EP3151858 - ANTIBODY GUIDED VACCINES AND METHODS OF USE FOR GENERATION OF RAPID MATURE IMMUNE RESPONSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the University of Arkansas 2404 North University Avenue Little Rock, AR 72207 / US | For all designated states The Texas A&M University System 3369 TAMU College Station, TX 77843-3369 / US | [2017/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGHMAN, Luc 1207 Martinsville Lane College Station, TX 77845 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Chang-Hsin 1001 Harvey Road 12 College Station, TX 77840 / US | 03 /
CHOU, Wen-Ko 79 Donald St., Apt 54 Weymouth, MA 02188 / US | 04 /
VUONG, Christine 1602 S. College Ave., Apt. 8 Bryan, TX 77801 / US | 05 /
WAGHELA, Suryakant 3917 Puffin Way College Station, TX 77845 / US | 06 /
MWANGI, Waithaka 3453 Chimney Rock Rd. Manhattan, KS 66503 / US | 07 /
HARGIS, Billy 3229 Oakland Zion Road Fayetteville, AR 72703 / US | 08 /
ABI-GHANEM, Daad 15169 SW Royalty Parkway H31 Tigard, OR 97224 / US | 09 /
BIELKE, Lisa 1680 Madison Avenue 202 Gerlaugh Hall Wooster, OH 44691 / US | [2017/15] | Representative(s) | Kremer, Simon Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/15] | Kremer, Simon Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 15802830.8 | 04.06.2015 | [2017/15] | WO2015US34229 | Priority number, date | US201462008178P | 05.06.2014 Original published format: US 201462008178 P | [2017/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015187969 | Date: | 10.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3151858 | Date: | 12.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395 | [2017/15] | CPC: |
C07K16/1018 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K39/39 (CN,KR,US);
A61K39/12 (CN);
A61K39/145 (KR,US);
A61K47/36 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/6881 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0048 (EP,US);
A61K9/0056 (EP,US);
A61K9/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/10 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
C07K16/1282 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K16/2878 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G01N33/6878 (US);
A61K2039/505 (US);
A61K2039/5252 (CN,US);
A61K2039/54 (US);
A61K2039/542 (CN,US);
A61K2039/543 (CN,US);
A61K2039/552 (US);
A61K2039/55516 (CN,US);
A61K2039/575 (US);
A61K2039/6056 (US);
A61K2039/6087 (US);
A61K2039/625 (US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K2317/55 (US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K2317/75 (EP,CN,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K39/12, A61K2300/00 (CN);
A61K39/39, A61K2300/00 (CN) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/15] | Title | German: | ANTIKÖRPERGEFÜHRTE IMPFSTOFFE UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON SCHNELLEN REIFEN IMMUNREAKTIONEN | [2017/15] | English: | ANTIBODY GUIDED VACCINES AND METHODS OF USE FOR GENERATION OF RAPID MATURE IMMUNE RESPONSES | [2017/15] | French: | VACCINS GUIDÉS PAR ANTICORPS ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION DANS LA GÉNÉRATION DE RÉPONSES IMMUNES MATURES RAPIDES | [2017/15] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/15] | 19.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/03] | 03.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2010104761 (BAYLOR RES INST [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-56 *; | [YA]WO2011156619 (UNIV ARKANSAS [US], et al) [Y] 6-14 * the whole document * [A] 1-5,15; | [A]WO2012041635 (UNIV LIEGE [BE], et al) [A] 1-15* claims 1-16 *; | [A] - ELLMARK P ET AL, "Modulation of the CD40-CD40 ligand interaction using human anti-CD40 single-chain antibody fragments obtained from the n-CoDeR phage display library", IMMUNOLOGY, WILEY-BLACKWELL PUBLISHING LTD, GB, (20020801), vol. 106, no. 4, doi:10.1046/J.1365-2567.2002.01473.X, ISSN 0019-2805, pages 456 - 463, XP002326342 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2567.2002.01473.x | [A] - BARR T A ET AL, "A potent adjuvant effect of CD40 antibody attached to antigen", IMMUNOLOGY, WILEY-BLACKWELL PUBLISHING LTD, GB, (20030501), vol. 109, no. 1, doi:10.1046/J.1365-2567.2003.01634.X, ISSN 0019-2805, pages 87 - 92, XP002271094 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2567.2003.01634.x | [A] - O'MEARA K M ET AL, "Evaluation of recombinant Salmonella expressing CD154 for persistence and enhanced antibody response in commercial turkeys", vol. 89, no. 7, doi:10.3382/PS.2010-00697, ISSN 0032-5791, (20100630), pages 1399 - 1405, POULTRY SCIENCE, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, OXFORD, URL: https://academic.oup.com/ps/article-lookup/doi/10.3382/ps.2010-00697, (20100614), XP009502147 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3382/ps.2010-00697 | [XY] - CHEN C H ET AL, "Production and characterization of agonistic monoclonal antibodies against chicken CD40", DEVELOPMENTAL AND COMPARATIVE IMMUNOLOGY, PERGAMON PRESS, US, vol. 34, no. 11, ISSN 0145-305X, (20101101), pages 1139 - 1143, (20100703), XP027266344 [X] 5 * the whole document * [Y] 6-14 | [XAY] - CHANG-HSIN CHEN ET AL, "Immunization of chickens with an agonistic monoclonal anti-chicken CD40 antibody-hapten complex: Rapid and robust IgG response induced by a single subcutaneous injection", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS., NL, (20120401), vol. 378, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/j.jim.2012.02.006, ISSN 0022-1759, pages 116 - 120, XP055431953 [X] 5-10 * the whole document * [A] 1-4,15 [Y] 6-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jim.2012.02.006 | International search | [A]US2003099644 (AHUJA SEEMA A [US], et al) [A] 1-3* para [0012], [0108], [0113], [0359] *; | [X]US2011236393 (HWANG KWAN-KI [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * para [0009], [0060], [0081], [0147]. [0172], [0192], [0193], [0224] * |