EP3155951 - IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, PROGRAM, AND ENDOSCOPE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.2020 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2017/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ICHIKI Hiroshi c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2017/16] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/16] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 15806801.5 | 29.05.2015 | [2017/16] | WO2015JP65535 | Priority number, date | JP20140120206 | 11.06.2014 Original published format: JP 2014120206 | [2017/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015190319 | Date: | 17.12.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3155951 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B1/04, G02B23/24, G03B5/00, H04N5/232, A61B5/06 | [2018/11] | CPC: |
A61B1/04 (EP,US);
H04N23/60 (EP,US);
A61B1/000095 (EP,US);
A61B1/00135 (EP,US);
A61B1/00154 (EP,US);
A61B5/061 (US);
G02B23/24 (EP,US);
G03B5/00 (EP,US);
G06T5/73 (US);
G06T7/248 (US);
G06T7/74 (US);
A61B5/064 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10016 (US);
G06T2207/10068 (US);
G06T2207/30196 (US);
G06T2207/30204 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/16] | A61B1/00, A61B1/04, G02B23/24, G03B5/00, H04N5/232 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/16] | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, PROGRAMM UND ENDOSKOPSYSTEM | [2017/16] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, PROGRAM, AND ENDOSCOPE SYSTEM | [2017/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE, PROGRAMME ET SYSTÈME ENDOSCOPIQUE | [2017/16] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2016 | Translation filed | 05.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 05.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/16] | 31.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2007289720 (OLYMPUS CORP) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0080] ** paragraph [0244] - paragraph [0264] *; | [XP]JP2015020012 (MEDIAEDGE CORP) [XP] 1-4,9-11 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0054] * | International search | [A]JPH0549599 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [A] 1-19 * , abstract; fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH11168717 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-19* , abstract; fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [XA]JP2005323681 (FUJINON CORP) [X] 1, 9-11 * , paragraphs [0014] to [0024], [0029]; fig. 1 to 3, 5 & US 2006/0074307 A1 * [A] 2-8, 12-19; | [A]JP2012239644 (OLYMPUS CORP) [A] 1-19 * , paragraphs [0009] to [0015] (Family: none) * |