EP3158911 - ENDOSCOPE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2019 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2017/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEMOTO, Shotaro c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 02 /
ITO, Madoka c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 03 /
SAKAMOTO, Tetsuyuki c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 04 /
BANJU, Kazuo c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2017/17] | Representative(s) | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/17] | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15810617.9 | 22.05.2015 | [2017/17] | WO2015JP64809 | Priority number, date | JP20140126564 | 19.06.2014 Original published format: JP 2014126564 | [2017/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015194317 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3158911 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, G02B23/24, A61B1/005, A61B1/008, A61B1/01, A61B1/018, A61B5/06, // H04N5/225 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
A61B1/01 (EP,US);
A61B1/00 (US);
A61B1/00006 (EP,US);
A61B1/0016 (EP,US);
A61B1/0055 (EP,US);
A61B1/0057 (EP,US);
A61B1/008 (EP,US);
A61B1/009 (EP);
A61B1/018 (EP,US);
A61B5/065 (EP,US);
G02B23/24 (EP,US);
G02B23/2484 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/17] | A61B1/00, G02B23/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/17] | Title | German: | ENDOSKOPVORRICHTUNG | [2017/17] | English: | ENDOSCOPE DEVICE | [2017/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF ENDOSCOPIQUE | [2017/17] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2017 | Translation filed | 04.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/17] | 04.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011275896 (TANAKA HIDEKI [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0164] - paragraph [0179] * * figures 13-15c *; | [Y]US2012182409 (MORIYAMA HIROKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5 * paragraph [0054] - paragraphs [0056] , [0061] , [0062] *; | [Y]US2013109919 (SUGIYAMA YUTA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5 * paragraphs [0032] , [0034] , [0035] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0092] * * figures 1-7g *; | [A]JP2013126506 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0068] ** figures 1-7 * | International search | [A]JPH06154154 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [A] 1-6 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2002177202 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [A] 1-6 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2002/0058858 A1 *; | [YA]JP2009160211 (FUJIFILM CORP) [Y] 1 * , paragraphs [0016] to [0042]; fig. 1 to 6 (Family: none) * [A] 2-6; | [YA]WO2011040104 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * , paragraphs [0011], [0014], [0043] to [0059]; fig. 2, 9 to 18 & JP 4804594 B2 & US 2011/0275896 A1 & EP 2484268 A1 & CN 102469914 A * [A] 2-6; | [A]WO2012014532 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-6* , entire text; all drawings & US 2012/0265007 A1 & WO 2012/014532 A1 *; | [A]JP2013126506 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP) [A] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0046] to [0072]; fig. 4 to 8 (Family: none) * |