EP3230443 - DETERGENTS AND CLEANING AGENTS COMPRISING A COMBINATION OF AMYLASE AND PROTEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2021/29] |
Former [2017/42] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANTIR, Marouane Liebergerweg 72-76 1221 JT Hilversum / NL | 02 /
SCHÜMANN, Sabine Neukirchener Str. 37 a 41470 Neuss / DE | 03 /
BASTIGKEIT, Thorsten Gennebrecker Str. 248 42279 Wuppertal / DE | 04 /
SEILER, Martina Haraldstr. 30 47228 Duisburg / DE | 05 /
O'CONNELL, Timothy Peter-Roos-Str. 16 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [2017/42] | Application number, filing date | 15804109.5 | 01.12.2015 | [2017/42] | WO2015EP78166 | Priority number, date | DE201410225473 | 10.12.2014 Original published format: DE102014225473 | [2017/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016091650 | Date: | 16.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3230443 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3230443 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/28 | [2017/42] | CPC: |
C11D3/386 (EP,RU,US);
C11D3/38636 (KR);
C12N9/2417 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C12N9/50 (KR,US);
C12N9/52 (RU);
C12N9/54 (EP,RU,US);
C12Y302/01001 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C12Y304/21062 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C11D2111/12 (KR);
C11D2111/14 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASCH- UND REINIGUNGSMITTEL MIT EINER KOMBINATION AUS AMYLASE UND PROTEASE | [2017/42] | English: | DETERGENTS AND CLEANING AGENTS COMPRISING A COMBINATION OF AMYLASE AND PROTEASE | [2017/42] | French: | AGENT DE LAVAGE ET DE NETTOYAGE AVEC UNE COMBINAISON D'AMYLASE ET DE PROTÉASE | [2017/42] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/42] | 30.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.04.2022
22.04.2022
ADMISSIBLE Novozymes A/S Krogshøjvej 36 2880 Bagsværd / DK Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | 02
21.04.2022
27.04.2022
ADMISSIBLE Danisco US Inc. 925 Page Mill Road Palo Alto CA 94304-1013 / US Opponent's representative Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/22] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.04.2022
22.04.2022
ADMISSIBLE Novozymes A/S Krogshøjvej 36 2880 Bagsværd / DK Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
02
21.04.2022
27.04.2022
ADMISSIBLE Danisco US Inc. 925 Page Mill Road Palo Alto CA 94304-1013 / US Opponent's representative Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | |||
Former [2022/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.04.2022
Novozymes A/S Krogshøjvej 36 2880 Bagsværd / DK Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | 09.05.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.08.2022 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.02.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.12.2015 | AL | 21.07.2021 | CY | 21.07.2021 | CZ | 21.07.2021 | EE | 21.07.2021 | FI | 21.07.2021 | HR | 21.07.2021 | LT | 21.07.2021 | LV | 21.07.2021 | MC | 21.07.2021 | MK | 21.07.2021 | NL | 21.07.2021 | RO | 21.07.2021 | RS | 21.07.2021 | SE | 21.07.2021 | SI | 21.07.2021 | SK | 21.07.2021 | SM | 21.07.2021 | BG | 21.10.2021 | NO | 21.10.2021 | GR | 22.10.2021 | IS | 21.11.2021 | PT | 22.11.2021 | AT | 01.12.2021 | IE | 01.12.2021 | LU | 01.12.2021 | BE | 31.12.2021 | CH | 31.12.2021 | LI | 31.12.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/30] | HU | 01.12.2015 | |
AL | 21.07.2021 | ||
CY | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
IE | 01.12.2021 | ||
LU | 01.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 01.12.2015 | |
AL | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
IE | 01.12.2021 | ||
LU | 01.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
IE | 01.12.2021 | ||
LU | 01.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
IE | 01.12.2021 | ||
LU | 01.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
IE | 01.12.2021 | ||
LU | 01.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
IE | 01.12.2021 | ||
LU | 01.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
LU | 01.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | CZ | 21.07.2021 | |
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 21.07.2021 | |
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | FI | 21.07.2021 | |
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 21.07.2021 | |
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 21.07.2021 | |
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 21.07.2021 | |
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9963040 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [Y] 1-11 * example 1 * * page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraph 3 *; | [A]EP2100948 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2011100410 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * table IV * * page 2 - page 3 * * page 32, line 11 - line 16 *; | [Y]EP2679679 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] , [0015] - [0017] *; | [YP]WO2015044448 (NOVOZYMES AS [DK]) [YP] 1-11 * page 3, line 8 - line 9 * * page 2, line 34 - line 36 ** sequences 1,2 *; | [A] - "Alkaline protease variant R99E, SEQ ID 3.", Geneseq, (20140508), Database accession no. BBD44632, URL: EBI, XP002753532 [A] 1-11 * sequence . * | Opposition | WO9523221 | WO2011036263 | US2014018282 | WO2014183920 | WO2015044448 | WO2015149641 |