EP3230267 - FIVE-MEMBERED C-N LINKED ARYLSULFIDE AND ARYLSULFOXIDE DERIVATIVES AS PESTICIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/42] | FIVE-MEMBERED C-N BONDED ARYL SULPHIDE AND ARYL SULPHOXIDE DERIVATIVES AS PEST CONTROL AGENTS | ||
[2018/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience Aktiengesellschaft Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [2017/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CEREZO-GALVEZ, Silvia Pestalozzistr. 39a 40764 Langenfeld / DE | 02 /
ALIG, Bernd Im Rothsiefen 7 53639 Königswinter / DE | 03 /
FISCHER, Reiner Nelly-Sachs-Str. 23 40789 Monheim / DE | 04 /
HAHN, Julia Johanna Einsteinstrasse 38 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | 05 /
HARSCHNECK, Tobias Am Botanischen Garten 11 40225 Düsseldorf / DE | 06 /
WILCKE, David Friedenstr. 39 40219 Düsseldorf / DE | 07 /
ILG, Kerstin Neusser Wall 32 50670 Köln / DE | 08 /
MALSAM, Olga Vor dem Klosterhof 19 51503 Rösrath / DE | 09 /
LÖSEL, Peter Am Schokker 5 51371 Leverkusen / DE | 10 /
KÖHLER, Adeline Heimchenweg 9 40764 Langenfeld / DE | 11 /
PORTZ, Daniela Oststr. 1 52391 Vettweiß / DE | 12 /
GÖRGENS, Ulrich Fester Str. 37 40882 Ratingen / DE | 13 /
EILMUS, Sascha Neuenkamp 9a 42799 Leichlingen / DE | [2017/42] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/42] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 15805217.5 | 08.12.2015 | [2017/42] | WO2015EP78934 | Priority number, date | EP20140197404 | 11.12.2014 Original published format: EP 14197404 | [2017/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016091857 | Date: | 16.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3230267 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3230267 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07D233/56 | [2017/42] | CPC: |
C07D233/56 (EP,US);
C07D233/80 (CN);
A01N43/50 (US);
A01N31/08 (US);
A01N47/38 (CN);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P33/10 (EP);
A61P33/14 (EP);
C07C317/14 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÜNFGLIEDRIGE C-N-VERKNÜPFTE ARYLSULFID- UND ARYLSULFOXID-DERIVATE ALS SCHÄDLINGSBEKÄMPFUNGSMITTEL | [2017/42] | English: | FIVE-MEMBERED C-N LINKED ARYLSULFIDE AND ARYLSULFOXIDE DERIVATIVES AS PESTICIDES | [2018/17] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE SULFURES D'ARYLES ET D'ARYLSULFOXYDE À CINQ ÉLÉMENTS LIÉS C-N COMME MOYENS DE LUTTE CONTRE LES PARASITES | [2018/17] |
Former [2017/42] | FIVE-MEMBERED C-N BONDED ARYL SULPHIDE AND ARYL SULPHOXIDE DERIVATIVES AS PEST CONTROL AGENTS | ||
Former [2017/42] | DÉRIVÉS DE SULFURE D'ARYLE ET D'OXYDE ARYLSULFONIQUE À LIAISON C-N, À CINQ CHAÎNONS, UTILISÉS COMME PESTICIDES | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/42] | 25.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.12.2015 | AL | 26.09.2018 | CY | 26.09.2018 | CZ | 26.09.2018 | DK | 26.09.2018 | EE | 26.09.2018 | FI | 26.09.2018 | HR | 26.09.2018 | LT | 26.09.2018 | LV | 26.09.2018 | MC | 26.09.2018 | MK | 26.09.2018 | MT | 26.09.2018 | NL | 26.09.2018 | PL | 26.09.2018 | RO | 26.09.2018 | RS | 26.09.2018 | SE | 26.09.2018 | SI | 26.09.2018 | SK | 26.09.2018 | SM | 26.09.2018 | TR | 26.09.2018 | IE | 08.12.2018 | LU | 08.12.2018 | BG | 26.12.2018 | NO | 26.12.2018 | GR | 27.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | FR | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | IS | 26.01.2019 | PT | 26.01.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/17] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
MT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IE | 08.12.2018 | ||
LU | 08.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
MT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
IE | 08.12.2018 | ||
LU | 08.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
IE | 08.12.2018 | ||
LU | 08.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
IE | 08.12.2018 | ||
LU | 08.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
IE | 08.12.2018 | ||
LU | 08.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
IE | 08.12.2018 | ||
LU | 08.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
LU | 08.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
LU | 08.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 26.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0364797 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-19 * example 14 *; | [A]DE19536842 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-19* the whole document *; | [A]WO2013092350 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-19 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO2014095979 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE]) [A] 1-19 * claim 1 * | by applicant | US3007927 | DE2212558 | DE2144923 | FR2148868 | DE2423273 | DE2554866 | DE2658220 | JPS5315373B | EP0041465 | EP0300882 | WO9839303 | WO9955668 | WO0026194 | WO03076415 | WO03106457 | FR2845385 | WO2004099160 | WO2005085216 | WO2006003494 | WO2006043635 | WO2006063848 | WO2007026965 | WO2007034755 | JP2007081019 | JP2007284356 | JP2007284385 | WO2008046216 | WO2008122352 | JP2008260706 | WO2008134969 | JP2008308448 | CN101337940 | JP2009023910 | WO2009049851 | WO2009080250 | WO2009097997 | WO2009099929 | WO2010018714 | WO2010051926 | US2010210699 | WO2010129500 | CN102057925 | CN102060818 | WO2011136292 | WO2012000896 | WO2012029672 | WO2012176856 | WO2013092350 | WO2013144213 | - J. MED. CHEM., (2006), vol. 49, pages 417 - 425 | - SCIENCE OF SYNTHESIS, (2004), vol. 7, pages 645 - 659 | - BULL. CHEM. SOC. JAPAN, (2001), vol. 74, no. 10, pages 1917 - 1925 | - ALKYL IN CHIRALITY, (2002), vol. 14, no. 2/3, pages 144 - 150 | - J. MED. CHEM., (2012), vol. 55, no. 19, pages 8236 - 8247 | - SYNTHESIS, (2011), vol. 6, pages 829 - 856 | - BIOL. MED. CHEM., (2012), vol. 20, no. 17, pages 5269 - 5276 | - A.R. MAGUIRE, ARKIVOC, (2011), pages 1 - 110 | - H. SUZUKI, CHEM. LET., (1985), vol. 3, pages 411 - 412 | - S. L. BUCHWALD, J. AMER. CHEM. SOC., (2002), vol. 124, no. 50, pages 14844 - 14845 | - E. B. MERKUSHEV, SYNTHESIS, (1988), vol. 12, pages 923 - 937 | - Manual on development and use of FAO and WHO specifications for pesticides, FAO Plant Production and Protection Papers, FAO/WHO JOINT MEETING ON PESTICIDE SPECIFICATIONS, (2004), vol. 173 | - BAUR ET AL., PESTICIDE SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 51, pages 131 - 152 | - R. WEGLER, Chemie der Pflanzenschutz- und Schädlingsbekämpfungsmittel, SPRINGER VERLAG, (1970), vol. 2, pages 401 - 412 |