EP3214950 - COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Optibiotix Limited Innovation Centre Innovation Way Heslington, York YO10 5DG / GB | [2017/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'HARA, Stephen Patrick Optibiotix Limited Innovation Centre Way Heslington York Yorkshire YO10 5DG / GB | [2017/37] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2017/37] | Application number, filing date | 15795215.1 | 05.11.2015 | [2017/37] | WO2015GB53350 | Priority number, date | WO2014GB53288 | 05.11.2014 Original published format: PCT/GB2014/053288 | GB20150002355 | 12.02.2015 Original published format: GB 201502355 | [2017/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016071693 | Date: | 12.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3214950 | Date: | 13.09.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3214950 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A23C9/13, A23C9/123, A23C9/133, A23C9/137, A23C17/02, A23C19/06, A23L33/00, A23L33/135, A23L33/21, A61K45/06 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP);
A23C17/02 (EP);
A23C19/062 (EP);
A23C9/1238 (EP);
A23C9/1307 (EP);
A23C9/1322 (EP);
A23C9/133 (EP);
A23C9/137 (EP);
A23L33/135 (EP);
A23L33/21 (EP);
A23L33/30 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP);
A23V2200/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/00, A23V2200/30, A23V2200/3202, A23V2200/3204, A23V2200/326, A23V2200/3262, A23V2200/328, A23V2200/332, A23V2250/1586, A23V2250/5058 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2017/37] | A23L29/20, A23L29/244, A23L33/00, A23L33/135, A23L33/16, A23L33/20, A23L33/21, A61K31/736, A23C9/123, A23C9/154 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2017/37] | English: | COMPOSITION | [2017/37] | French: | COMPOSITION | [2017/37] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/37] | 21.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.11.2015 | AL | 10.03.2021 | AT | 10.03.2021 | CY | 10.03.2021 | CZ | 10.03.2021 | DK | 10.03.2021 | EE | 10.03.2021 | ES | 10.03.2021 | FI | 10.03.2021 | HR | 10.03.2021 | IT | 10.03.2021 | LT | 10.03.2021 | LV | 10.03.2021 | MC | 10.03.2021 | MK | 10.03.2021 | MT | 10.03.2021 | NL | 10.03.2021 | PL | 10.03.2021 | RO | 10.03.2021 | RS | 10.03.2021 | SE | 10.03.2021 | SI | 10.03.2021 | SK | 10.03.2021 | SM | 10.03.2021 | TR | 10.03.2021 | BG | 10.06.2021 | NO | 10.06.2021 | GR | 11.06.2021 | IS | 10.07.2021 | PT | 12.07.2021 | IE | 05.11.2021 | LU | 05.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | CH | 30.11.2021 | LI | 30.11.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 05.11.2015 | |
AL | 10.03.2021 | ||
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CY | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
MK | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
TR | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
IE | 05.11.2021 | ||
LU | 05.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 05.11.2015 | |
AL | 10.03.2021 | ||
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CY | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
MK | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
IE | 05.11.2021 | ||
LU | 05.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 05.11.2015 | |
AL | 10.03.2021 | ||
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CY | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
IE | 05.11.2021 | ||
LU | 05.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 05.11.2015 | |
AL | 10.03.2021 | ||
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
IE | 05.11.2021 | ||
LU | 05.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
IE | 05.11.2021 | ||
LU | 05.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
LU | 05.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
LU | 05.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | Cited in | International search | CN101438738 [ ]; | DE202014103285U [ ]; | KR20130079173 [ ]; | [XYI]CN101438738 (MENGNIU DAIRY IND GROUP CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-3,5,7-10,12,13,15-17,19-21,23-25,31 * page 3, line 1 - line 4 * * page 3, line 18 - line 25 * * page 4, line 20 - page 6, line 25 * * page 7, line 18 - page 10, line 17; claims 1,2,3,4 * [Y] 18,22,28 [I] 26-31; | [Y]DE202012101011U (RITTINGHAUSEN REINER [DE]) [Y] 18,22,28 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0073]; examples 1-5; claims 1,2,4,6,7 *; | [X]KR20130079173 (WOONGJIN FOODS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-3,5,8-10,14,19-21,23-26,29-31 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0034] *; | [X]DE202014103285U (YOUNGGO GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,7-12,14,15,17,19-21,23-27,29-31 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0051]; claims 1,5,6,8,10 *; | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2009, no. 51, Database accession no. 2009-J95099, & CN101438738 A 20090527 (INNER MONGOLIA MENGNIU DAIRY IND GROUP C) [ ] * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2014, no. 74, Database accession no. 2014-T80707, & DE202014103285U U1 20141030 (YOUNGGO GMBH) [ ] * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2013, no. 79, Database accession no. 2013-M63221, & KR20130079173 A 20130710 (WOONGJIN FOODS CO LTD) [ ] * abstract * | [XI] - F. VANINGELGEM ET AL, "Biodiversity of Exopolysaccharides Produced by Streptococcus thermophilus Strains Is Reflected in Their Production and Their Molecular and Functional Characteristics", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (20040201), vol. 70, no. 2, doi:10.1128/AEM.70.2.900-912.2004, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 900 - 912, XP055034421 [X] 1-3,24,25 * abstract * * page 901, column left, line 1 - line 6 * * page 910, column right, line 4 - line 18 * [I] 4,6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.70.2.900-912.2004 | [A] - European Food Safety Authority, EFSA, "Statement of the Scientific Panel on Dietetic Products, Nutrition andAllergies on a request from the Commission related to dietary fibre", The EFSA Journal, doi:10.2903/j.efsa.2007.1060, (20070823), URL: http://www.efsa.europa.eu/en/efsajournal/doc/1060.pdf, (20150128), XP002735097 [A] 1-31 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2903/j.efsa.2007.1060 | [A] - CONNOLLY M L ET AL, "Konjac glucomannan hydrolysate beneficially modulates bacterial composition and activity within the faecal microbiota", JOURNAL OF FUNCTIONAL FOODS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 2, no. 3, ISSN 1756-4646, (20100701), pages 219 - 224, (20100611), XP027212496 [A] 1-31 * the whole document * | by applicant | - ABDOLLAHI M; FARSHCHI A; NIKFAR S; SEYEDIFAR M, "Effect of chromium on glucose and lipid profiles in patients with type 2 diabetes; a meta-analysis review of randomized trials", J PHARM PHARM SCI., (2013), vol. 16, no. 1, pages 99 - 114 | - ABRAMS, S. A.; GRIFFIN, . J.; HAWTHORNE, K. M.; ELLIS, K. J., "Effect of prebiotic supplementation and calcium intake on body mass index", J PEDIATR, (2007), vol. 151, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jpeds.2007.03.043, pages 293 - 8, XP022204329 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpeds.2007.03.043 | - ACHANTA, K.; ARYANA, K.J.; BOENEKE, C.A., "Fat free plain set yogurts fortified with various minerals", FOOD SCI TECH, (2007), vol. 40, doi:doi:10.1016/j.lwt.2006.01.001, pages 424 - 429, XP005732031 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.lwt.2006.01.001 | - ANDERSON, R. A., "Chromium, glucose intolerance and diabetes", J AM COLL NUTR, (1998), vol. 17, pages 548 - 55 | - ANDERSON, R. A., "Effects of chromium on body composition and weight loss", NUTR REV, (1998), vol. 56, pages 266 - 70 | - ARCHER, B. J.; JOHNSON, S. K.; DEVEREUX, H. M.; BAXTER, A. L., "Effect of fat replacement by inulin or lupin-kernel fibre on sausage patty acceptability, post-meal perceptions of satiety and food intake in men", BR J NUTR, (2004), vol. 91, pages 591 - 9 | - ATTENBURROW, M. J.; ODONTIADIS, J.; MURRAY, B. J.; COWEN, P. J.; FRANKLIN, M., "Chromium treatment decreases the sensitivity of 5-HT2A receptors", PSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY (BERL), (2002), vol. 159, pages 432 - 6 | - BOHM, A.; KAISER, I.; TREBSTEIN, A.; HENLE, T., "Heat-induced degradation of inulin", EUROPEAN FOOD RESEARCH AND TECHNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 220, doi:doi:10.1007/s00217-004-1098-8, pages 466 - 471, XP019328087 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00217-004-1098-8 | - CANI, P. D.; JOLY, E.; HORSMANS, Y.; DELZENNE, N. M., "Oligofructose promotes satiety in healthy human: a pilot study", EUR J CLIN NUTR, (2006), vol. 60, pages 567 - 72 | - CANI, P. D.; HOSTE, S.; GUIOT, Y.; DELZENNE, N. M., "Dietary non-digestible carbohydrates promote L-cell differentiation in the proximal colon of rats", BR J NUTR, (2007), vol. 98, doi:doi:10.1017/S0007114507691648, pages 32 - 7, XP002593206 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1017/S0007114507691648 | - CANI, P. D.; LECOURT, E.; DEWULF, E. M.; SOHET, F. M.; PACHIKIAN, B. D.; NASLAIN, D.; DE BACKER, F.; NEYRINCK, A. M.; DELZENNE, N., "Gut microbiota fermentation of prebiotics increases satietogenic and incretin gut peptide production with consequences for appetite sensation and glucose response after a meal", AM J CLIN NUTR, (2009), vol. 90, pages 1236 - 43 | - CARABIN, . G.; FLAMM, W. G., "Evaluation of safety of inulin and oligofructose as dietary fiber", REGUL TOXICOL PHARMACOL, (1999), vol. 30, pages 268 - 82 | - CHEN, H. L.; CHENG, H. C.; LIU, Y. J.; LIU, S. Y.; WU, W. T., "Konjac acts as a natural laxative by increasing stool bulk and improving colonic ecology in healthy adults", NUTRITION, (2006), vol. 22, doi:doi:10.1016/j.nut.2006.08.009, pages 1112 - 9, XP025114573 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nut.2006.08.009 | - CHEN, H. L.; CHENG, H. C.; WU, W. T.; LIU, Y. J.; LIU, S. Y., "Supplementation of konjac glucomannan into a low-fiber Chinese diet promoted bowel movement and improved colonic ecology in constipated adults: a placebo-controlled, diet-controlled trial", J AM COLL NUTR, (2008), vol. 27, pages 102 - 8 | - CHUA, M.; BALDWIN, T. C.; HOCKING, T. J.; CHAN, K., "Traditional uses and potential health benefits of Amorphophallus konjac K. Koch ex N.E.Br", J ETHNOPHARMACOL, (2010), vol. 128, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jep.2010.01.021, pages 268 - 78, XP026939821 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jep.2010.01.021 | - DELZENNE, N. M.; CANI, P. D.; DAUBIOUL, C.; NEYRINCK, A. M., "Impact of inulin and oligofructose on gastrointestinal peptides", BR J NUTR, (2005), vol. 93, no. 1, pages 157 - 61 | - DEVEREUX, H. M.; JONES, G. P.; MCCORMACK, L.; HUNTER, W. C., "Consumer acceptability of low fat foods containing inulin and oligofructose", J FOOD SCI, (2003), vol. 68, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1365-2621.2003.tb12341.x, pages 1850 - 1854, XP055436902 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2621.2003.tb12341.x | - DOI, K., "Effect of konjac fibre (glucomannan) on glucose and lipids", EUR J CLIN NUTR, (1995), vol. 49, no. 3, pages 190 - 7 | - GENTA, S.; CABRERA, W.; HABIB, N.; PONS, J.; CARILLO, . M.; GRAU, A.; SANCHEZ, S., "Yacon syrup: beneficial effects on obesity and insulin resistance in humans", CLIN NUTR, (2009), vol. 28, doi:doi:10.1016/j.clnu.2009.01.013, pages 182 - 7, XP026069008 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.clnu.2009.01.013 | - HABIB, A. M.; RICHARDS, P.; ROGERS, G. J.; REIMANN, F.; GRIBBLE, F. M., "Co-localisation and secretion of glucagon-like peptide 1 and peptide YY from primary cultured human L cells", DIABETOLOGIA, (2013), vol. 56, pages 1413 - 6 | - HARROLD, J. A.; HUGHES, G. M.; O'SHIEL, K.; QUINN, E.; BOYLAND, E. J.; WILLIAMS, N. J.; HALFORD, J. C., "Acute effects of a herb extract formulation and inulin fibre on appetite, energy intake and food choice", APPETITE, (2013), vol. 62, pages 84 - 90 | - HESS, J. R.; BIRKETT, A. M.; THOMAS, W.; SLAVIN, J. L., "Effects of short-chain fructooligosaccharides on satiety responses in healthy men and women", APPETITE, (2011), vol. 56, doi:doi:10.1016/j.appet.2010.12.005, pages 128 - 34, XP028127578 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.appet.2010.12.005 | - HOEGER WW; HARRIS C; LONG EM; HOPKINS DR, "Four-week supplementation with a natural dietary compound produces favorable changes in body composition", ADV.THER., (199809), vol. 15, no. 5, pages 305 - 14 | - HUEBNER, J.; WEHLING, R. L.; PARKHURST, A.; HUTKINS, R. W., "Effect of processing conditions on the prebiotic activity of commercial prebiotics", INTERNATIONAL DAIRY JOURNAL, (2008), vol. 18, pages 287 - 293, XP022368407 | - KROL, E.; KREJPCIO, Z.; BYKS, H.; BOGDANSKI, P.; PUPEK-MUSIALIK, D., "Effects of chromium brewer's yeast supplementation on body mass, blood carbohydrates, and lipids and minerals in type 2 diabetic patients", BIOL TRACE ELEM RES, (2011), vol. 143, doi:doi:10.1007/s12011-010-8917-5, pages 726 - 37, XP019960975 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12011-010-8917-5 | - MARTINO, F.; PUDDU, P. E.; PANNARALE, G.; COLANTONI, C.; MARTINO, E.; NIGLIO, T.; ZANONI, C.; BARILLA, F., "Low dose chromium-polynicotinate or policosanol is effective in hypercholesterolemic children only in combination with glucomannan", ATHEROSCLEROSIS, (2013), vol. 228, doi:doi:10.1016/j.atherosclerosis.2013.02.005, pages 198 - 202, XP028586437 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.atherosclerosis.2013.02.005 | - MAYNARD, L. M.; WISEMANDLE, W.; ROCHE, A. F.; CHUMLEA, W. C.; GUO, S. S.; SIERVOGEL, R. M., "Childhood body composition in relation to body mass index", PEDIATRICS, (2001), vol. 107, pages 344 - 50 | - OKETANI Y; ICHIKAWA K; ONO, C, "Toxicity studies on glucomannan (1) acute toxicity in mice and rats", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHARMACOLOGY, (1991), vol. 27, pages 127 - 131 | - ONAKPOYA, I.; POSADZKI, P.; ERNST, E., "Chromium supplementation in overweight and obesity: a systematic review and meta-analysis of randomized clinical trials", OBES REV, (2013), vol. 14, pages 496 - 507 | - OVERDUIN, J.; FRAYO, R. S.; GRILL, H. J.; KAPLAN, J. M.; CUMMINGS, D. E., "Role of the duodenum and macronutrient type in ghrelin regulation", ENDOCRINOLOGY, (2005), vol. 146, pages 845 - 50 | - PARNELL, J. A.; REIMER, R. A., "Weight loss during oligofructose supplementation is associated with decreased ghrelin and increased peptide YY in overweight and obese adults", AM J CLIN NUTR, (2009), vol. 89, pages 1751 - 9 | - PETERS, H. P.; BOERS, H. M.; HADDEMAN, E.; MELNIKOV, S. M.; QVYJT, F., "No effect of added beta-glucan or of fructooligosaccharide on appetite or energy intake", AM J CLIN NUTR, (2009), vol. 89, pages 58 - 63 | - PITTLER, M. H.; STEVINSON, C.; ERNST, E., "Chromium picolinate for reducing body weight: meta-analysis of randomized trials", INT J OBES RELAT METAB DISORD, (2003), vol. 27, pages 522 - 9 | - SALAS-SALVADO, J.; FARRES, X.; LUQUE, X.; NAREJOS, S.; BORRELL, M.; BASORA, J.; ANGUERA, A.; TORRES, F.; BULLO, M.; BALANZA, R., "Effect of two doses of a mixture of soluble fibres on body weight and metabolic variables in overweight or obese patients: a randomised trial", BR J NUTR, (2008), vol. 99, pages 1380 - 7 | - SOOD, N.; BAKER, W. L.; COLEMAN, C., "Effect of glucomannan on plasma lipid and glucose concentrations, body weight, and blood pressure: systematic review and meta-analysis", AM J CLIN NUTR, (2008), vol. 88, pages 1167 - 75 | - TARINI, J.; WOLEVER, T. M., "The fermentable fibre inulin increases postprandial serum short-chain fatty acids and reduces free-fatty acids and ghrelin in healthy subjects", APPL PHYSIOL NUTR METAB, (2010), vol. 35, doi:doi:10.1139/H09-119, pages 9 - 16, XP008173122 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1139/H09-119 | - VERHOEF, S. P.; MEYER, D.; WESTERTERP, K. R., "Effects of oligofructose on appetite profile, glucagon-like peptide 1 and peptide YY3-36 concentrations and energy intake", BR J NUTR, (2011), vol. 106, doi:doi:10.1017/S0007114511002194, pages 1757 - 62, XP002776310 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1017/S0007114511002194 | - VUKSAN, V.; JENKINS, A. L.; ROGOVIK, A. L.; FAIRGRIEVE, C. D.; JOVANOVSKI, E.; LEITER, L. A., "Viscosity rather than quantity of dietary fibre predicts cholesterol-lowering effect in healthy individuals", BR J NUTR, (2011), vol. 106, pages 1349 - 52 | - VUKSAN, V.; JENKINS, D. J.; SPADAFORA, P.; SIEVENPIPER, J. L.; OWEN, R.; VIDGEN, E.; BRIGHENTI, F.; JOSSE, R.; LEITER, L. A.; BRUC, "Konjac-mannan (glucomannan) improves glycemia and other associated risk factors for coronary heart disease in type 2 diabetes. A randomized controlled metabolic trial", DIABETES CARE, (1999), vol. 22, pages 913 - 9 | - VUKSAN, V.; SIEVENPIPER, J. L.; OWEN, R.; SWILLEY, J. A.; SPADAFORA, P.; JENKINS, D. J.; VIDGEN, E.; BRIGHENTI, F.; JOSSE, R. G.;, "Beneficial effects of viscous dietary fiber from Konjac-mannan in subjects with the insulin resistance syndrome: results of a controlled metabolic trial", DIABETES CARE, (2000), vol. 23, pages 9 - 14, XP001056810 | - YAZAKI, Y.; FARIDI, Z.; MA, Y.; ALI, A.; NORTHRUP, V.; NJIKE, V. Y.; LIBERTI, L.; KATZ, D. L., "A pilot study of chromium picolinate for weight loss", J ALTERN COMPLEMENT MED, (2010), vol. 16, pages 291 - 9 | - YOSHIDA, M.; VANSTONE, C. A.; PARSONS, W. D.; ZAWISTOWSKI, J.; JONES, P. J., "Effect of plant sterols and glucomannan on lipids in individuals with and without type I diabetes", EUR J CLIN NUTR, (2006), vol. 60, pages 529 - 37 |