EP3161482 - METHOD FOR ENRICHING CNS-DERIVED EXOSOMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states XY Evergreen Technology Company Building 1, Room 2-2-236 Beijing Haidian District District Garden Beijing / CN | [2017/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Jing 7420 92nd PL SE Mercer Island, Washington 98040 / US | [2017/18] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2017/18] | Application number, filing date | 15811137.7 | 26.06.2015 | [2017/18] | WO2015US38108 | Priority number, date | US201462018081P | 27.06.2014 Original published format: US 201462018081 P | [2017/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015200851 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3161482 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3161482 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68 | [2017/47] | CPC: |
G01N33/6896 (EP,US);
G01N2800/2821 (EP,US);
G01N2800/2828 (EP,US);
G01N2800/2835 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/18] | G01N33/53 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ANREICHERUNG VON EXOSOMEN AUS DEM ZNS | [2017/18] | English: | METHOD FOR ENRICHING CNS-DERIVED EXOSOMES | [2017/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR ENRICHIR DES EXOSOMES DÉRIVÉS DU SYSTÈME NERVEUX CENTRAL | [2017/18] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2016 | Search fee paid | 14.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2016 | Examination requested [2017/18] | 14.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.03.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.06.2015 | AL | 26.08.2020 | AT | 26.08.2020 | CY | 26.08.2020 | CZ | 26.08.2020 | DK | 26.08.2020 | EE | 26.08.2020 | ES | 26.08.2020 | FI | 26.08.2020 | HR | 26.08.2020 | IT | 26.08.2020 | LT | 26.08.2020 | LV | 26.08.2020 | MC | 26.08.2020 | MK | 26.08.2020 | NL | 26.08.2020 | PL | 26.08.2020 | RO | 26.08.2020 | RS | 26.08.2020 | SE | 26.08.2020 | SI | 26.08.2020 | SK | 26.08.2020 | SM | 26.08.2020 | TR | 26.08.2020 | BG | 26.11.2020 | NO | 26.11.2020 | GR | 27.11.2020 | IS | 26.12.2020 | PT | 28.12.2020 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 26.06.2015 | |
AL | 26.08.2020 | ||
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CY | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
MK | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 26.06.2015 | |
AL | 26.08.2020 | ||
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CY | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 26.06.2015 | |
AL | 26.08.2020 | ||
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 26.08.2020 | |
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 26.08.2020 | |
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | DK | 26.08.2020 | |
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008241924 (PRIMIANO THOMAS [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * paragraph [0007] *; | [Y]US2010184046 (KLASS MICHAEL [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * paragraphs [0129] , [ 218] *; | [Y] - M. W. GRANER ET AL, "Proteomic and immunologic analyses of brain tumor exosomes", THE FASEB JOURNAL, US, (20081224), vol. 23, no. 5, doi:10.1096/fj.08-122184, ISSN 0892-6638, pages 1541 - 1557, XP055416153 [Y] 1-7 * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1096/fj.08-122184 | [XPY] - MIN SHI ET AL, "Plasma exosomal [alpha]-synuclein is likely CNS-derived and increased in Parkinson's disease", ACTA NEUROPATHOLOGICA., BERLIN, DE, (20140706), vol. 128, no. 5, doi:10.1007/s00401-014-1314-y, ISSN 0001-6322, pages 639 - 650, XP055225837 [XP] 1-5 * page 641, section "Exosome isolation"; page 648, left-hand column, last 5 lines; * [Y] 6,7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00401-014-1314-y | [Y] - S. SAMAN ET AL, "Exosome-associated Tau Is Secreted in Tauopathy Models and Is Selectively Phosphorylated in Cerebrospinal Fluid in Early Alzheimer Disease", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20111104), vol. 287, no. 6, doi:10.1074/jbc.M111.277061, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 3842 - 3849, XP055089563 [Y] 6,7 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M111.277061 | [A] - KENNETH W WITWER ET AL, "Standardization of sample collection,isolation and analysis methods in extracellular vesicle research", JOURNAL OF EXTRACELLULAR VESI, COACTION PUBLISHING, SE, vol. 2, doi:10.3402/JEV.V2I0.20360, ISSN 2001-3078, (20130527), page 25pp, (20130527), XP007923200 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3402/jev.v2i0.20360 | International search | [Y]US2008241924 (PRIMIANO THOMAS [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * ; paragraphs [0008], [0018], [0026] *; | [Y]US2010184046 (KLASS MICHAEL [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0010]-[0012], [0054], [0056], [0057], [0099], [0106], [0116], [0130], [0133], [0134], [0148], [0214], [0218], [0232], [0256], [0519], [0528], [0533], [0715], [0815]; Claim 227 *; | [A]WO2014059052 (UAB RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US]) [A] 1-11 * ; abstract *; | [PX]US2015119278 (GOETZL EDWARD J [US]) [PX] 1-11* ; abstract * |