EP3229939 - PROCESS AND PLANT FOR THE PURIFICATION OF RAW SYNTHESIS GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Air Liquide Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/42] | For all designated states L'Air Liquide Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEYER, Manfred Falkenweg 5 61381 Friedrichsdorf / DE | [2017/42] | Representative(s) | Dropsch, Holger Air Liquide Forschung und Entwicklung GmbH Gwinnerstraße 27-33 60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2017/42] | Application number, filing date | 15804073.3 | 26.11.2015 | [2017/42] | WO2015EP25092 | Priority number, date | DE201410118345 | 10.12.2014 Original published format: DE102014118345 | [2017/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016091393 | Date: | 16.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3229939 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3229939 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/14, C01B3/52 | [2020/14] | CPC: |
B01D53/1406 (EP,CN,US);
B01D53/1425 (CN,US);
B01D53/1462 (EP,CN,US);
B01D53/1487 (EP,CN,US);
B01D53/1493 (CN,US);
B01D53/185 (US);
C01B3/02 (US);
C01B3/52 (EP,US);
C10J3/02 (US);
C10K1/002 (US);
C10K1/004 (US);
C10K1/005 (US);
C10K1/102 (CN);
B01D2252/2021 (EP,CN,US);
B01D2257/304 (EP,US);
B01D2257/306 (EP,CN,US);
B01D2257/308 (EP,CN,US);
B01D2257/408 (EP,US);
B01D2257/504 (EP,US);
B01D2257/7027 (CN);
C01B2203/0415 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0475 (EP,US);
C01B2203/048 (US);
C01B2203/0485 (EP,US);
C01B2203/147 (US);
C10J2300/093 (US);
Y02C20/40 (US);
Y02P20/151 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/42] | B01D53/14, C07C7/11 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANLAGE ZUR REINIGUNG VON ROHSYNTHESEGAS | [2017/42] | English: | PROCESS AND PLANT FOR THE PURIFICATION OF RAW SYNTHESIS GAS | [2017/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET INSTALLATION POUR LA PURIFICATION DE GAZ DE SYNTHÈSE BRUT | [2017/42] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/42] | 04.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.11.2015 | AL | 10.06.2020 | AT | 10.06.2020 | CY | 10.06.2020 | CZ | 10.06.2020 | DK | 10.06.2020 | EE | 10.06.2020 | ES | 10.06.2020 | FI | 10.06.2020 | HR | 10.06.2020 | IT | 10.06.2020 | LT | 10.06.2020 | LV | 10.06.2020 | MC | 10.06.2020 | MK | 10.06.2020 | MT | 10.06.2020 | RO | 10.06.2020 | RS | 10.06.2020 | SE | 10.06.2020 | SI | 10.06.2020 | SK | 10.06.2020 | SM | 10.06.2020 | TR | 10.06.2020 | BG | 10.09.2020 | NO | 10.09.2020 | GR | 11.09.2020 | IS | 10.10.2020 | PT | 12.10.2020 | IE | 26.11.2020 | LU | 26.11.2020 | CH | 30.11.2020 | LI | 30.11.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 26.11.2015 | |
AL | 10.06.2020 | ||
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CY | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
MT | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
TR | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
IE | 26.11.2020 | ||
LU | 26.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
IE | 26.11.2020 | ||
LU | 26.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
LU | 26.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
LU | 26.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 10.06.2020 | |
NO | 10.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102006056117 (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [IA]US2012202897 (KESKINEN KARI I [FI], et al) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0013] * [A] 11; | [X]US2012251418 (SIEDER GEORG [DE], et al) [X] 11 * figure 3 *; | [A]US2013053456 (WAHLSTROEM JAN [FI], et al) [A] 1-11* the whole document * |