EP3147300 - N-ACETYLGLUCOSAMINE SUGAR CHAIN GROUP-CONTAINING POLYMER, CARRIER COMPOUND FOR DRUG DELIVERY, DRUG PREPARATION, AND DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/13] | N-ACETYLGLUCOSAMINE SUGAR CHAIN GROUP-CONTAINING COMPOUND, CARRIER COMPOUND FOR DRUG DELIVERY, DRUG PREPARATION, AND DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEM | ||
[2020/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Somar Corporation 11-2 Ginza 4-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8109 / JP | [2017/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISE Hirohiko 9-25-4 Saito 1-chome Nishi-ku Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka 819-0367 / JP | [2017/13] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2017/13] | Application number, filing date | 15796230.9 | 19.05.2015 | [2017/13] | WO2015JP64344 | Priority number, date | JP20140104811 | 21.05.2014 Original published format: JP 2014104811 | [2017/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015178380 | Date: | 26.11.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3147300 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3147300 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/36, A61K49/00, C08F12/26 | [2017/52] | CPC: |
C08F12/26 (EP,KR,US);
A61K49/0052 (US);
A61K41/00 (US);
A61K47/36 (KR,US);
A61K47/50 (KR,US);
A61K47/542 (US);
A61K47/545 (US);
A61K47/549 (US);
A61K47/58 (EP);
A61K47/61 (EP,US);
A61K47/6905 (US);
A61K47/6923 (EP);
A61K47/6927 (EP);
A61K49/00 (KR,US);
A61K49/0043 (US);
A61K49/0076 (US);
A61K49/085 (KR);
A61K49/1806 (KR);
C08F12/32 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/13] | C08F12/26, A61K47/36, A61K49/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYMER MIT N-ACETYLGLUCOSAMINZUCKERKETTENGRUPPEN, WIRKSTOFFFREISETZUNGSTRÄGER, ARZNEIMITTELZUBEREITUNG UND WIRKSTOFFFREISETZUNGSSYSTEM | [2020/04] | English: | N-ACETYLGLUCOSAMINE SUGAR CHAIN GROUP-CONTAINING POLYMER, CARRIER COMPOUND FOR DRUG DELIVERY, DRUG PREPARATION, AND DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEM | [2020/04] | French: | POLYMÈRE COMPRENANT DES GROUPES DE CHAINE DE N-ACÉTYLGLUCOSAMINE, VECTEUR DE TRANSPORT POUR ADMINSITRATION DE MÉDICAMENT, PRÉPARATION PHARMACEUTIQUE ET SYSTÈME D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENT | [2020/04] |
Former [2017/13] | VERBINDUNG MIT EINER N-ACETYLGLUCOSAMINZUCKERKETTENGRUPPE, TRÄGERVERBINDUNG ZUR ARZNEIMITTELFREISETZUNG, ARZNEIMITTELZUBEREITUNG UND ARZNEIMITTELABGABESYSTEM | ||
Former [2017/13] | N-ACETYLGLUCOSAMINE SUGAR CHAIN GROUP-CONTAINING COMPOUND, CARRIER COMPOUND FOR DRUG DELIVERY, DRUG PREPARATION, AND DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEM | ||
Former [2017/13] | COMPOSÉ COMPRENANT UN GROUPE D'UNE CHAÎNE DE SUCRE N-ACÉTYLGLUCOSAMINE, COMPOSÉ ENTRAÎNEUR POUR TRANSPORT DE MÉDICAMENT, PRODUIT PHARMACEUTIQUE, ET SYSTÈME DE TRANSPORT DE MÉDICAMENT | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2016 | Translation filed | 09.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 09.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/13] | 09.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.05.2015 | AL | 24.06.2020 | AT | 24.06.2020 | CY | 24.06.2020 | CZ | 24.06.2020 | DK | 24.06.2020 | EE | 24.06.2020 | ES | 24.06.2020 | FI | 24.06.2020 | HR | 24.06.2020 | IT | 24.06.2020 | LT | 24.06.2020 | LV | 24.06.2020 | MC | 24.06.2020 | MK | 24.06.2020 | MT | 24.06.2020 | NL | 24.06.2020 | PL | 24.06.2020 | RO | 24.06.2020 | RS | 24.06.2020 | SE | 24.06.2020 | SI | 24.06.2020 | SK | 24.06.2020 | SM | 24.06.2020 | TR | 24.06.2020 | BG | 24.09.2020 | NO | 24.09.2020 | GR | 25.09.2020 | IS | 24.10.2020 | PT | 26.10.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 19.05.2015 | |
AL | 24.06.2020 | ||
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CY | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
MK | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
TR | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 19.05.2015 | |
AL | 24.06.2020 | ||
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CY | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
MK | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 19.05.2015 | |
AL | 24.06.2020 | ||
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CY | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 19.05.2015 | |
AL | 24.06.2020 | ||
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 24.06.2020 | |
NO | 24.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5206318 (KOBAYASHI KAZUKIYO [JP], et al) [X] 1-11 * the whole document * * examples 1-16 ** column 5, line 53 - column 6, line 39 * | International search | [X]JPH0347802 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS) [X] 1-11 * , claims; page 4, lower right column, line 16 to page 5, lower left column, line 8; examples & US 5206318 A & EP 394068 A1 & DE 69016490 C *; | [X] - HIROHIKO ISE et al., "N-acetylglucosamine Gan'yu Tosa Kobunshi PV-GlcNAc o Mochiita Saibo Kino Seigyo", Dai 33 Kai The Annual Meeting of the Japanese Society for Biomaterials Yokoshu, (20110000), page 148, XP008185586 [X] 1-11 | [X] - SHIN-ICHI ASO et al., "Effective uptake of N-acetylglucosamine-conjugated liposomes by cardiomyocytes in vitro", Journal of Controlled Release, (20070000), vol. 122, no. 2, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 189 - 198, XP 028926714 [X] 1-11 | [X] - MAMIKO ISE et al., "Targeting N-acetylglucosamine-bearing polymer-coated liposomes to vascular smooth muscle cells", J. Artif. Organs, (20110000), vol. 14, no. 4, ISSN 1619-0904, pages 301 - 309, XP 019987754 [X] 1-11 | [X] - SATOSHI KOBAYASHI et al., "Surface coating of bone marrow cells with N-acetylglucosamine for bone marrow implantation therapy", Biomaterials, (20090000), vol. 30, no. 4, ISSN 0142-9612, pages 574 - 582, XP 025693614 [X] 1-11 | [X] - SUN-JUNG KIM et al., "Interactions of vimentin- or desmin-expressing liver cells with N-acetylglucosamine-bearing polymers", Biomaterials, (20120000), vol. 33, no. 7, ISSN 0142-9612, pages 2154 - 2164, XP 028442464 [X] 1-11 | [X] - KENTA KOMURA et al., "Dynamic behaviors of vimentin induced by interaction with GlcNAc molecules", Glycobiology, (20120000), vol. 22, no. 12, ISSN 0959-6658, pages 1741 - 1759, XP 055238005 [X] 1-11 | [X] - HIROHIKO ISE et al., "Vimentin and desmin possess GlcNAc-binding lectin-like properties on cell surfaces", Glycobiology, (20100000), vol. 20, no. 7, ISSN 0959-6658, pages 843 - 864, XP 055238008 [X] 1-11 |