EP3146326 - DATA CAPTURE DEVICE AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hegel Industrial Solutions Pty Ltd. P.O. Box 785 Cannonvale QLD QLD 4802 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2017/13] | For all designated states Heigel Industrial Solutions Pty Ltd. P.O. Box 785 Cannonvale QLD QLD 4802 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOSTER, Darren James C/- Level 32 239 George Street Brisbane, Queensland 4000 / AU | [2017/13] | Representative(s) | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/13] | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 15796450.3 | 22.05.2015 | [2017/13] | WO2015AU50263 | Priority number, date | AU20140901939 | 23.05.2014 Original published format: AU 2014901939 | [2017/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015176132 | Date: | 26.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3146326 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 26.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/265, B63C11/52 | [2017/13] | CPC: |
B63C11/52 (EP,US);
E02D33/00 (EP,US);
E02D5/22 (EP,US);
G01N21/8851 (US);
G01N29/11 (EP,US);
G01N29/262 (EP,US);
G01N29/265 (EP,US);
E02D5/34 (EP,US);
G01N2201/06113 (US);
G01N2291/0234 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0258 (EP,US);
G01N2291/044 (EP,US);
G01N2291/2626 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/13] | Title | German: | DATENERFASSUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM | [2017/13] | English: | DATA CAPTURE DEVICE AND SYSTEM | [2017/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE CAPTURE DE DONNÉES | [2017/13] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/13] | 01.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/18] | 04.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/18] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.10.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 13.10.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.12.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   13.03.2020 | 31.05.2022 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   26.09.2022 | 31.05.2023 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006008137 (NAGAHDARIPOUR SHAHRIAR [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] - [0013] , [0014] - [0016] - [0018] *; | [XI]US2006290779 (REVERTE CARLOS F [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] , [0032] , [0047] , [0060] , [0062] , [0088] * [I] 6; | [XI]US2010008462 (KILLIAN MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1,5,7,8,10,11,13-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0022] - [0024] - [0027] , [0031] , [0033] * [I] 12; | [XP]EP2749879 (AREVA NP INC [US]) [XP] 1,5* paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0012] , [0015] , [0020]; figure 4 * | International search | [X]US3426585 (ZEMANEK JOSEPH JR, et al) [X] 1-21 * Whole document Especially Figures and columns 2-5 *; | [X]US5947051 (GEIGER MICHAEL B [US]) [X] 1-21 * Whole document Especially Figures and columns 15-16 *; | [X]US7993469 (VALLAPUZHA SUBRAMANIAN [US], et al) [X] 1-21* Whole document Especially Figures and columns 6-7 *; | [X]US8525124 (ATWOOD CHRISTOPHER C [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * Whole document Especially Figures and columns 3-5 * | by applicant | US5957051 | US2008313915 | US2010008462 |