EP3226725 - A SOFT BABY CARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Juvenile ApS Industrivej 9B 5500 Middelfart / DK | [2017/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOGED, Bente Pia Vangsgaard Industrivej 9B 5500 Middelfart / DK | [2017/41] | Representative(s) | Chas. Hude A/S Langebrogade 3B 1411 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2017/41] | Chas. Hude A/S H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33 1780 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 15805382.7 | 02.12.2015 | [2017/41] | WO2015DK50373 | Priority number, date | DK20140070758 | 02.12.2014 Original published format: DK 201470758 | [2017/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016086942 | Date: | 09.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3226725 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A47D13/02 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
A47D13/025 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A47D15/00 (KR);
A45F3/14 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/41] | Title | German: | WEICHE BABYTRAGEHILFE | [2017/41] | English: | A SOFT BABY CARRIER | [2017/41] | French: | PORTE-BÉBÉ SOUPLE | [2017/41] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/41] | 19.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/49] | 27.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/49] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.06.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 11.06.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.06.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0734671 (ALLEGRE PUERICULTURE HYGIENE S [FR]) [X] 1-7,9,10 * column 2, line L - column 3, line 16; figure -; claims 1-3,7,8 *[A] 8 | by applicant | WO2012102670 |