EP3226672 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR THE AUTOMATIC ADJUSTMENT OF THE HEIGHT OF AN AGRICULTURAL IMPLEMENT USING 3D RECONSTRUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives 25, Rue Leblanc Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | [2017/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRIQUET-KERESTEDJIAN, Nolwenn 7 rue Daguerre 75014 Paris / FR | 02 /
COLLEDANI, Frédéric 14 allée Jules Guesde 91300 Massy / FR | 03 /
LELONG, Baptiste 9 rue de Mirefleurs 63730 Les Martres de Veyre / FR | 04 /
SAYD, Patrick Résidence Le Grimpré 91140 Villebon sur Yvette / FR | [2017/41] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/41] | Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 15804457.8 | 02.12.2015 | [2017/41] | WO2015EP78386 | Priority number, date | FR20140062003 | 05.12.2014 Original published format: FR 1462003 | [2017/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016087529 | Date: | 09.06.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3226672 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3226672 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/48] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP3226672 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A01B63/10, A01D41/14, A01D45/02 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
A01B63/10 (EP,US);
A01D75/00 (US);
A01B63/008 (US);
A01B63/02 (US);
A01D47/00 (EP,US);
G06T7/593 (US);
H04N13/204 (US);
B60R2300/107 (US);
B60R2300/303 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/41] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN HÖHENVERSTELLUNG EINES LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHEN ANBAUGERÄTS MIT 3D-REKONSTRUKTION | [2017/41] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR THE AUTOMATIC ADJUSTMENT OF THE HEIGHT OF AN AGRICULTURAL IMPLEMENT USING 3D RECONSTRUCTION | [2017/41] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'AJUSTEMENT AUTOMATIQUE DE LA HAUTEUR D'UN OUTIL AGRICOLE AU MOYEN D'UNE RECONSTRUCTION 3D | [2017/41] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/41] | 06.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.08.2019
22.08.2019
ADMISSIBLE Deere & Company/John Deere GmbH & Co. KG One John Deere Place/John-Deere-Str. 70 Moline, Il 61265/US/68163 Mannheim/DE / US Opponent's representative Holst, Sönke John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2019/39] | 09.09.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.01.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 13.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 07.09.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.11.2021 | 18.11.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.12.2021 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.12.2021 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 17.06.2022 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.12.2015 | AL | 28.11.2018 | AT | 28.11.2018 | CY | 28.11.2018 | CZ | 28.11.2018 | DK | 28.11.2018 | EE | 28.11.2018 | ES | 28.11.2018 | FI | 28.11.2018 | HR | 28.11.2018 | IT | 28.11.2018 | LT | 28.11.2018 | LV | 28.11.2018 | MC | 28.11.2018 | MK | 28.11.2018 | MT | 28.11.2018 | NL | 28.11.2018 | PL | 28.11.2018 | RO | 28.11.2018 | RS | 28.11.2018 | SE | 28.11.2018 | SI | 28.11.2018 | SK | 28.11.2018 | SM | 28.11.2018 | TR | 28.11.2018 | IE | 02.12.2018 | LU | 02.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | BG | 28.02.2019 | NO | 28.02.2019 | GR | 01.03.2019 | IS | 28.03.2019 | PT | 28.03.2019 | GB | 02.12.2019 | [2020/48] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 02.12.2015 | |
AL | 28.11.2018 | ||
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CY | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
MK | 28.11.2018 | ||
MT | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IE | 02.12.2018 | ||
LU | 02.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
MT | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IE | 02.12.2018 | ||
LU | 02.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
MT | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
IE | 02.12.2018 | ||
LU | 02.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
IE | 02.12.2018 | ||
LU | 02.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
IE | 02.12.2018 | ||
LU | 02.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
IE | 02.12.2018 | ||
LU | 02.12.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
LU | 02.12.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
LU | 02.12.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 28.11.2018 | |
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 28.11.2018 | |
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 28.11.2018 | |
NO | 28.02.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]AU5387473 (JOHN NICHOLLS) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [AD]US8381502 (DUNN WALTER [US]) [AD] 1-13 * column 5, line 16 - column 6, line 23 * * figures 6,7 *; | [A]US2013345937 (STRELIOFF WILLIAM [CA], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0025] * * figures 2,4 *; | [A]US2014236381 (ANDERSON NOEL W [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0072] ** figure 9 * | Opposition | DE4411646 | EP1269823 | DE10212722 | WO2006063314 | EP2340701 | US2013116894 | WO2014108550 | - D. FONT et al., "A proposal for Automatic Fruit Harvesting by Combining a Low Cost Stereovision Camera and a Robotic Arm", Sensors, (20140630), vol. 14, no. 7, pages 11557 - 11579, XP055637475 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/s140711557 | - K. HANAWA et al., "Development of a Stereo Vision System to Assist the Operation of Agricultural Tractors", JARQ, (20120000), vol. 46, no. 4, pages 287 - 293, XP055637479 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.6090/jarq.46.287 | - M. KISE et al., "A stereovision-based crop row detection method for tractor- automated guidance", Biosystems Engineering, (20050000), vol. 90, doi:10.1016/j.biosystemseng.2004.12.008, pages 357 - 367, XP004820062 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biosystemseng.2004.12.008 | - M. KISE et al., "Development of a stereovision sensing system for 3D crop row structure mapping and tractor guidance", Biosystems Engineering, (20080000), vol. 101, doi:10.1016/j.biosystemseng.2008.08.001, pages 191 - 198, XP025505711 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biosystemseng.2008.08.001 |