EP3229954 - ADSORBENT MIXTURE HAVING IMPROVED THERMAL CAPACITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.09.2020 [2020/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Air Liquide Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75 quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | [2017/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LE BOT, Patrick 50/52 rue de la Jarry 94300 Vincennes / FR | 02 /
MONEREAU, Christian Bâtiment Première Ligne B Apt. 621 191 rue Shirin Ebadi 34000 Montpellier / FR | 03 /
PULLUMBI, Pluton 150 avenue de Paris 78000 Versailles / FR | 04 /
RODRIGUES, Guillaume 113 avenue de la Maréchale 94420 Le Plessis Trevise / FR | [2017/42] | Representative(s) | Laigneau, Amandine L'Air Liquide Direction Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/42] | Laigneau, Amandine L'AIR LIQUIDE S.A. Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 15808735.3 | 25.11.2015 | [2017/42] | WO2015FR53210 | Priority number, date | FR20140062222 | 11.12.2014 Original published format: FR 1462222 | [2017/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016092176 | Date: | 16.06.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3229954 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B01J20/28, B01D53/047, B01J20/08, B01J20/18, B01J20/20, B01J20/10, B01J20/26, B01J20/04, B01J20/22, B01J20/32 | [2017/42] | CPC: |
B01J20/28004 (EP,CN,US);
B01J20/041 (EP,CN,US);
B01D53/02 (EP,US);
B01D53/0423 (US);
B01D53/047 (EP,CN,US);
B01J20/08 (EP,CN,US);
B01J20/103 (EP,CN,US);
B01J20/18 (EP,CN,US);
B01J20/186 (EP,CN,US);
B01J20/20 (EP,CN,US);
B01J20/226 (EP,CN,US);
B01J20/26 (EP,CN,US);
B01J20/28023 (EP,CN,US);
B01J20/2803 (EP,CN,US);
B01J20/28042 (EP,CN,US);
B01J20/3231 (EP,CN,US);
B01D2253/102 (EP,CN,US);
B01D2253/104 (EP,CN,US);
B01D2253/106 (EP,CN,US);
B01D2253/108 (EP,CN,US);
B01D2253/1124 (EP,CN,US);
B01D2253/202 (EP,CN,US);
B01D2253/204 (EP,CN,US);
B01D2253/25 (EP,CN,US);
B01D2253/304 (EP,CN,US);
B01D2253/342 (EP,CN,US);
B01J2220/42 (EP,CN,US);
Y02C20/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/42] | Title | German: | ADSORPTIONSMITTELMISCHUNG MIT VERBESSERTER THERMISCHER LEISTUNG | [2017/42] | English: | ADSORBENT MIXTURE HAVING IMPROVED THERMAL CAPACITY | [2017/42] | French: | MÉLANGE ADSORBANT À CAPACITÉ THERMIQUE AMÉLIORÉE | [2017/42] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/42] | 11.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1536128 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,7,13 * column 4, lines 26-30 * * column 4, lines 43-45 , 57 * * column 5, lines 5-7 * * column 6, lines 45,46,52-54,56,57 * * column 8, lines 27-45, 56-58 * * column 9, lines 31, 32, 33-34 * * column 7, lines 2-6, 34-36 * [I] 4,9-12,15; | [XI]EP0325392 (BOC GROUP INC [US]) [X] 1,3,5-8,13,14 * page 5, lines 45-48 * * page 3, lines 56-59 * * page 4, line 11 * * page 4, line 27 * * page 3, lines 1-9 * [I] 4,9-12,15; | [XI]WO2012136913 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7,8,13,14 * page 13, lines 4-5 * * page 12, line 20 * * page 9, lines 10-11 * * page 8, lines 27-28 * * page 15, lines 1-7 * [I] 4,9-12,15; | [A]WO2004050789 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 7, lines 31-37 * * page 4, lines 26-30 * * page 3, lines 29-31 * * page 3, lines 33-34 * * page 7, lines 11-18 * * page 4, line 33 * * page 5, lines 15-17 *; | [A]WO02087307 (FLAIR CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2014044968 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2008282892 (DECKMAN HARRY W [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 13, paragraphs 93, 94 *; | [A]WO2009134543 (EXXONMOBIL UPSTREAM RES CO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 22, paragraph 76 * | by applicant | FR2794993 | FR2952553 | EP1188470 | US4971605 | US4499208 | - RUTHVEN; THAERON, GAS SEP. PURIF., (1996), vol. 10, page 63 | - F. REZAEI; P. WEBLEY, SEPARATION AND PURIFICATION TECHNOLOGY, (2010), vol. 0, pages 243 - 256 |