EP3286866 - TRANSMISSION DESIGNS FOR RADIO ACCESS TECHNOLOGIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2020/52] |
Former [2018/09] | For all designated states Intel IP Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIONG, Gang 16682 NW Arizona Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97006 / US | 02 /
FWU, Jong-Kae 1519 Dominion Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | 03 /
HAN, Seunghee 1118 Mallard Ridge Circle San Jose, California 95120 / US | 04 /
NIU, Huaning c/o Intel IP Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | 05 /
BENDLIN, Ralf c/o Intel Ip Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | 06 /
ZHU, Yuan Room 605 Building 16 Moli Yuan Beiyuan Jiayuan Chaoyang District, Heilongjiang Beijing 100012 / CN | [2018/10] |
Former [2018/09] | 01 /
XIONG, Gang 16682 NW Arizona Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97006 / US | ||
02 /
FWU, Jong-Kae 1519 Dominion Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | |||
03 /
HAN, Seunghee 1118 Mallard Ridge Circle San Jose, California 95120 / US | |||
04 /
NIU, Huaning c/o Intel IP Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | |||
05 /
BENDLIN, Ralf 15447 NW Nightshade Drive Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | |||
06 /
ZHU, Yuan Room 605 Building 16 Moli Yuan Beiyuan Jiayuan Chaoyang District, Heilongjiang Beijing 100012 / CN | Representative(s) | Rooney, John-Paul Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2023/15] |
Former [2018/09] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15813990.7 | 03.12.2015 | [2018/09] | WO2015US63803 | Priority number, date | US201562150988P | 22.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562150988 P | [2018/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016171765 | Date: | 27.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3286866 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3286866 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/14, H04L5/00 | [2018/09] | CPC: |
H04L5/0094 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04L5/1469 (EP,US);
H04L5/0007 (EP,US);
H04L5/0044 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNGSENTWÜRFE FÜR FUNKZUGANGSTECHNOLOGIEN | [2018/09] | English: | TRANSMISSION DESIGNS FOR RADIO ACCESS TECHNOLOGIES | [2018/09] | French: | CONCEPTIONS DE TRANSMISSION POUR TECHNOLOGIES D'ACCÈS RADIO | [2018/09] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/09] | 18.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23154671.4 / EP4210270 | EP23184262.6 / EP4243328 | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 12.04.2023 | AT | 12.04.2023 | CZ | 12.04.2023 | DK | 12.04.2023 | EE | 12.04.2023 | ES | 12.04.2023 | HR | 12.04.2023 | IT | 12.04.2023 | LT | 12.04.2023 | LV | 12.04.2023 | NL | 12.04.2023 | PL | 12.04.2023 | RO | 12.04.2023 | RS | 12.04.2023 | SI | 12.04.2023 | SK | 12.04.2023 | SM | 12.04.2023 | NO | 12.07.2023 | GR | 13.07.2023 | IS | 12.08.2023 | PT | 14.08.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SI | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 12.04.2023 | |
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 12.04.2023 | |
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 12.04.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XI] - LAHETKANGAS EEVA ET AL, "On the TDD subframe structure for beyond 4G radio access network", 2013 FUTURE NETWORK & MOBILE SUMMIT, AUTHORS, (20130703), pages 1 - 10, XP032506927 [X] 1,2,7,8 * figure 4 * * page 1 * * page 5 - page 7 * [I] 3-6,9-11 | [I] - LEVANEN TONI ET AL, "Dense small-cell networks: Rethinking the radio interface beyond LTE-advanced", 1ST INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON 5G FOR UBIQUITOUS CONNECTIVITY, ICST, (20141126), doi:10.4108/ICST.5GU.2014.258115, pages 163 - 169, XP032735039 [I] 1-11 * figures 2,5 * * page 165 - page 167 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4108/icst.5gu.2014.258115 | [A] - Sassan Ahmadi, "The IEEE 802.16m Physical Layer (Part I)", Mobile WiMAX, Elsevier, (20101118), pages 335 - 487, doi:10.1016/B978-0-12-374964-2.10009-8, ISBN 978-0-12-374964-2, XP055249201 [A] 1-11 * figures 9-18,9-19 * * page 358 - page 364 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/B978-0-12-374964-2.10009-8 | [A] - Erik Dahlman ET AL, "Downlink Physical-Layer Processing - Chapter 10", 4G LTE/LTE-Advanced for Mobile Broadband, Elsevier, (20131007), pages 161 - 240, XP055249210 [A] 1-11 * page 213 - page 218 * |