EP3159381 - TITANIUM DIOXIDE PIGMENT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME, AND COMPOSITION IN WHICH SAME IS BLENDED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ishihara Sangyo Kaisha, Ltd. 3-15 Edobori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0002 / JP | [2017/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISOBE Kaoru c/o Yokkaichi Plant ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA LTD. 1 Ishiharacho Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-0842 / JP | 02 /
SANEFUJI Norihiko c/o Yokkaichi Plant ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA LTD. 1 Ishiharacho Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-0842 / JP | 03 /
TANIDA Yasutsune c/o Yokkaichi Plant ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA LTD. 1 Ishiharacho Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-0842 / JP | 04 /
OHSAKI Kensuke c/o Yokkaichi Plant ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA LTD. 1 Ishiharacho Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-0842 / JP | [2017/17] | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab (Salmisaarenaukio 1) P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2017/17] | Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 PO Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 15809265.0 | 12.06.2015 | [2017/17] | WO2015JP66967 | Priority number, date | JP20140123931 | 17.06.2014 Original published format: JP 2014123931 | [2017/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015194466 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3159381 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/36, C09C3/06, C09C3/08, C09C3/12, C08K3/22, C08K9/02, C08K9/08, C08K9/06 | [2018/08] | CPC: |
C09C1/3607 (EP);
C09C1/3661 (EP,US);
C08K3/22 (US);
C08K9/02 (US);
C08K9/06 (US);
C08K9/08 (US);
C09C1/36 (US);
C09C1/3669 (US);
C09C1/3684 (US);
C09C3/06 (US);
C09C3/063 (US);
C09C3/08 (US);
C09C3/12 (US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
C01P2004/84 (US);
C01P2006/12 (EP);
C01P2006/60 (US);
C01P2006/62 (EP);
C01P2006/63 (EP);
C01P2006/64 (EP);
C01P2006/82 (EP);
C08K2003/2241 (US);
C08K2003/2244 (US);
C08K2201/003 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/17] | C09C1/36, C09C3/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/17] | Title | German: | TITANDIOXIDPIGMENT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VERMISCHUNG DARIN | [2017/17] | English: | TITANIUM DIOXIDE PIGMENT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME, AND COMPOSITION IN WHICH SAME IS BLENDED | [2017/17] | French: | PIGMENT À BASE DE DIOXYDE DE TITANE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, ET COMPOSITION LE CONTENANT EN MÉLANGE | [2017/17] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2017 | Translation filed | 04.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/17] | 04.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/22] | 26.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5242880 (IRICK JR GETHER [US]) [A] 1-21* column 1, line 59 - column 3, line 19; tables 1-2 *; | [X]JPH11269303 (SEKISUI PLASTICS) [X] 1-6,8-15,17-21 * paragraphs [0015] - [0037]; claims 1-10 *; | [XA]US6383980 (HAGIHARA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7-9,12,14,16-18,21 * column 3, line 65 - column 7, line 62; examples 1-5; claims 1-20 * [A] 6,10,11; | [X]EP2105482 (NAT INST OF ADVANCED IND SCIEN [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,9,12,13,21 * paragraphs [0008] - [0067] * | International search | [XY]JPH11269303 (SEKISUI PLASTICS) [X] 1, 3-21 * , claims 1 to 10; paragraphs [0017], [0023] to [0024], [0034] to [0037] (Family: none) * [Y] 1-21; | [Y]JP2006233343 (NIPPON SODA CO) [Y] 1-21* , claims 1 to 3; paragraphs [0012] to [0013] (Family: none) *; | [XY]JP2008150480 (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL, et al) [X] 1, 4, 9, 12-13, 21 * , claims 1, 4 to 6; paragraphs [0015], [0031] & WO 2008/072748 A1 & EP 2105482 A1 * [Y] 1-21 |