EP3161655 - SYSTEM, METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ORGANIZING PHOTOGRAPHS STORED ON A MOBILE COMPUTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.10.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.07.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.2021 [2021/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amazon Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 81226 Seattle, WA 98108-1226 / US | [2017/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Meng 1075 Space Park Way Spc 61 Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Yushan 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, WA 98109 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2017/30] | 01 /
WANG, Meng 1075 Space Park Way Spc 61 Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | ||
02 /
CHEN, Yushan 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, Washington 98109 / US | |||
Former [2017/29] | 01 /
WANG, Meng 1075 Space Park Way Spc 61 Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | ||
02 /
CHEN, Yushan 410 Terry Avenue North Spc 264 Seattle Washington 98109 / US | |||
Former [2017/18] | 01 /
WANG, Meng 1075 Space Park Way Spc 61 Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | ||
02 /
CHEN, Yushan 1075 Space Park Way Spc 264 Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Representative(s) | Round, Edward Mark Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/18] | Blake, Stephen James Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 15812729.0 | 19.06.2015 | [2017/18] | WO2015US36637 | Priority number, date | US201414316905 | 27.06.2014 Original published format: US201414316905 | [2017/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015200120 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3161655 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/58, G06F16/10, G06F16/28, G06F16/51, G06F16/583 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
G06F16/5854 (EP,KR,US);
G06F16/51 (KR,US);
G06F16/10 (EP,KR,US);
G06F16/284 (EP,KR,US);
G06F16/58 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/10] | G06F17/30, G06F15/16 | ||
Former IPC [2017/18] | G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] | Title | German: | SYSTEM, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ORGANISIEREN VON AUF EINER MOBILEN COMPUTERVORRICHTUNG GESPEICHERTEN FOTOGRAFIEN | [2017/18] | English: | SYSTEM, METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ORGANIZING PHOTOGRAPHS STORED ON A MOBILE COMPUTING DEVICE | [2017/18] | French: | SYSTÈME, PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'ORGANISATION DE PHOTOGRAPHIES MÉMORISÉES SUR UN DISPOSITIF INFORMATIQUE MOBILE | [2017/18] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/18] | 23.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/44] | 16.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006253491 (GOKTURK SALIH B [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0141] - paragraph [0155] * * paragraph [0265] - paragraph [0266] * * paragraph [0268] - paragraph [0272] * * paragraph [0178] - paragraph [0190] * * paragraph [0265] - paragraph [0283] * * figure 4 *; | [Y]WO2009138135 (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 7, line 14 - line 28 * * figures 3,5 * * page 8, line 23 - page 9, line 3 * * page 9, line 10 - line 13 * * page 9, line 19 - page 10, line 22 * * page 13, line 5 - line 24 * * page 4, line 14 - line 22 * * page 2, line 13 - line 19 *; | [A]US2010150407 (CHESWICK WILLIAM ROBERTS [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0034] * * figures 2,3,5 *; | [A]WO2010071617 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 28 - page 2, line 12 * * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 20 * * page 5, line 21 - line 30 * * page 8, line 19 - page 9, line 2 * * page 11, line 1 - line 25 ** page 13, line 7 - page 15, line 7 * | International search | [Y]WO02057959 (ADOBE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 10, 22 * , entire document, especially Abstract; pg 1, In 25 to pg 2, In 11 *; | [XY]US2012258776 (LORD JOHN D [US], et al) [X] 1-9, 11-21, 23-24 * , entire document, especially Abstract; para [0091], [0213], [0391], [0440], [0472], [0530], [0571]-[0575], [0588], [0629], [0833], [0873], [0916], [0918], [0925], [0949] * [Y] 10, 22; | [A]US2013202216 (FORK MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * , entre document *; | [A]US2013339362 (YANG EN-HUI [CA]) [A] 1-22 * , entire document *; | [A]US2014115099 (KABIR NOWSHADE [CA]) [A] 1-22* , entire document * |