670461 | US6683167 | US6747014 | US2004127488 | US6770748 | US2004167116 | US6783931 | US2004171570 | US6794499 | US6815432 | US6858715 | US6858225 | US6867294 | US6878805 | US6900297 | US2005130923 | US2005148548 | US2005281781 | US6998484 | US7015315 | US7034133 | US7037646 | US7041816 | WO2006047842 | US7045610 | US7053207 | US2006128646 | US7063860 | US7070802 | US7084125 | US7157099 | USRE39464E | US7273933 | WO2007134181 | US2008015162 | US7321029 | US2008039618 | US7399845 | WO2008101157 | US7427672 | US7427605 | US2009012281 | US7495088 | US7569686 | US2009209748 | US7687617 | WO2010036696 | US7741457 | US2010210712 | US2010324120 | US8022193 | US8030467 | US8058069 | US2011313020 | US8106022 | US8158601 | US2012142101 | US8278283 | US8278425 | US8278426 | US8314227 | US2013011922 | US2013096289 | WO2013159108 | US8580756 | US2014128586 | US2014128591 | - DIAS, N. ET AL., MOL CANCER THER, (2002), vol. 1, pages 347 - 355 | - Current protocols in nucleic acid chemistry, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC. | - NIELSEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 254, pages 1497 - 1500 | - MARTIN ET AL., HELV. CHIM. ACTA, (1995), vol. 78, pages 486 - 504 | - ELMEN, J. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2005), vol. 33, no. 1, pages 439 - 447 | - MOOK, OR ET AL., MOL CANC THER, (2007), vol. 6, no. 3, pages 833 - 843 | - GRUNWELLER, A ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2003), vol. 31, no. 12, pages 3185 - 3193 | - CHATTOPADHYAYA ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (2009), vol. 74, pages 118 - 134 | - BRAASCH ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (2002), vol. 41, pages 4503 - 4510 | - SRIVASTAVA ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2007), vol. 129, no. 26, pages 8362 - 8379 | - ROBEYNS ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2008), vol. 130, no. 6, pages 1979 - 1984 | - HORVATH ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2007), vol. 48, pages 3621 - 3623 | - NAUWELAERTS ET AL., J. AM CHEM. SOC., (2007), vol. 129, no. 30, pages 9340 - 9348 | - GU ET AL., NUCLEOSIDES, NUCLEOTIDES & NUCLEIC ACIDS, (2005), vol. 24, no. 5-7, pages 993 - 998 | - NAUWELAERTS ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2005), vol. 33, no. 8, pages 2452 - 2463 | - ROBEYNS ET AL., ACTA CRYSTALLOGRAPHICA, SECTION F: STRUCTURAL BIOLOGY AND CRYSTALLIZATION COMMUNICATIONS, (2005), vol. F61, no. 6, pages 585 - 586 | - GU ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (2004), vol. 60, no. 9, pages 2111 - 2123 | - GU ET AL., OLIGONUCLEOTIDES, (2003), vol. 13, no. 6, pages 479 - 489 | - WANG ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (2003), vol. 68, pages 4499 - 4505 | - VERBEURE ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2001), vol. 29, no. 24, pages 4941 - 4947 | - WANG ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (2001), vol. 66, pages 8478 - 82 | - WANG ET AL., NUCLEOSIDES, NUCLEOTIDES & NUCLEIC ACIDS, (2001), vol. 20, no. 4-7, pages 785 - 788 | - WANG ET AL., J. AM. CHEM., (2000), vol. 122, pages 8595 - 8602 | - KROSCHWITZ, J. L., The Concise Encyclopedia Of Polymer Science And Engineering, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1990), pages 858 - 859 | - ENGLISCH ET AL., ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE, INTERNATIONAL EDITION, (1991), vol. 30, page 613 | - SANGHVI, Y S., "Chapter 15", SANGHVI, Y S., SANGHVI, Y S. ET AL, Antisense polynucleotide agent Research and Applications, CRC PRESS, (1993), pages 289 - 302 | - SANGHVI, Y S. ET AL, Antisense polynucleotide agent Research and Applications, CRC PRESS, (1993), pages 276 - 278 | - LETSINGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACID. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 6553 - 6556 | - MANOHARAN ET AL., BIORG. MED. CHEM. LET., (1994), vol. 4, pages 1053 - 1060 | - MANOHARAN ET AL., ANN. N.Y. ACAD. SCI., (1992), vol. 660, pages 306 - 309 | - MANOHARAN ET AL., BIORG. MED. CHEM. LET., (1993), vol. 3, pages 2765 - 2770 | - OBERHAUSER ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1992), vol. 20, pages 533 - 538 | - SAISON-BEHMOARAS E, EMBO J, (1991), vol. 10, pages 1111 - 1118 | - KABANOV ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1990), vol. 259, pages 327 - 330 | - SVINARCHUK ET AL., BIOCHIMIE, (1993), vol. 75, pages 49 - 54 | - MANOHARAN ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1995), vol. 36, pages 3651 - 3654 | - SHEA ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1990), vol. 18, pages 3777 - 3783 | - MANOHARAN ET AL., NUCLEOSIDES & NUCLEOTIDES, (1995), vol. 14, pages 969 - 973 | - MISHRA ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1995), vol. 1264, pages 229 - 237 | - CROOKE ET AL., J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (1996), vol. 277, pages 923 - 937 | - LAM ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 354, pages 82 - 84 | - SIMEONI ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (2003), vol. 31, pages 2717 - 2724 | - KUBO, T. ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMM., (2007), vol. 365, no. 1, pages 54 - 61 | - LETSINGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, page 6553 | - MANOHARAN ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (1994), vol. 4, page 1053 | - MANOHARAN ET AL., ANN. N.Y. ACAD. SCI.,, (1992), vol. 660, page 306 | - MANOHARAN ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LET., (1993), vol. 3, page 2765 | - OBERHAUSER ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1992), vol. 20, page 533 | - SAISON-BEHMOARAS ET AL., EMBO J., (1991), vol. 10, page 111 | - KABANOV ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1990), vol. 259, page 327 | - SVINARCHUK ET AL., BIOCHIMIE, (1993), vol. 75, page 49 | - MANOHARAN ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1995), vol. 36, page 3651 | - SHEA ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1990), vol. 18, page 3777 | - MANOHARAN ET AL., NUCLEOSIDES & NUCLEOTIDES, (1995), vol. 14, page 969 | - MISHRA ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1995), vol. 1264, page 229 | - CROOKE ET AL., J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (1996), vol. 277, page 923 | - AKHTAR S.; JULIAN RL., TRENDS CELL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 2, no. 5, pages 139 - 144 | - TOLENTINO, MJ. ET AL., RETINA, (2004), vol. 24, pages 132 - 138 | - REICH, SJ. ET AL., MOL. VIS., (2003), vol. 9, pages 210 - 216 | - PILLE, J. ET AL., MOL. THER, (2005), vol. 11, pages 267 - 274 | - KIM, WJ. ET AL., MOL. THER., (2006), vol. 14, pages 343 - 350 | - LI, S. ET AL., MOL. THER., (2007), vol. 15, pages 515 - 523 | - DORN, G. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS, (2004), vol. 32, page E49 | - GENE THER, (2005), vol. 12, pages 59 - 66 | - MAKIMURA, H. ET AL., BMC NEUROSCI, (2002), vol. 3, page 18 | - SHISHKINA, GT. ET AL., NEUROSCIENCE, (2004), vol. 129, pages 521 - 528 | - THAKKER, ER. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2004), vol. 101, pages 17270 - 17275 | - AKANEYA,Y. ET AL., J. NEUROPHYSIOL., (2005), vol. 93, pages 594 - 602 | - HOWARD, KA. ET AL., MOL. THER., (2006), vol. 14, pages 476 - 484 | - ZHANG, X. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2004), vol. 279, pages 10677 - 10684 | - BITKO, V. ET AL., NAT. MED., (2005), vol. 11, pages 50 - 55 | - KIM SH. ET AL., JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (2008), vol. 129, no. 2, pages 107 - 116 | - SORENSEN, DR. ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL, (2003), vol. 327, pages 761 - 766 | - VERMA, UN ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2003), vol. 9, pages 1291 - 1300 | - ARNOLD, AS ET AL., J. HYPERTENS, (2007), vol. 25, pages 197 - 205 | - ZIMMERMANN, TS. ET AL., NATURE, (2006), vol. 441, pages 111 - 114 | - CHIEN, PY. ET AL., CANCER GENE THER., (2005), vol. 12, pages 321 - 328 | - PAL, A. ET AL., INT J. ONCOL., (2005), vol. 26, pages 1087 - 1091 | - AIGNER, A., J. BIOMED. BIOTECHNOL., (2006), page 71659 | - LIU, S., MOL. PHARM., (2006), vol. 3, pages 472 - 487 | - TOMALIA, DA. ET AL., BIOCHEM. SOC. TRANS, (2007), vol. 35, pages 61 - 67 | - YOO, H. ET AL., PHARM. RES., (1999), vol. 16, pages 1799 - 1804 | - BOLLIGER ET AL., THROMB HAEMOST, (2010), vol. 103, pages 1233 - 1238 | - BI L ET AL., NAT GENET, (1995), vol. 10, pages 119 - 21 | - LIN ET AL., BLOOD, (1997), vol. 90, pages 3962 - 6 | - KUNDU ET AL., BLOOD, (1998), vol. 92, pages 168 - 74 | - WANG ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (1997), vol. 94, pages 11563 - 6 | - JIN ET AL., BLOOD, (2004), vol. 104, page 1733 | - FELGNER, P. L ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., USA, (1987), vol. 8, pages 7413 - 7417 | - BANGHAM ET AL., M. MOL. BIOL., (1965), vol. 23, page 238 | - OLSON ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1979), vol. 557, page 9 | - SZOKA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1978), vol. 75, page 4194 | - MAYHEW ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1984), vol. 775, page 169 | - KIM ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1983), vol. 728, page 339 | - FUKUNAGA ET AL., ENDOCRINOL., (1984), vol. 115, page 757 | - MAYER ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1986), vol. 858, page 161 | - WANG ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1987), vol. 147, pages 980 - 985 | - ZHOU ET AL., JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (1992), vol. 19, pages 269 - 274 | - FELGNER, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, page 2550 | - NABEL, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1993), vol. 90, page 11307 | - NABEL, HUMAN GENE THER., (1992), vol. 3, page 649 | - GERSHON, BIOCHEM., (1993), vol. 32, page 7143 | - STRAUSS, EMBO J., (1992), vol. 11, page 417 | - HU ET AL., S.T.P.PHARMA. SCI., (1994), vol. 4, no. 6, page 466 | - ALLEN ET AL., FEBS LETTERS, (1987), vol. 223, page 42 | - WU ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1993), vol. 53, page 3765 | - PAPAHADJOPOULOS ET AL., ANN. N.Y. ACAD. SCI., (1987), vol. 507, page 64 | - GABIZON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1988), vol. 85, page 6949 | - ROSOFF, Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms, (1988), vol. 1, page 245 | - FELGNER, P. L. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., USA, (1987), vol. 8, pages 7413 - 7417 | - GAO, X.; HUANG, L., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN, (1991), vol. 179, page 280 | - ZHOU, X ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1991), vol. 1065, page 8 | - WEINER ET AL., JOURNAL OF DRUG TARGETING, (1992), vol. 2, pages 405 - 410 | - DU PLESSIS ET AL., ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH, (1992), vol. 18, pages 259 - 265 | - MANNINO, R. J.; FOULD-FOGERITE, S., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1988), vol. 6, pages 682 - 690 | - ITANI, T. ET AL., GENE, (1987), vol. 56, pages 267 - 276 | - NICOLAU, C. ET AL., METH. ENZ, (1987), vol. 149, pages 157 - 176 | - STRAUBINGER, R. M.; PAPAHADJOPOULOS, D, METH. ENZ., (1983), vol. 101, pages 512 - 527 | - WANG, C. Y; HUANG, L., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 7851 - 7855 | - RIEGER, Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1988), page 285 | - LIEBERMAN, RIEGER AND BANKER, Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1988), vol. 1, page 199 | - ROSOFF, Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1988), vol. 1, page 245 | - BLOCK, Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1988), vol. 2, page 335 | - HIGUCHI ET AL., Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING CO., (1985), page 301 | - IDSON, Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1988), vol. 1, page 199 | - RIEGER, Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1988), vol. 1, page 285 | - BLOCK, Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1988), vol. 1, page 335 | - IDSON, Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms, MARCEL DEKKER, INC, (1988), vol. 1, page 199 | - IDSON, Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms, Lieberman, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1988), vol. 1, page 199 | - LEUNG; SHAH, Controlled Release of Drugs: Polymers and Aggregate Systems, VCH PUBLISHERS, (1989), pages 185 - 215 | - SCHOTT, Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING CO., (1985), page 271 | - CONSTANTINIDES ET AL., PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, (1994), vol. 11, pages 1385 - 1390 | - RITSCHEL, METH. FIND. EXP. CLIN. PHARMACOL., (1993), vol. 13, page 205 | - CONSTANTINIDES ET AL., PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, (1994), vol. 11, page 1385 | - HO ET AL., J. PHARM. SCI., (1996), vol. 85, pages 138 - 143 | - LEE ET AL., CRITICAL REVIEWS IN THERAPEUTIC DRUG CARRIER SYSTEMS, (1991), page 92 | - TAKAHASHI ET AL., J. PHARM. PHARMACOL., (1988), vol. 40, page 252 | - MURANISHI, CRITICAL REVIEWS IN THERAPEUTIC DRUG CARRIER SYSTEMS, (1990), vol. 7, pages 1 - 33 | - EL HARIRI ET AL., J. PHARM. PHARMACOL., (1992), vol. 44, pages 651 - 654 | - BRUNTON ET AL., Goodman & Gilman's The Pharmacological Basis of Therapeutics, 9th Ed., MCGRAW-HILL, (1996), pages 934 - 935 | - SWINYARD, Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, 18th Ed., MACK PUBLISHING CO., (1990), pages 782 - 783 | - YAMAMOTO ET AL., J. PHARM. EXP. THER., (1992), vol. 263, page 25 | - YAMASHITA ET AL., J. PHARM. SCI., (1990), vol. 79, pages 579 - 583 | - JARRETT, J. CHROMATOGR., (1993), vol. 618, pages 315 - 339 | - BUUR ET AL., J. CONTROL REL., (1990), vol. 14, pages 43 - 51 | - YAMASHITA ET AL., J. PHARM. PHARMACOL., (1987), vol. 39, pages 621 - 626 | - MIYAO ET AL., ANTISENSE POLYNUCLEOTIDE AGENT RES. DEV., (1995), vol. 5, pages 115 - 121 | - TAKAKURA ET AL., ANTISENSE POLYNUCLEOTIDE AGENT & NUCL. ACID DRUG DEV., (1996), vol. 6, pages 177 - 183 | - MELTON ET AL., NUC. ACIDS RES., vol. 12, page 7035 | - BARANY, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 189 - 193 | - GUATELLI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 1874 - 1878 | - KWOH ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 1173 - 1177 | - LIZARDI ET AL., BIOLTECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 6, page 1197 | WO2007US80331 | US20080018616 | US20080018611 | US20080039748 | US20080047087 | US20080051528 |