EP3371900 - METHOD AND OPTICAL LINK MANAGEMENT SYSTEM FOR OBTAINING OPTICAL POWER LEVEL FOR AN OPTICAL LINK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/37] | METHOD AND OPTICAL LINK MANAGEMENT FUNCTION FOR OBTAINING OPTICAL POWER LEVEL FOR AN OPTICAL LINK | ||
[2023/46] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2018/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORSLUND, Anders Forsbrogatan 15 S-931 42 Skellefteå / SE | 02 /
JOHANSSON, Mats Götalandsvägen 204 S-125 35 Älvsjö / SE | 03 /
REHNSTRÖM, Tom Södergatan 41 S-195 47 Märsta / SE | 04 /
VON GOES, Hans Ensittarvägen 15 S-112 64 Stockholm / SE | [2018/37] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/37] | Valea AB Box 7086 103 87 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 15807714.9 | 04.11.2015 | [2018/37] | WO2015SE51165 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017078583 | Date: | 11.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3371900 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/079 | [2018/37] | CPC: |
H04B10/079 (EP,US);
H04B10/0775 (US);
H04B10/564 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND OPTISCHE LINKVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM ZUR GEWINNUNG EINES OPTISCHEN LEISTUNGSPEGELS FÜR EINE OPTISCHE VERBINDUNG | [2023/46] | English: | METHOD AND OPTICAL LINK MANAGEMENT SYSTEM FOR OBTAINING OPTICAL POWER LEVEL FOR AN OPTICAL LINK | [2023/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE LIAISON OPTIQUE POUR OBTENIR UN NIVEAU DE PUISSANCE OPTIQUE POUR UNE LIAISON OPTIQUE | [2023/46] |
Former [2018/37] | VERFAHREN UND OPTISCHE LINKVERWALTUNGSFUNKTION ZUR GEWINNUNG EINES OPTISCHEN LEISTUNGSPEGELS FÜR EINE OPTISCHE VERBINDUNG | ||
Former [2018/37] | METHOD AND OPTICAL LINK MANAGEMENT FUNCTION FOR OBTAINING OPTICAL POWER LEVEL FOR AN OPTICAL LINK | ||
Former [2018/37] | PROCÉDÉ ET FONCTION DE GESTION DE LIAISON OPTIQUE POUR OBTENIR UN NIVEAU DE PUISSANCE OPTIQUE POUR UNE LIAISON OPTIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/37] | 23.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/34] | 16.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO03085897 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [1007] - [1009] - [1012] , [1027] - [1031]; figure 1; tables 1,2 *; | [Y]US2005207754 (YAMAGUCHI KATSUJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-20* paragraphs [0012] - [0022] - [0039] - [0070]; figures 2,3 *; | [Y]WO2006003164 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0019] - [0026]; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US2008002973 (YAMABANA TETSUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0022] - [0024]; figure 3 *; | [Y]WO2012112801 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0143] - [0165]; figures 7,7a *; | [A]WO2015133946 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-20 * page 7, line 10 - page 12, line 35 * * page 25, lines 5-20 *; | [Y] - VARVARIGOS E A ET AL, "The slow start power controlled MAC protocol for mobile ad hoc networks and its performance analysis", AD HOC NETWORKS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 7, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.ADHOC.2008.10.001, ISSN 1570-8705, (20090801), pages 1136 - 1149, (20081015), XP026038013 [Y] 1-20 * 1. Introduction 4. slow start power controlled MAC protocol 7. Conclusions and future work;; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.adhoc.2008.10.001 |