EP3384473 - CHARGING SYSTEM FOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.05.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INNOGY INNOVATION GMBH Lysegang 11 45139 Essen / DE | [2018/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STÖCKER, Carsten Verdistraße 5 40724 Hilden / DE | 02 /
WAFFNER, Jürgen Ernststraße 1 45307 Essen / DE | [2018/41] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2018/41] | Application number, filing date | 15807626.5 | 03.12.2015 | [2018/41] | WO2015EP78590 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017092817 | Date: | 08.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3384473 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G07F15/00, B60L11/18 | [2018/41] | CPC: |
B60L53/305 (EP,US);
B60L53/14 (EP,US);
B60L53/65 (EP,US);
B60L53/665 (EP,US);
B60L53/68 (EP,US);
G06F21/64 (US);
G07F15/00 (EP,US);
G07F15/001 (EP,US);
G07F15/005 (EP,US);
H04L67/104 (US);
B60L2270/38 (EP,US);
G06Q30/04 (EP,US);
G06Q50/06 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US);
Y02T90/12 (EP,US);
Y02T90/14 (EP,US);
Y02T90/16 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/41] | Title | German: | AUFLADESYSTEM FÜR FAHRZEUGE | [2018/41] | English: | CHARGING SYSTEM FOR VEHICLES | [2018/41] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CHARGE POUR VÉHICULES | [2018/41] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/41] | 04.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.11.2020 | 13.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/23] | 02.02.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2011213656 (TURNER DEXTER [US]) [I] 1-18 * abstract * * especially [0106]; paragraphs [0041] - [0120] *; | [I]EP2495844 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [I] 1-18 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraphs [0016] - [0075] *; | [I]EP2861451 (RWE AG [DE]) [I] 1-18 * abstract * * figure 1 * * claims 1-15 * * paragraphs [0058] - [0104] *; | [A] - Satoshi Nakamoto, "Bitcoin: A Peer-to-Peer Electronic Cash System", (20081031), URL: https://bitcoin.org/bitcoin.pdf, (20150601), XP055192574 [A] 1-18 * pages 1-8 * | [A] - Jacob Stenum ET AL, "The Use of Block Chain Technology in Different Application Domains", (20150520), URL: http://www.lollike.org/bachelor.pdf, (20160118), XP055242451 [A] 1-18 * section 4.4 * | [A] - Dr Gavin Wood, "ETHEREUM: A SECURE DECENTRALISED GENERALISED TRANSACTION LEDGER FINAL DRAFT -UNDER REVIEW", (20140604), URL: http://gavwood.com/paper.pdf, (20160118), XP055242189 [A] 1-18 * especially section 4.2; pages 1-32 * | Examination | US2015120523 |