EP3161594 - DETECTION OF SURFACE CONTAMINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.01.2019 [2019/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FlatFrog Laboratories AB Traktorvägen 11 226 60 Lund / SE | [2017/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHLSSON, Nicklas Strandgårdsgränd 12 S-21838 Bunkeflostrand / SE | 02 /
CHRISTIANSSON, Tomas Prästvägen 8 S-24745 Torna-Hällestad / SE | [2017/18] | Representative(s) | Invent Horizon IP Nordenskiöldsgatan 11A 211 19 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/18] | Davies, Dominic Jack Event Horizon IP AB Barometergatan 16B 211 17 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 15812234.1 | 22.06.2015 | [2017/18] | WO2015SE50724 | Priority number, date | SE20140050796 | 27.06.2014 Original published format: SE 1450796 | [2017/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015199602 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3161594 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 30.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/042 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
G01N21/552 (EP,US);
G01N21/59 (US);
G01N21/94 (EP,US);
G01N21/958 (US);
G06F3/0421 (EP,US);
G01N2021/945 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] | Title | German: | NACHWEIS VON OBERFLÄCHENVERSCHMUTZUNG | [2017/18] | English: | DETECTION OF SURFACE CONTAMINATION | [2017/18] | French: | DÉTECTION DE CONTAMINATION DE SURFACE | [2017/18] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 27.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/18] | 20.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/02] | 24.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2012162144 (FAAHRAEUS CHRISTER [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,10,13-15 * paragraphs [0009] - [0082] * [I] 3,7-9,11,12; | [A]EP2706443 (FLATFROG LAB AB [SE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0053] - [0073] * | International search | [X]US2013055080 (KOMER JOSEPH L [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * ; abstract; columns 0058-0059; figure 3; claim 1 *; | [A]WO2011049512 (FLATFROG LAB AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; abstract; figures 1-9 *; | [A]US5526422 (KEEN DONALD M [US]) [A] 1-20 * ; abstract; figure 4 *; | [A]US2010033444 (KOBAYASHI TAKASHI [JP]) [A] 1-20 * ; abstract; figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]WO0127867 (ELO TOUCHSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * ; abstract; figures 1-8 * |