EP3146968 - K2 COMPOSITION, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, AND APPLICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV, NL | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sinphar Tian-li Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. (Hangzhou) No. 599 Hongfeng Road Yuhang Economic Development Zone Hangzhou Zhejiang 311100 / CN | [2017/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Hang-Ching No.599 Hongfeng Road Yuhang Economic Development Zone Hangzhou Zhejiang 311100 / CN | 02 /
HUANG, Hsin-Wen No.599 Hongfeng Road Yuhang Economic Development Zone Hangzhou Zhejiang 311100 / CN | 03 /
LU, Shih-Min No.599 Hongfeng Road Yuhang Economic Development Zone Hangzhou Zhejiang 311100 / CN | [2017/13] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2017/13] | Application number, filing date | 15795482.7 | 21.05.2015 | [2017/13] | WO2015CN79439 | Priority number, date | US201462001328P | 21.05.2014 Original published format: US 201462001328 P | US201462001737P | 22.05.2014 Original published format: US 201462001737 P | [2017/13] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015176665 | Date: | 26.11.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3146968 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3146968 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/575, A61P35/00, A61K36/076 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
A61K36/076 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/575 (EP,KR,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
C07J9/005 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2236/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/13] | A61K31/575, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | K2-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND ANWENDUNG DAVON | [2017/13] | English: | K2 COMPOSITION, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, AND APPLICATION THEREOF | [2017/13] | French: | COMPOSITION K2, PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRÉPARER ET APPLICATION DE CELLE-CI | [2017/13] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2016 | Translation filed | 16.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 16.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 16.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/13] | 16.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.09.2020 | 24.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 06.12.2023 | HR | 06.12.2023 | LT | 06.12.2023 | LV | 06.12.2023 | NL | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SE | 06.12.2023 | BG | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 06.12.2023 | |
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]CN1329900 (INST OF MEDICINE BIO TECHNOLOG [CN]) [I] 11,12 * claims 1-13 * [Y] 2; | [XY]CN1977866 (TANG ZONGJIAN [CN]) [X] 8-12 * claim 1 * [Y] 2,13,14; | [IY]EP2246047 (SINPHAR TIAN LI PHARMACEUTICAL [CN]) [I] 8-14 * claims 1-3, 9, 12 * * example 3 * * examples 7-8 * [Y] 2,13,14; | [IY]EP2305268 (SINPHAR TIAN LI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD HANGZHOU [CN]) [I] 8-12 * example 2 * * claims 1-17 * [Y] 2; | [XI] - TAI TAKAAKI ET AL, "Isolation of lanostane-type triterpene acids having an acetoxyl group from sclerotia of Poria cocos", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, PERGAMON PRESS, GB, (19950101), vol. 40, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0031-9422(95)00182-7, ISSN 0031-9422, pages 225 - 231, XP002666236 [X] 2,4,5,8-12 * Complete hydrolysis of 3b; page 230, column right, paragraph 6th * [I] 6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0031-9422(95)00182-7 | [XY] - Liang Zhou, "Cytotoxic and Anti-oxidant Activities of Lanostane-Type Triterpenes Isolated from Poria cocos", Chem Pharm Bull, (20081001), pages 1459 - 1462, URL: https://www.jstage.jst.go.jp/article/cpb/56/10/56_10_1459/_pdf/-char/en, (20171130), XP055430592 [X] 8-14 * table 2; compounds 4, 6 * [Y] 13,14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1248/cpb.56.1459 | [XY] - HUI LING ET AL, "Polyporenic acid C induces caspase-8-mediated apoptosis in human lung cancer A549 cells", MOLECULAR CARCINOGENESIS, US, (20090601), vol. 48, no. 6, doi:10.1002/mc.20487, ISSN 0899-1987, pages 498 - 507, XP055430800 [X] 8-14 * the whole document * [Y] 13,14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mc.20487 | [T] - BO-FENG CHU ET AL, "An ethanol extract of Poria cocos inhibits the proliferation of non-small cell lung cancer A549 cells via the mitochondria-mediated caspase activation pathway", JOURNAL OF FUNCTIONAL FOODS, NL, (20160501), vol. 23, doi:10.1016/j.jff.2016.03.016, ISSN 1756-4646, pages 614 - 627, XP055430794 [T] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jff.2016.03.016 | International search | [XY]WO2009155730 (SINPHAR TIAN LI PHARMACEUTICAL [CN]) [X] 1-14 * , description, pages7-8, description, pages 7-8 * [Y] 15-16; | [Y]WO2010127557 (SINPHAR TIAN LI PHARMACEUTICAL [CN]) [Y] 15-16 * , description, pages 6 and 8-10 *; | [A] - ZAN, JUNFENG, "Study on antitumor activity of Poria cocos triterpene compositions and the quality analysis of Poria cocos medicinal materials", MEDICINE & PUBLIC HEALTH, CHINA DOCTORAL DISSERTATIONS FULL-TEXT DATABASE, (20130115), pages E057 - 17, XP 008185337 [A] 1-16 | [A] - HE, SHAN, "Study on the effective constituents and the effects of anti tumor cell multidrug resistance in the anti tumor cells", MEDICINE & PUBLIC HEALTH, CHINA MASTER'S THESES FULL-TEXT DATABASE, (20120715), pages E057 - 140, XP008185338 [A] 1-16 |