EP3220882 - HAIR CARE COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING DEHYDROXANTHAN GUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2017/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LYONS, Kelly, Rose Kroger One Procter&Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | 02 /
HUGHES, Kendrick, Jon One Procter&Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | [2017/39] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire Theatinerstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/39] | Sauvaître, Thibault Bruno Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Patent Department Frankfurter Straße 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 15801095.9 | 17.11.2015 | [2017/39] | WO2015US61105 | Priority number, date | US201462082384P | 20.11.2014 Original published format: US 201462082384 P | [2017/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016081465 | Date: | 26.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3220882 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/42, A61Q5/06, A61K8/73 | [2017/39] | CPC: |
A61K8/73 (EP,CN,US);
A61K8/42 (EP,CN,US);
A61K8/34 (US);
A61K8/4926 (US);
A61K8/4953 (US);
A61Q5/06 (EP,CN,US);
A61K2800/592 (CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/39] | Title | German: | HAARPFLEGEZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT DEHYDROXANTHANGUMMI | [2017/39] | English: | HAIR CARE COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING DEHYDROXANTHAN GUM | [2017/39] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE SOINS DES CHEVEUX COMPRENANT DEHYDROXANTHAN-GUM | [2017/39] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/39] | 18.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.12.2020 | 24.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/15] | 04.12.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/15] | 14.12.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2013302267 (PEFFLY MARJORIE MOSSMAN [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0020] , [0 33] , [0 64] - [0079] * * Leave on Treatment 2; paragraph [0137]; example - *; | [I]US2006013785 (LAUSCHER DIRK [DE], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] - [0008] - [0 30] , [0 35] , [0 59] , [0 81] , [0 84] - [0087] * * example 3 *; | [A]US2009220445 (IWATA TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0009] - [0015] - [0 39] - [0053] - [0 86] * * examples 2-3 *; | [A]US2003108505 (CAO HONGJIE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102008029848 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0009] - [0 16] - [0035] - [0 95] * * tables 1, 2 * |