EP3158120 - LAUNDRY TREATMENT APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2017/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KWON, Oshin IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 153-802 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Kyeonghwan IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 153-802 / KR | 03 /
MOON, Byunghyun IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 153-802 / KR | [2017/17] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2017/17] | Application number, filing date | 15811721.8 | 23.06.2015 | [2017/17] | WO2015KR06352 | Priority number, date | KR20140076732 | 23.06.2014 Original published format: KR 20140076732 | KR20140076502 | 23.06.2014 Original published format: KR 20140076502 | KR20140076498 | 23.06.2014 Original published format: KR 20140076498 | [2017/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015199408 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3158120 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3158120 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | D06F37/22 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
D06F37/30 (EP,RU,US);
D06F37/225 (EP,RU,US);
D06F37/04 (US);
D06F37/06 (US)
|
Former IPC [2017/17] | D06F37/22, D06F37/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄSCHEBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/17] | English: | LAUNDRY TREATMENT APPARATUS | [2017/17] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE LINGE | [2017/17] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/17] | 22.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.06.2015 | AL | 12.02.2020 | AT | 12.02.2020 | CY | 12.02.2020 | CZ | 12.02.2020 | DK | 12.02.2020 | EE | 12.02.2020 | ES | 12.02.2020 | FI | 12.02.2020 | HR | 12.02.2020 | LT | 12.02.2020 | LV | 12.02.2020 | MC | 12.02.2020 | MK | 12.02.2020 | MT | 12.02.2020 | NL | 12.02.2020 | PL | 12.02.2020 | RO | 12.02.2020 | RS | 12.02.2020 | SE | 12.02.2020 | SI | 12.02.2020 | SK | 12.02.2020 | SM | 12.02.2020 | TR | 12.02.2020 | BG | 12.05.2020 | NO | 12.05.2020 | GR | 13.05.2020 | IS | 12.06.2020 | GB | 23.06.2020 | IE | 23.06.2020 | LU | 23.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | PT | 05.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 23.06.2015 | |
AL | 12.02.2020 | ||
AT | 12.02.2020 | ||
CY | 12.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
MT | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
GB | 23.06.2020 | ||
IE | 23.06.2020 | ||
LU | 23.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 23.06.2015 | |
AT | 12.02.2020 | ||
CY | 12.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
MT | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
GB | 23.06.2020 | ||
IE | 23.06.2020 | ||
LU | 23.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
GB | 23.06.2020 | ||
IE | 23.06.2020 | ||
LU | 23.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
GB | 23.06.2020 | ||
IE | 23.06.2020 | ||
LU | 23.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
IE | 23.06.2020 | ||
LU | 23.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
LU | 23.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 12.02.2020 | |
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 12.02.2020 | |
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
NO | 12.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2441872 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0029] * * paragraphs [0044] - [0054] ** figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2012192362 (LEE DONG SOO [KR], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0021] - [0028] * * paragraphs [0075] - [0082] * * figures 1, 10, 11 *; | [IA]EP2671995 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1 * paragraph [0060] * * paragraphs [0100] - [0107] * * paragraphs [0141] - [0145] * * figures 1, 2A, 3A, 3B, 7-9 * [A] 2-15 | International search | [A]US5813253 (UHLIN STIG GOERAN [SE]) [A] 1-4, 8-10* See abstract, column 3, lines 23-47, and figure 3. *; | [A]US2012084926 (LEE MOO HYUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-4, 8-10 * See abstract, paragraphs [0057]-[0078], and figures 2-3. *; | [A]KR20130017355 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-4, 8-10 * See abstract, paragraphs [0036]-[0043], and figure 4. *; | [A]KR20130114478 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-4, 8-10 * See abstract, paragraphs [0035]-[0044], and figures 3, 5, 8. *; | [XA]US2013327098 (BAE IL SUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1 * See abstract, paragraphs [0075], [0115], [0121], [0148]-[0152], [0157]-[0158] , claim 1, and figures 1, 3A-3B, 8-9. * [A] 2-4, 8-10 |