EP3346823 - AGROINDUSTRIAL PROCESS WITH MINIMAL ENVIRONMENTAL IMPACT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.09.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Industrie Rolli Alimentari S.p.A. Via Nazionale, 544 64026 Roseto degli Abruzzi (Teramo) / IT | [2018/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROLLI, Gian Paolo Via Dante Alighieri 36 43035 Felino (fraz San Michele di Tiorre) / IT | [2018/29] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [2018/29] | Application number, filing date | 15800986.0 | 11.09.2015 | [2018/29] | WO2015IT00220 | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017042841 | Date: | 16.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3346823 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C05F5/00, C12P5/02 | [2024/43] | CPC: |
C05F5/008 (EP,US);
A01G18/70 (US);
A01G22/00 (US);
C02F11/04 (US);
C02F3/2893 (US);
C05F17/50 (EP,US);
C05F7/00 (EP,US);
C12P5/023 (EP,US);
C02F2103/32 (US);
Y02A40/20 (EP,US);
Y02E50/30 (EP,US);
Y02P20/145 (US);
Y02W30/40 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/29] | A01G1/00, A01G1/04, C05F5/00, C12P5/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/29] | Title | German: | AGROINDUSTRIELLES VERFAHREN MIT MINIMALEM UMWELTEINFLUSS | [2018/29] | English: | AGROINDUSTRIAL PROCESS WITH MINIMAL ENVIRONMENTAL IMPACT | [2018/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ AGRO-INDUSTRIEL À IMPACT ENVIRONNEMENTAL MINIMAL | [2024/43] |
Former [2018/29] | PROCESSUS AGRO-INDUSTRIEL À L'IMPACT ENVIRONNEMENTAL MINIMAL | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/29] | 27.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4386159 (KANAI MASAKUNI [JP]); | [I]US2006006111 (HOLM STIG [SE], et al); | [Y]EP1914205 (TREVI NV [BE], et al); | [Y]DE102010004543 (LEIPZIGER TECHNOLOGIE SERVICE GMBH [DE]); |