EP3153766 - LIGHT SOURCE DEVICE AND IMAGE DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2017/15] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAMATSU, Takashi c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2017/15] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/15] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 15803881.0 | 13.04.2015 | [2017/15] | WO2015JP02046 | Priority number, date | JP20140114620 | 03.06.2014 Original published format: JP 2014114620 | [2017/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015186290 | Date: | 10.12.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3153766 | Date: | 12.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3153766 | Date: | 07.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G03B21/14, F21V29/503, G03B21/20, G03B21/16, F28D15/02 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
G03B21/16 (EP,KR,US);
F21S2/005 (KR);
F21S2/00 (EP,US);
F21V29/503 (EP,KR,US);
F21V29/51 (US);
F21V29/76 (EP,KR,US);
F28D15/0275 (EP,US);
G03B21/145 (EP);
G03B21/20 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/03] | F21V29/503, G03B21/16, F21Y101/00, G03B21/20 | ||
Former IPC [2017/15] | F21S2/00, F21V29/503, F21V29/76, G03B21/00, G03B21/16, H04N5/74, H05K7/20, F21Y101/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LICHTQUELLENVORRICHTUNG UND BILDANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2017/15] | English: | LIGHT SOURCE DEVICE AND IMAGE DISPLAY DEVICE | [2017/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF SOURCE DE LUMIÈRE ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGE | [2017/15] | Entry into regional phase | 01.11.2016 | Translation filed | 26.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/15] | 05.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.04.2015 | AL | 07.04.2021 | AT | 07.04.2021 | CY | 07.04.2021 | CZ | 07.04.2021 | DK | 07.04.2021 | EE | 07.04.2021 | ES | 07.04.2021 | FI | 07.04.2021 | HR | 07.04.2021 | IT | 07.04.2021 | LT | 07.04.2021 | LV | 07.04.2021 | MC | 07.04.2021 | MK | 07.04.2021 | MT | 07.04.2021 | NL | 07.04.2021 | PL | 07.04.2021 | RO | 07.04.2021 | RS | 07.04.2021 | SE | 07.04.2021 | SI | 07.04.2021 | SK | 07.04.2021 | SM | 07.04.2021 | IE | 13.04.2021 | LU | 13.04.2021 | BE | 30.04.2021 | CH | 30.04.2021 | LI | 30.04.2021 | BG | 07.07.2021 | GB | 07.07.2021 | NO | 07.07.2021 | GR | 08.07.2021 | IS | 07.08.2021 | PT | 09.08.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 13.04.2015 | |
AL | 07.04.2021 | ||
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CY | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
MK | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
GB | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 13.04.2015 | |
AL | 07.04.2021 | ||
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CY | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
GB | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 13.04.2015 | |
AL | 07.04.2021 | ||
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
GB | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
GB | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
GB | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
GB | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
GB | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
GB | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
GB | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2006262821 (WITTENBERG CARL [US]) [X] 1-4,7,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0062] - [0067] * [Y] 5-9; | [Y]JP2010225874 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 5-8 * abstract ** paragraphs [0020] - [0025]; figure 1 *; | [XY]JP2014059515 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) [X] 1-5,7,9 * paragraphs [0044] - [0058]; figures 5,7,8,11 * [Y] 9 | International search | [YA]JP2005024964 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [Y] 1, 2, 4-9 * , paragraphs [0018] to [0019], [0027] to [0028]; fig. 1, 4 (Family: none) * [A] 3; | [YA]JP2010225874 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 1, 2, 4-9 * , paragraphs [0020] to [0023]; fig. 1 (Family: none) * [A] 3; | [Y]JP2012186358 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 7-8* , paragraphs [0025] to [0028]; fig. 4 to 5 (Family: none) * |