EP3151734 - CUSTOM EARLY WARNING SCORING FOR MEDICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Welch Allyn, Inc. 4341 State Street Road Skaneateles Falls, NY 13153-0220 / US | [2017/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ST. PIERRE, Shawn C. c/o Welch Allyn, Inc. Attn: Legal Department 4341 State Street Road Skaneateles Falls, NY 13153-0220 / US | 02 /
ALISANSKI, Kristin A. c/o Welch Allyn, Inc. Attn: Legal Department 4341 State Street Road Skaneateles Falls, NY 13153-0220 / US | 03 /
LOMASCOLO, Frank c/o Welch Allyn, Inc. Attn: Legal Department 4341 State Street Road Skaneateles Falls, NY 13153-0220 / US | 04 /
KING, Catherine M. c/o Welch Allyn, Inc. Attn: Legal Department 4341 State Street Road Skaneateles Falls, NY 13153-0220 / US | 05 /
COLES, Kathryn M. c/o Welch Allyn, Inc. Attn: Legal Department 4341 State Street Road Skaneateles Falls, NY 13153-0220 / US | 06 /
MYERS, Thomas A. c/o Welch Allyn, Inc. Attn: Legal Department 4341 State Street Road Skaneateles Falls, NY 13153-0220 / US | [2017/15] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/15] | Pronovem Pronovem Luxembourg 12, avenue du Rock n' Roll BP 327 4004 Esch sur Alzette / LU | Application number, filing date | 15803570.9 | 20.05.2015 | [2017/15] | WO2015US31770 | Priority number, date | US201462007302P | 03.06.2014 Original published format: US 201462007302 P | US201414528487 | 30.10.2014 Original published format: US201414528487 | [2017/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015187370 | Date: | 10.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3151734 | Date: | 12.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/0205 | [2018/03] | CPC: |
A61B5/7275 (EP,US);
A61B5/02055 (EP,US);
A61B5/742 (EP,US);
G16H40/20 (EP,US);
G16H40/67 (EP,US);
G16H50/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/15] | A61B5/00, A61B5/01, A61B5/021, A61B5/024, A61B5/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/15] | Title | German: | PERSONALISIERTE FRÜHWARNUNGSBEWERTUNG FÜR MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2017/15] | English: | CUSTOM EARLY WARNING SCORING FOR MEDICAL DEVICE | [2017/15] | French: | RÉSULTAT D'AVERTISSEMENT PRÉCOCE PERSONNALISÉ POUR DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL | [2017/15] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 13.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/15] | 13.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/17] | 21.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2021 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2392303 (HILL ROM SERVICES INC [US]) [X] 1-7,9-11,15 * paragraphs [0041] - [0068]; figures 5-7 * [I] 8; | [I] - WILLIAMS C ET AL, "Criteria for ICU admission and severity of illness scoring", SURGERY, MEDICINE PUBLISHING, ABINGTON. / ELSEVIER IMPRINT, GB, vol. 27, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.MPSUR.2009.04.006, ISSN 0263-9319, (20090501), pages 201 - 206, (20090609), XP026221096 [I] 1-11,15 * tables 1,4,5 * * Item"Physiological scores" on pages 204-206. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mpsur.2009.04.006 | [I] - BRABRAND MIKKEL ET AL, "Risk scoring systems for adults admitted to the emergency department: a systematic review", SCANDINAVIAN JOURNAL OF TRAUMA, RESUSCITATION AND EMERGENCY MEDICINE, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD, LONDON UK, (20100211), vol. 18, no. 1, ISSN 1757-7241, page 8, XP021070543 [I] 1-11,15 * tables 1,2 * | International search | [XY]WO2014071145 (UNIV CHICAGO [US]) [X] 16-19 * See abstract, paragraphs [0008]-[0024],[0055]-[0157] and figures 1-12. * [Y] 1-15, 20; | [Y]US2013027411 (HEBLER SEBASTIAN [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15, 20 * See abstract, paragraphs [0028]-[0031] and figures 1-11. *; | [A]WO2012140547 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-20 * See abstract, claims 1-20 and figures 1-13. *; | [A]US2009216556 (MARTIN NEIL [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See abstract, claims 1-24 and figures 1-25. *; | [A]WO2008045577 (MICHAEL ROTHMAN & ASSOCIATES [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See abstract, pages 2-10 and figures 1-7. * |