EP3215126 - METHODS OF PREVENTING SURGICAL SITE INFECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biomet Manufacturing, LLC 56 East Bell Drive Warsaw, IN 46582 / US | [2017/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TROXEL, Karen. 3000 South State Road 25 Warsaw, Indiana 46580 / US | [2017/37] | Representative(s) | Mays, Julie, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London, EC1A 4HD / GB | [2017/37] | Application number, filing date | 15795081.7 | 30.10.2015 | [2017/37] | WO2015US58317 | Priority number, date | US201462072836P | 30.10.2014 Original published format: US 201462072836 P | [2017/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016070046 | Date: | 06.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3215126 | Date: | 13.09.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/08, A61K47/02, A61K38/16, A61P31/02 | [2017/37] | CPC: |
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K38/16 (US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
A61K47/02 (EP,US);
A61K9/08 (EP,US);
A61P31/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR PRÄVENTION VON INFEKTIONEN EINER OPERATIONSSTELLE | [2017/37] | English: | METHODS OF PREVENTING SURGICAL SITE INFECTIONS | [2017/37] | French: | MÉTHODES DE PRÉVENTION DES INFECTIONS D'UN SITE CHIRURGICAL | [2017/37] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/37] | 30.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 17.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/24] | 12.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0884058 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 13-15 * page 3, line 50 - line 57 * * example 1 * * claims 1,4-6 * [Y] 1-12; | [A]JP2002322009 (NISHIGORI KOJI, et al) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [Y]CN102499243 (INST MED EQUIP ACAD MILITARY) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *; | [Y]CN103316330 (TIBET BEIZHUYA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * | by applicant | US2013288951 | US2014274875 |