EP3213271 - EVENT PREDICTION IN A SYSTEM OF CONNECTED ENTITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orange 111, quai du Président Roosevelt 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/30] | For all designated states ORANGE 111, quai du Président Roosevelt 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | ||
Former [2020/27] | For all designated states ORANGE 78 rue Olivier de Serres 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2017/36] | For all designated states Orange 78, rue Olivier de Serres 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZANNE, Benoît 8 rue de la Ronco 92410 Ville d'Avray / FR | 02 /
GALLOYER, Jérôme 6bis quai de la Marine 93450 L'Ile Saint Denis / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/36] | 01 /
SUZANNE, Benoît 52/54 rue Raymond Poincaré 92000 Nanterre / FR | ||
02 /
GALLOYER, Jérôme 6bis quai de la Marine 93450 L'Ile Saint Denis / FR | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2017/36] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 15804870.2 | 16.10.2015 | [2017/36] | WO2015FR52784 | Priority number, date | FR20140060308 | 27.10.2014 Original published format: FR 1460308 | [2017/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016066921 | Date: | 06.05.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3213271 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06 | [2017/36] | CPC: |
G06Q10/063116 (EP,US);
G06Q10/04 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
H04L12/4625 (EP,US);
H04L67/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/36] | Title | German: | EREIGNISVORHERSAGE IN EINEM SYSTEM AUS VERBUNDENEN EINHEITEN | [2017/36] | English: | EVENT PREDICTION IN A SYSTEM OF CONNECTED ENTITIES | [2017/36] | French: | PRÉDICTION D'ÉVÉNEMENT DANS UN SYSTÈME D'ENTITÉS CONNECTÉES | [2017/36] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/36] | 18.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.06.2021 | 17.06.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/49] | 01.08.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2014129966 (BIOMACHINES PTE LTD [SG]) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0094] * * figures 1, 3, 6, 10 *; | [I]US2014258363 (PECO FARJOLA [SE], et al) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0094] ** figures 1-12 * |