EP3221571 - DEVICE FORMING A SEAL FOR A RELIEF VALVE IN A TURBINE ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2019 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trelleborg Sealing Solutions France 38 rue Jean Mermoz 78600 Maisons Laffitte / FR | [2017/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE LUCA, Michael 32 Rue Offenbach 94400 Vitry Sur Seine / FR | [2017/39] | Representative(s) | IP Trust 2, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | [2018/39] |
Former [2017/39] | Breesé, Pierre IP Trust 2, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 15805606.9 | 20.11.2015 | [2017/39] | WO2015FR53160 | Priority number, date | FR20140061284 | 21.11.2014 Original published format: FR 1461284 | [2017/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016079454 | Date: | 26.05.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3221571 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3221571 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F02C6/08, F02C7/28, F01D17/10, F04D27/02 | [2017/39] | CPC: |
F01D17/105 (EP,US);
F02C6/08 (EP,US);
F02C7/28 (EP,US);
F04D27/0215 (EP,US);
F04D27/023 (EP);
F04D29/083 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER DICHTUNG FÜR EIN ENTLASTUNGSVENTIL IN EINEM TURBINENMOTOR | [2017/39] | English: | DEVICE FORMING A SEAL FOR A RELIEF VALVE IN A TURBINE ENGINE | [2017/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF FORMANT JOINT D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ POUR UNE VANNE DE DÉCHARGE DANS UNE TURBOMACHINE | [2017/39] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/39] | 17.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.11.2015 | AL | 26.09.2018 | CY | 26.09.2018 | CZ | 26.09.2018 | DK | 26.09.2018 | EE | 26.09.2018 | FI | 26.09.2018 | HR | 26.09.2018 | LT | 26.09.2018 | LV | 26.09.2018 | MC | 26.09.2018 | MK | 26.09.2018 | MT | 26.09.2018 | NL | 26.09.2018 | RO | 26.09.2018 | RS | 26.09.2018 | SI | 26.09.2018 | SK | 26.09.2018 | SM | 26.09.2018 | IE | 20.11.2018 | LU | 20.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | BG | 26.12.2018 | NO | 26.12.2018 | GR | 27.12.2018 | IS | 26.01.2019 | PT | 26.01.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/08] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
MT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
IE | 20.11.2018 | ||
LU | 20.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
IE | 20.11.2018 | ||
LU | 20.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
IE | 20.11.2018 | ||
LU | 20.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
LU | 20.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
LU | 20.11.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 26.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0374004 (SNECMA [FR]) [A] 1-15 * figure 3a * * column 4, line 16 *; | [A]GB2245656 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-15* figure 14 * | by applicant | FR2923541 |