EP3237824 - GUIDING DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING FLUID FLOW WHEN FEEDING IN TWO PHASE FLOWS INTO BLOCK-IN-SHELL HEATERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/44] | CONDUCTING DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE FLOW OF LIQUID WHEN FEEDING TWO-PHASE FLOWS IN BLOCK-IN-SHELL HEAT EXCHANGERS | ||
[2018/32] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2019 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Klosterhofstrasse 1 80331 München / DE | [2017/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAYSER, Stefan Fritz-Bechtold-Strasse 24 83308 Trostberg / DE | 02 /
BRENNER, Steffen Hauptstrasse 64 83308 Trostberg / DE | [2017/44] | Representative(s) | Meilinger, Claudia Sabine Linde AG Technology & Innovation Corporate Intellectual Property Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | [2017/44] | Application number, filing date | 15805396.7 | 07.12.2015 | [2017/44] | WO2015EP02462 | Priority number, date | EP20140004422 | 23.12.2014 Original published format: EP 14004422 | [2017/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016102046 | Date: | 30.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3237824 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F28F9/02, F25B39/02, F28D3/04, F28D9/00, F28D21/00 | [2017/44] | CPC: |
F28D21/0017 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F28F9/026 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F25B39/022 (EP,KR,US);
F28D3/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F28D9/0006 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F28F9/0265 (US);
F28D2021/0073 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/44] | Title | German: | LEITEINRICHTUNG ZUR KONTROLLE DER FLÜSSIGKEITSSTRÖMUNG BEI DER EINSPEISUNG VON ZWEIPHASENSTRÖMEN IN BLOCK-IN-SHELL-WÄRMEÜBERTRAGERN | [2017/44] | English: | GUIDING DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING FLUID FLOW WHEN FEEDING IN TWO PHASE FLOWS INTO BLOCK-IN-SHELL HEATERS | [2018/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONDUITE DESTINÉ AU CONTRÔLE DE L'ÉCOULEMENT DE LIQUIDE LORS DE L'ALIMENTATION DE COURANTS DIPHASIQUES DANS DES ÉCHANGEURS DE CHALEUR ENCAPSULÉS | [2018/32] |
Former [2017/44] | CONDUCTING DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE FLOW OF LIQUID WHEN FEEDING TWO-PHASE FLOWS IN BLOCK-IN-SHELL HEAT EXCHANGERS | ||
Former [2017/44] | DISPOSITIF DE GUIDAGE POUR CONTRÔLER L'ÉCOULEMENT DE LIQUIDE DANS LE CADRE DE L'ALIMENTATION EN FLUX BIPHASIQUES D'ÉCHANGEURS DE CHALEUR DE TYPE NOYAU-ENVELOPPE | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/44] | 19.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/24] | 28.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2002062063 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,2,3 *; | [AD]EP2472211 (LINDE AG [DE]) [AD] 1 * figures 5,6 *; | [A]US2013277018 (NUMATA MITSUHARU [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 5 *; | [A]EP1048915 (UEHARA HARUO [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 4 * |