EP3148532 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMBINATION COMPRISING A CDK INHIBITOR AND A THIOREDOXIN REDUCTASE INHIBITOR FOR THE TREATMENT OF CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/14] | PHARMACEUTICAL COMBINATION FOR THE TREATMENT OF CANCER | ||
[2020/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Piramal Enterprises Limited Piramal Tower Ganpatrao Kadam Marg Lower Parel Mumbai 400 013 / IN | [2017/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ORWAR, Owe Askims Kyakva 6 S-43651 Hovas / SE | 02 /
SRINIVASA, Sreesha N104 Renaissance Exotica Jakkur Plantation Jakkuru, Bangalore Bangalore Karnataka 560064 / IN | 03 /
MISHRA, Prabha B-7/56 Century Rayon colony Shahad Kalyan Thane 421103 / IN | [2017/14] | Representative(s) | Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 JJ Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [2021/09] |
Former [2017/14] | Cummings, Ross Martin, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 J.J. Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | Application number, filing date | 15799889.9 | 27.05.2015 | [2017/14] | WO2015IB53963 | Priority number, date | US201462003575P | 28.05.2014 Original published format: US 201462003575 P | [2017/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015181737 | Date: | 03.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3148532 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3148532 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 03.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4025, A61K31/4412, A61K31/425, A61K31/513, A61K31/28, A61P35/00, A61K45/06, A61K31/41, A61K31/519, A61K31/553, A61K31/7135, A61K33/36 | [2018/01] | CPC: |
A61K31/4025 (EP,US);
A61K31/41 (EP,US);
A61K31/513 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/553 (EP,US);
A61K31/7135 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4025, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/41, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/513, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2017/14] | A61K31/4025, A61K31/4412, A61K31/425, A61K31/513, A61K31/28, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE KOMBINATION, DIE EINEN CDK-INHIBITOR UND EINEN THIOREDOXIN-REDUKTASE-INHIBITOR ENTHÄLT, ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | [2020/49] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMBINATION COMPRISING A CDK INHIBITOR AND A THIOREDOXIN REDUCTASE INHIBITOR FOR THE TREATMENT OF CANCER | [2020/49] | French: | ASSOCIATION PHARMACEUTIQUE COMPRENANT UN INHIBITEUR DE CDK ET UN INHIBITEUR DE THIORÉDOXINE RÉDUCTASE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER | [2020/49] |
Former [2017/14] | PHARMAZEUTISCHE KOMBINATIONEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | ||
Former [2017/14] | PHARMACEUTICAL COMBINATION FOR THE TREATMENT OF CANCER | ||
Former [2017/14] | ASSOCIATION PHARMACEUTIQUE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/14] | 20.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.05.2015 | AL | 03.03.2021 | AT | 03.03.2021 | CY | 03.03.2021 | CZ | 03.03.2021 | EE | 03.03.2021 | FI | 03.03.2021 | HR | 03.03.2021 | LT | 03.03.2021 | LV | 03.03.2021 | MC | 03.03.2021 | MK | 03.03.2021 | MT | 03.03.2021 | PL | 03.03.2021 | RO | 03.03.2021 | RS | 03.03.2021 | SI | 03.03.2021 | SK | 03.03.2021 | SM | 03.03.2021 | LU | 27.05.2021 | CH | 31.05.2021 | LI | 31.05.2021 | BG | 03.06.2021 | GR | 04.06.2021 | IS | 03.07.2021 | PT | 05.07.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 27.05.2015 | |
AL | 03.03.2021 | ||
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CY | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
MK | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 27.05.2015 | |
AL | 03.03.2021 | ||
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CY | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 27.05.2015 | |
AL | 03.03.2021 | ||
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
LT | 03.03.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - D. RATHKOPF ET AL, "Phase I Study of Flavopiridol with Oxaliplatin and Fluorouracil/Leucovorin in Advanced Solid Tumors", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20091124), vol. 15, no. 23, doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-09-1502, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 7405 - 7411, XP055428648 [X] 1,2,4,7-9,11,14 * abstract * * figure 1; table 4 * [I] 3,5,6,10,12,13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-09-1502 | [XI] - Michael J Pishvaian, "Abstract 5047: Synergistic anti-cancer activity of the CDK4/6 inhibitor PD-0332991 in combination with 5-fluorouracil-based chemotherapy in human colon cancer cells | Cancer Research", Cancer Research, doi:10.1158/1538-7445.AM10-5047, (20100415), URL: http://cancerres.aacrjournals.org/content/70/8_Supplement/5047, (20161024), XP055313469 [X] 1,2,4,7-9,11,14 * abstract * [I] 3,5,6,10,12,13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1538-7445.AM10-5047 | [XI] - BIBLE K C ET AL, "CYTOXIC SYNERGY BETWEEN FLAVOPIRIDOL (NSC 649890, l86-8275) AND VARIOUS ANTINEOPLASTIC AGENTS: THE IMPORTANCE OF SEQUENCE OF ADMINISTRATION", CANCER RESEARCH, AACR - AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (19970815), vol. 57, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 3375 - 3380, XP002128085 [X] 1,2,4,7-9,11,14 * abstract * * figure 2 * * page 3380, column 1, paragraph second but last * [I] 3,5,6,10,12,13 | [A] - MALINI GUHA, "Cyclin-dependent kinase inhibitors move into PhaseIII", NATURE REVIEWS. DRUG DISCOVERY, GB, (201212), vol. 11, no. 12, doi:10.1038/nrd3908, ISSN 1474-1776, pages 892 - 894, XP055428903 [A] 1-14 * page 894 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrd3908 | [A] - JONAS CICENAS ET AL, "The CDK inhibitors in cancer research and therapy", JOURNAL OF CANCER RESEARCH AND CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20110830), vol. 137, no. 10, doi:10.1007/S00432-011-1039-4, ISSN 1432-1335, pages 1409 - 1418, XP019951971 [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0001] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00432-011-1039-4 | International search | [A]WO2008057402 (CYTOVIA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * Abstract; paragraphs 1, 93; claims 17, 38 *; | [A]WO2009076170 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-14 * Abstract; page 5, xxxi; page 16, first complete paragraph; claims 1, 6 *; | [A]WO2009137378 (SCHERING CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * Abstract; page 4, line 20; page 5, line 9; page 8, line 10; page 24,line 29; page 26, line 6; claim 23 *; | [A]WO2010129858 (UNIV GEORGIA STATE RES FOUND [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * Abstract; page 2, lines 21-23; page 3 line 24; page 85, lines 14-18; page 88, line 30, figure 6, claim 40 *; | [A]WO2012125510 (GILEAD CALISTOGA LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * Paragraphs 49, 195, 256, claim 19 *; | [A]WO2012123889 (PIRAMAL HEALTHCARE LTD [IN], et al) [A] 1-14 * Abstract *; | [A]WO2012164497 (PIRAMAL ENTPR LTD [IN], et al) [A] 1-14* Abstract (Formula I) *; | [A] - LIU, Z-M. et al., "Suppression of TG-Interacting Factor Sensitizes Arsenic Trioxide- Induced Apoptosis in Human Hepatocellular Carcinoma Cells", Biochemical Journal, (20110000), vol. 438, pages 349 - 358, XP055361152 [A] 1-14 * Abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/BJ20101653 | by applicant | US5284856 | WO9720842 | WO03062236 | WO2004004632 | WO2004104007 | WO2005077954 | WO2007140222 | WO2007148158 | WO2010075074 | WO2012164497 | - BIBLEKAUFMANN, Cancer Res., (19970000), vol. 57, pages 3375 - 3380 | - D. RATHKOPF, Clin. Cancer Res, (20090000), vol. 15, pages 7405 - 7411 | - M.J.PISHAVIAN, Phase I study ofjlavopiridol with oxaliplatin andfluorouracillleucovorin in advance solid tumors | - Free Radic. Biol. Med., (20010000), vol. 31, page 1287 1312 | - Cent. Nerv. Syst. Agents Med. Chem., (20100000), vol. 10, no. 4, pages 287 - 297 | - Free Radic. Biol. Med., (20100000), vol. 49, no. 11, pages 1603 - 1616 | - Cancer Res., (20100000), vol. 70, page 440 | - J. Biol. Chem., (20020000), vol. 277, pages 39456 - 62 |