EP3230807 - TIMEPIECE REGULATOR, TIMEPIECE MOVEMENT AND TIMEPIECE HAVING SUCH A REGULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LVMH Swiss Manufactures SA rue Louis-Joseph Chevrolet 6a 2300 La Chaux-de-Fonds / CH | [2017/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEMON, Guy 83 rue de l'Evole 2000 Neuchatel / CH | 02 /
VAN ZOEST, Wouter Pieter 73 Van Hasseltlaan 2625HD Delft / NL | 03 /
WEEKE, Sybren Lennard 77 Hoofdweg 9697 NC Blijham / NL | 04 /
TOLOU, Nima 65-97 Bezuidenhoutseweg 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2017/42] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/42] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 15812974.2 | 30.11.2015 | [2017/42] | WO2015EP78017 | Priority number, date | EP20140197019 | 09.12.2014 Original published format: EP 14197019 | [2017/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016091632 | Date: | 16.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3230807 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G04B17/04 | [2017/42] | CPC: |
G04B17/045 (EP,KR,US);
G04B15/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/42] | Title | German: | UHRREGLER, UHRWERK UND UHR MIT SOLCH EINEM REGLER | [2017/42] | English: | TIMEPIECE REGULATOR, TIMEPIECE MOVEMENT AND TIMEPIECE HAVING SUCH A REGULATOR | [2017/42] | French: | RÉGULATEUR D'APPAREIL HORAIRE, MOUVEMENT D'APPAREIL HORAIRE, ET APPAREIL HORAIRE MUNI DUDIT RÉGULATEUR | [2017/42] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/42] | 01.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP2613205 (LVMH SWISS MFT SA [CH]); | [A]EP2645189 (NIVAROX SA [CH]) |