EP3155326 - HEATER WITH FLAME DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.10.2020 [2020/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wet Enterprises, Inc., DBA Wet Design 10817 Sherman Way Sun Valley, California 91352 / US | [2017/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FULLER, Mark 10817 Sherman Way Sun Valley, CA 91352 / US | 02 /
FULLER, Susan 10817 Sherman Way Sun Valley, CA 91352 / US | 03 /
MOLNAR, Dezso 10817 Sherman Way Sun Valley, CA 91352 / US | 04 /
DOYLE, James, W. 10817 Sherman Way Sun Valley, CA 91352 / US | 05 /
YOO, Riae 10817 Sherman Way Sun Valley, CA 91352 / US | 06 /
WINSLOW, Scott 10817 Sherman Way Sun Valley, CA 91352 / US | [2017/16] | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/16] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 15806334.7 | 10.06.2015 | [2017/16] | WO2015US35211 | Priority number, date | US201462010431P | 10.06.2014 Original published format: US 201462010431 P | [2017/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015191786 | Date: | 17.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3155326 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F24H3/02, F24H3/06, F24H9/20, F24B1/181, F24B1/188, F24B1/195, F24C3/04, F24C15/00, F24H9/00 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
F24H3/065 (EP,US);
F24C15/002 (US);
F24C1/14 (EP,US);
F24C15/006 (EP,US);
F24C15/06 (EP,US);
F24C3/002 (EP,US);
F24C3/022 (EP,US);
F24C3/04 (EP,US);
F24C3/082 (EP,US);
F24H15/281 (EP,US);
F24H15/305 (EP,US);
F24H15/35 (EP,US);
F24H9/0068 (EP,US);
F24H9/2085 (EP,US);
F24H9/25 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/16] | F24H3/02, F24H3/06, F24H9/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/16] | Title | German: | HEIZGERÄT MIT FLAMMENANZEIGE | [2017/16] | English: | HEATER WITH FLAME DISPLAY | [2017/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CHAUFFAGE AVEC PRÉSENTATION DE FLAMME | [2017/16] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 10.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/16] | 10.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/44] | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US517361 (JAMES U. POMEROY [US]) [X] 1,2 * pages 1, 2; figures 1-4 * [I] 3,4,14; | [XI]EP0523912 (VALOR LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,4,14 * columns 5-10; figures 1-4 * [I] 3,5-13; | [X]GB2444074 (BASIC HOLDINGS [IE]) [X] 1-4 * pages 4-6; figures 1, 2 *; | [XI]WO2013046174 (ITALKERO S R L [IT]) [X] 1-3 * pages 12-14; figure 1 * * pages 31-33; figure 10 *[I] 4 | International search | [A]US7175424 (FRINK TOBY [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See column 2, line 43 - column 4, line 2 and figure 1. *; | [XA]WO2008062061 (BASIC HOLDINGS [IE], et al) [X] 17-20 * See page 4, line 1 - page 9, line 7 and figures 1-2. * [A] 1-16; | [A]EP2071244 (ITALKERO S R L [IT]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0011]-[0020] and figures 1-11. *; | [A]US2010132698 (PEDERSEN CARSTEN FRISGAARD [DK], et al) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0036]-[0049] and figures 1-11. *; | [A]CN203323232U (LIANG XINGLIE) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0074]-[0082] and figures 1-8. * |