EP3224983 - A METHOD AND DEVICE FOR AUTHENTICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Belgian Mobile ID NV Rue due Marquis 1 1000 Bruxelles / BE | [2024/34] |
Former [2019/52] | For all designated states nextAuth NV Kapeldreef 60 3001 Leuven / BE | ||
Former [2017/40] | For all designated states Katholieke Universiteit Leuven K.U.Leuven R&D Waaistraat 6 Box 5105 3000 Leuven / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEETERS, Roel Johan Corneel c/o Katholieke Universiteit Leuven K.U. Leuven R&D Waaistraat 6 - box 5105 3000 Leuven / BE | 02 /
HERMANS, Jens c/o Katholieke Universiteit Leuven K.U. Leuven R&D Waaistraat 6 - box 5105 3000 Leuven / BE | [2017/40] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 Carnegieplein 5 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2017/40] | Application number, filing date | 15801472.0 | 30.11.2015 | [2017/40] | WO2015EP78077 | Priority number, date | GB20140021130 | 28.11.2014 Original published format: GB 201421130 | GB20150001071 | 22.01.2015 Original published format: GB 201501071 | [2017/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016083618 | Date: | 02.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3224983 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3224983 | Date: | 04.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/08, H04L9/32 | [2017/40] | CPC: |
H04L9/3236 (EP,US);
H04L63/0435 (US);
H04L9/0822 (EP,US);
H04L9/0869 (US);
H04L9/3221 (US);
H04L9/3226 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2017/40] | English: | A METHOD AND DEVICE FOR AUTHENTICATION | [2017/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'AUTHENTIFICATION | [2017/40] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 19.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 14.03.2018 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 17.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | 17.05.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 17.05.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.05.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2002141575 (HIRD GEOFFREY R [US]); | [I]US2005081041 (HWANG JING-JANG [TW]); | [I]US6950523 (BRICKELL ERNIE [US], et al) |