EP3227146 - POWER CONTROL APPARATUS FOR A LOAD IN A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2017/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAF, Rolf Tannenwaldstr. 2 61479 Glashütten / DE | 02 /
BLUDAU, Matthias Gerhart-Hauptmann-Str. 8 a 64589 Stockstadt a. R. / DE | [2017/41] | Application number, filing date | 15804751.4 | 02.12.2015 | [2017/41] | WO2015EP78404 | Priority number, date | DE201410224818 | 03.12.2014 Original published format: DE102014224818 | DE201510201315 | 27.01.2015 Original published format: DE102015201315 | [2017/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016087543 | Date: | 09.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3227146 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/023, B60R16/03, F02D41/22, F02D41/30, H02H7/08 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
F02D41/22 (EP,CN,US);
B60W30/1884 (US);
B60R16/0232 (EP,US);
B60R16/03 (EP,US);
B60W30/1882 (US);
B66C13/24 (US);
B66C13/40 (US);
F02D41/222 (EP,US);
F02D41/266 (EP,CN,US);
F02D41/3082 (EP,CN,US);
H02H7/0844 (EP,US);
F02D2200/50 (EP,CN,US);
F02D41/3845 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/41] | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN VERBRAUCHER IN EINEM FAHRZEUG | [2017/41] | English: | POWER CONTROL APPARATUS FOR A LOAD IN A VEHICLE | [2017/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE PUISSANCE POUR UN CONSOMMATEUR DANS UN VÉHICULE | [2017/41] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/41] | 25.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/29] | 02.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2018/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5313923 (TAKEUCHI SHIGERU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * column 5, line 63 - column 6, line 11 * * column 8, line 17 - line 19 * * column 8, line 65 - column 9, line 1 *; | [A]WO2007031463 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,11 * abstract * * page 2, line 10 - line 21 * * page 5, line 7 - line 10 *; | [Y]DE102012017675 (AUDI AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0015] - [0019] , [0020] *; | [A]US8707932 (MARIN ZELJKO [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * column 9, line 63 - column 10, line 21 ** column 13, line 29 - line 54 *; | [AP]WO2015055559 (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [AP] 1,11 * abstract * * page 5, line 29 - line 37 * |