EP3209288 - STEALTH, TARGETED NANOPARTICLES (STN) FOR ORAL DRUG DELIVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.12.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chaudhary, Manu Plot No.51 52 Industrial Area Phase-1 Panchkula 134 113 Haryana / IN | [2017/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/35] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/35] | Heinze, Ekkehard Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15798574.8 | 22.09.2015 | [2017/35] | WO2015IN50114 | Priority number, date | IN2014DEL2752 | 25.09.2014 Original published format: IN 2752DE2014 | [2017/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016046845 | Date: | 31.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3209288 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/00, A61K9/51, A61K31/546 | [2017/35] | CPC: |
A61K9/5161 (EP,US);
A61K31/122 (EP,US);
A61K31/202 (EP,US);
A61K31/337 (EP,US);
A61K31/407 (EP,US);
A61K31/4164 (EP,US);
A61K31/43 (EP,US);
A61K31/436 (EP,US);
A61K31/4439 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/5383 (EP,US);
A61K31/546 (EP,US);
A61K31/7036 (EP,US);
A61K31/7048 (EP,US);
A61K31/714 (EP,US);
A61K38/05 (EP,US);
A61K38/12 (EP,US);
A61K38/14 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K47/551 (EP,US);
A61K47/6939 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/35] | Title | German: | GERICHTETE STEALTH-NANOPARTIKEL (STN) ZUR ORALEN WIRKSTOFFVERABREICHUNG | [2017/35] | English: | STEALTH, TARGETED NANOPARTICLES (STN) FOR ORAL DRUG DELIVERY | [2017/35] | French: | NANOPARTICULES CIBLÉES FURTIVES (STN) POUR ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENT PAR VOIE ORALE | [2017/35] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/35] | 24.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 11.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IY]US2009252803 (YUAN ZHI [CN], et al) [I] 1-25 * page 1, paragraph 3 * * page 2, paragraph 18 * * page 4, paragraphs 63-64 * * page 5, paragraph 115 * * page 7, paragraphs 140-142 * * page 6, paragraphs 116-125 * [Y] 1-25; | [Y] - GANGULY KUNTAL ET AL, "Polysaccharide-based micro/nanohydrogels for delivering macromolecular therapeutics", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20140517), vol. 193, doi:10.1016/J.JCONREL.2014.05.014, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 162 - 173, XP029084262 [Y] 1-25 * abstract * * page 162, column right, paragraph 3 * * page 163, column left, paragraph 1 * * page 164, column left, paragraphs 3-6 * * page 170, column right, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2014.05.014 | [Y] - SAMPATH C ABEYLATH ET AL, "Click synthesis of dextran macrostructures for combinatorial-designed self-assembled nanoparticles encapsulating diverse anticancer therapeutics", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, PERGAMON, GB, vol. 19, no. 21, doi:10.1016/J.BMC.2011.09.024, ISSN 0968-0896, (20110913), pages 6167 - 6173, (20110917), XP028316306 [Y] 1,7,8,15,19-22,25 * items 2.5-2.6; page 6168, column right * * page 6172 - page 6173 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmc.2011.09.024 | [Y] - AMIT SINGH ET AL, "Combinatorial approach in the design of multifunctional polymeric nano-delivery systems for cancer therapy", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY B, GB, (20140101), vol. 2, no. 46, doi:10.1039/C4TB01083C, ISSN 2050-750X, pages 8069 - 8084, XP055240623 [Y] 1,7,8,15,19-22,25 * page 8078, column left, lines 6-7, paragraph 1 * * page 8078, column left, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C4TB01083C | [Y] - Fei Wu ET AL, "Development of dextran nanoparticles for stabilizing delicate proteins", Nanoscale Research Letters, New York, doi:10.1186/1556-276X-8-197, (20131201), pages 1 - 8, URL: https://www.researchgate.net/profile/Zhihua_Zhou3/publication/236457317_Development_of_dextran_nanoparticles_for_stabilizing_delicate_proteins/links/5521e7350cf2a2d9e1452394.pdf?origin=publication_detail&ev=pub_int_prw_xdl&msrp=dcE9m4OpnQ13znMwm2meL49iOJUBjRS5movxAOSAPifH1PP5Wy2aOn_uDyEadhiIiw-bvwb3, (20160113), XP055241159 [Y] 1,7,20-22,25 * page 3, paragraph left * * page 7, column right * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1556-276X-8-197 | [A] - Anonymous, Drying of Porous Materials, Springer, (2007), XP002753008 [A] 1-25 * page 22 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-1-4020-5480-8_3 | [A] - MICHELE F OLIVEIRA ET AL, "Strategies to target tumors using nanodelivery systems based on biodegradable polymers, aspects of intellectual property, and market", JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, SPRINGER-VERLAG, BERLIN/HEIDELBERG, (20121130), vol. 6, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S12154-012-0086-X, ISSN 1864-6166, pages 7 - 23, XP035158850 [A] 1-25 * page 11, column right, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12154-012-0086-x | [A] - Anonymous, Remington: The Science and Practice of Pharmacy, Lippincott Williams&Wilkins, (2000), XP002753009 [A] 1-25 * page 785, column left, paragraph 6 * | by applicant | AU2004305395B | EP20100749385 |