EP3149226 - DEPOSITION OF A PROTECTIVE COATING INCLUDING METAL AND CHROMIUM LAYERS ON ZIRCONIUM ALLOY FOR NUCLEAR POWER APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/14] | DEPOSITION OF A PROTECTIVE COATING INCLUDING METAL-CONTAINING AND CHROMIUM-CONTAINING LAYERS ON ZIRCONIUM ALLOY FOR NUCLEAR POWER APPLICATIONS | ||
[2019/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Westinghouse Electric Company LLC 1000 Westinghouse Drive Suite 141 Cranberry Township, PA 16066 / US | [2017/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAZZOCCOLI, Jason P. 230 Lebanon Avenue Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15228 / US | 02 /
XU, Peng 1805 Lake Carolina Drive Columbia, South Carolina 29229 / US | 03 /
RAY, Sumit 3 Lake Front Court Columbia, South Carolina 29212 / US | 04 /
LONG, Carroll J. Jr. 150 King Charles Road Columbia, South Carolina 29209 / US | 05 /
EDDY, Grant L. 2108 Raven Trail West Columbia, South Carolina 29169 / US | [2017/14] | Representative(s) | Gallo, Wolfgang Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Buchenweg 17 86573 Obergriesbach / DE | [2017/14] | Application number, filing date | 15799098.7 | 27.03.2015 | [2017/14] | WO2015US22898 | Priority number, date | US201414287435 | 27.05.2014 Original published format: US201414287435 | [2017/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015183396 | Date: | 03.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3149226 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3149226 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C23C28/02, C23C4/08, C25D5/10, C25D5/12, C23C16/06, C23C16/455, C23C18/16, G21C21/02, G21C3/07, G21C21/14, G21C21/16, C23C4/134, C23C14/16 | [2019/19] | CPC: |
G21C3/07 (EP,KR,US);
C23C28/023 (EP,KR,US);
C23C14/16 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/06 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/45525 (EP,US);
C23C16/45555 (KR);
C23C16/487 (US);
C23C16/515 (US);
C23C18/54 (US);
C23C28/021 (US);
C23C4/08 (EP,KR,US);
C23C4/131 (KR);
C23C4/134 (EP,KR,US);
G21C21/02 (EP,KR,US);
G21C21/14 (US);
G21C21/16 (US);
C23C18/1651 (EP,KR,US);
C25D5/12 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/47] | C23C28/02, C23C4/08, C25D5/10, C25D5/12, C23C16/06, C23C16/455, C23C18/16, G21C21/02 | ||
Former IPC [2017/14] | C23C28/02, C23C30/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABSCHEIDUNG EINER SCHUTZSCHICHT MIT METALL UND CHROM SCHICHTEN AUF ZIRKONLEGIERUNG FÜR KERNKRAFTANWENDUNGEN | [2019/19] | English: | DEPOSITION OF A PROTECTIVE COATING INCLUDING METAL AND CHROMIUM LAYERS ON ZIRCONIUM ALLOY FOR NUCLEAR POWER APPLICATIONS | [2019/19] | French: | DÉPÔT D'UN REVÊTEMENT PROTECTEUR COMPRENANT DES COUCHES DE MÉTAL ET DE CHROME SUR ALLIAGE DE ZIRCONIUM POUR DES APPLICATIONS DANS LE DOMAINE DE L'ÉNERGIE NUCLÉAIRE | [2019/19] |
Former [2017/14] | ABSCHEIDUNG EINER SCHUTZSCHICHT MIT METALLHALTIGEN UND CHROMHALTIGEN SCHICHTEN AUF ZIRKONLEGIERUNG FÜR KERNKRAFTANWENDUNGEN | ||
Former [2017/14] | DEPOSITION OF A PROTECTIVE COATING INCLUDING METAL-CONTAINING AND CHROMIUM-CONTAINING LAYERS ON ZIRCONIUM ALLOY FOR NUCLEAR POWER APPLICATIONS | ||
Former [2017/14] | DÉPÔT D'UN REVÊTEMENT PROTECTEUR COMPRENANT DES COUCHES CONTENANT UN MÉTAL ET DES COUCHES CONTENANT DU CHROME SUR ALLIAGE DE ZIRCONIUM POUR DES APPLICATIONS DANS LE DOMAINE DE L'ÉNERGIE NUCLÉAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/14] | 08.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.03.2015 | AL | 28.08.2019 | AT | 28.08.2019 | CY | 28.08.2019 | DK | 28.08.2019 | EE | 28.08.2019 | FI | 28.08.2019 | HR | 28.08.2019 | LT | 28.08.2019 | LV | 28.08.2019 | MC | 28.08.2019 | MK | 28.08.2019 | MT | 28.08.2019 | NL | 28.08.2019 | PL | 28.08.2019 | RO | 28.08.2019 | RS | 28.08.2019 | SI | 28.08.2019 | SK | 28.08.2019 | SM | 28.08.2019 | TR | 28.08.2019 | BG | 28.11.2019 | NO | 28.11.2019 | GR | 29.11.2019 | IS | 28.12.2019 | PT | 30.12.2019 | IE | 27.03.2020 | LU | 27.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 27.03.2015 | |
AL | 28.08.2019 | ||
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CY | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
MT | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IE | 27.03.2020 | ||
LU | 27.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IE | 27.03.2020 | ||
LU | 27.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IE | 27.03.2020 | ||
LU | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
LU | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 28.08.2019 | |
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | FI | 28.08.2019 | |
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 28.08.2019 | |
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 28.08.2019 | |
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 28.08.2019 | |
NO | 28.11.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US3310480 (HENRY BROWN) [Y] 10,11 * column 5, line 1 - line 22 * [A] 9; | [YA]US2006203952 (HETTIARACHCHI SAMSON [US], et al) [Y] 4,5 * paragraph [0012]; claims 1-20 * [A] 1-3,6-13; | [X]WO2013160587 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [X] 1-3,6-9,12 * figure 4; claims 1-41 *; | [XY]US2013344348 (KOO YANG-HYUN [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,6-9,12,13 * paragraphs [0034] - [0038] - [0 42] - [0043] - [0 98]; claims 1-29; table 1 * [Y] 4,5,10,11; | [A]US2014126683 (MAZZOCCOLI JASON P [US], et al) [A] 1-3,9-13* paragraphs [0010] - [0011]; claims 1-13 * | International search | [A]US4029545 (GORDON GERALD M, et al) [A] 1-13 * See abstract, column 5, line 40 - column 6, line 59 and figures 1, 2. *; | [A]US2012087457 (GARNIER JOHN E [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * See abstract, paragraphs [0029]-[0036] and figures 1A, 2A, 2B. *; | [A]US2013302639 (SONG KUN-WOO [KR], et al) [A] 1-13 * See abstract, paragraphs [0030]-[0049], claims 1-10 and figures 1, 2, 4. *; | [A]US2013344348 (KOO YANG-HYUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-13 * See abstract, paragraphs [0034]-[0043], claims 1-7 and figure 1. *; | [A] - VALEEVA, A. KH. et al., "Ni-based protective-lubricant coatings for zirconium alloys", Inorganic Materials: Applied Research, (20120500), vol. 3, no. Issue 3, ISSN 2075-1133, pages 226 - 230, XP055241660 [A] 1-13 * See abstract and page 226, column 1, line 1 - page 228, column 2, line 4. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1134/S2075113311030282 |