EP3156500 - DETECTION KIT OR DEVICE AND DETECTION METHOD FOR BILIARY TRACT CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.06.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.05.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | For all designated states National Cancer Center 1-1, Tsukiji 5-Chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0045 / JP | [2017/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAUCHI, Junpei c/o Basic Research Center Toray Industries Inc. 10-1 Tebiro 6-chome Kamakura-shi Kanagawa 248-8555 / JP | 02 /
NOBUMASA, Hitoshi c/o Basic Research Center Toray Industries Inc. 10-1 Tebiro 6-chome Kamakura-shi Kanagawa 248-8555 / JP | 03 /
KOZONO, Satoko c/o Basic Research Center Toray Industries Inc. 10-1 Tebiro 6-chome Kamakura-shi Kanagawa 248-8555 / JP | 04 /
KONDOU, Satoshi c/o Basic Research Center Toray Industries Inc. 10-1 Tebiro 6-chome Kamakura-shi Kanagawa 248-8555 / JP | 05 /
SUDO, Hiroko c/o Basic Research Center Toray Industries Inc. 10-1 Tebiro 6-chome Kamakura-shi Kanagawa 248-8555 / JP | 06 /
OCHIAI, Atsushi c/o National Cancer Center Hospital East 5-1 Kashiwanoha 6-chome Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-8577 / JP | 07 /
KOJIMA, Motohiro c/o National Cancer Center Hospital East 5-1 Kashiwanoha 6-chome Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-8577 / JP | [2017/16] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2024/42] |
Former [2017/16] | Denison, Christopher Marcus, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 15806290.1 | 11.06.2015 | [2017/16] | WO2015JP66820 | Priority number, date | JP20140120884 | 11.06.2014 Original published format: JP 2014120884 | JP20140185733 | 11.09.2014 Original published format: JP 2014185733 | [2017/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015190542 | Date: | 17.12.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3156500 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3156500 | Date: | 16.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6886 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/09 (EP,US);
C12Q1/68 (US);
C12Q1/6837 (KR);
G01N33/53 (US);
G01N33/566 (US);
G01N37/00 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (KR,US);
C12Q2600/178 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2800/08 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/16] | C12Q1/68, C12N15/09, G01N33/53, G01N33/566, G01N37/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NACHWEIS-KIT ODER VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS VON GALLENGANGSKREBS | [2017/16] | English: | DETECTION KIT OR DEVICE AND DETECTION METHOD FOR BILIARY TRACT CANCER | [2017/16] | French: | NÉCESSAIRE OU DISPOSITIF ET MÉTHODE DE DÉTECTION D'UN CANCER DES VOIES BILIAIRES | [2017/16] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2017 | Translation filed | 04.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/16] | 04.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24199556.2 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2009133915 (NEC CORP [JP], et al); | [A]WO2012063894 (NAT UNIV CORP EHIME UNIV [JP], et al); | [A]WO2013107459 (HERLEV HOSPITAL [DK], et al); |