EP3224884 - PHOSPHATE-GARNET SOLID ELECTROLYTE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, New York 14831 / US | [2017/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BADDING, Michael Edward 5165 Waters Road Campbell, NY 14821 / US | 02 /
JOHNSON, Paul Oakley 2373 Murphy Road Corning, NY 14830 / US | 03 /
LIU, Xinyuan 19 Woodland Way Painted Post, NY 14870 / US | [2017/40] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/40] | Scott, Mark Andrew Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 15807741.2 | 20.11.2015 | [2017/40] | WO2015US61796 | Priority number, date | US201462085000P | 26.11.2014 Original published format: US 201462085000 P | [2017/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016085796 | Date: | 02.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3224884 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/38, H01M10/052, H01M10/056, H01M10/0585 | [2017/40] | CPC: |
H01M4/382 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/36 (US);
H01M10/052 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/056 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/0585 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/405 (US);
H01M2004/027 (US);
H01M2300/0002 (EP,CN,US);
H01M2300/0025 (EP,CN,US);
H01M2300/0037 (US);
H01M2300/0068 (EP,CN,US);
H01M2300/0071 (EP,CN,US);
H01M2300/0094 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/505 (EP,CN,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] | Title | German: | PHOSPHAT-GRANAT-FESTSTOFFELEKTROLYTSTRUKTUR | [2017/40] | English: | PHOSPHATE-GARNET SOLID ELECTROLYTE STRUCTURE | [2017/40] | French: | STRUCTURE D'ÉLECTROLYTE SOLIDE PHOSPHATE-GRENAT | [2017/40] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 05.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/03] | 13.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005019666 (YASUDA TOSHIKAZU [JP]) [X] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO2014176266 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [A] 1-19 * paragraph [0014] * | [AD] - YUYANG HOU ET AL, "Macroporous LiFePO4 as a cathode for an aqueous rechargeable lithium battery of high energy density", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY A. MATERIALS FOR ENERGY AND SUSTAINABILITY, UK, (20130101), vol. 1, no. 46, doi:10.1039/c3ta13472e, ISSN 2050-7488, page 14713, XP055244671 [AD] 1-19 * page 14713 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c3ta13472e | [IDA] - REINACHER JOCHEN ET AL, "Preparation and electrical properties of garnet-type Li6BaLa2Ta2O12lithium solid electrolyte thin films prepared by pulsed laser deposition", SOLID STATE IONICS, (20140215), vol. 258, doi:10.1016/J.SSI.2014.01.046, ISSN 0167-2738, pages 1 - 7, XP028632654 [ID] 1,6-19 * figure 1; table 1 * [A] 2-5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ssi.2014.01.046 | by applicant | US8828574 | US8828580 | US7901658 | - KNAUTH, SOLID STATE IONICS, (2009), vol. 180, pages 911 - 916 | - HOU, JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY A, (2013), vol. 1, pages 14713 - 14718 | - KATOH, JOURNAL POWER SOURCES, (2011), vol. 196, pages 6877 - 6880 | - HARTMANN, JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY C, (2013), vol. 117, pages 21064 - 21074 | - JIN, JOURNAL POWER SOURCES, (2013), vol. 239, pages 326 - 331 | - GALVEN, CHEMISTRY MATERIALS, (2012), vol. 24, pages 3335 - 3345 | - SOLID STATE IONICS, (2014), vol. 258, pages 1 - 7 | - XU, ENERGY & ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCE, (2014), vol. 7, pages 513 - 537 | - JIN, ELECTROCHIMICA ACTA, vol. 89, pages 407 - 412 |