EP3166328 - SIGNAL PROCESSING APPARATUS, SIGNAL PROCESSING METHOD, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2017/19] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYASHI, Shigetoshi c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
ASADA, Kohei c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2017/19] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2017/19] | Application number, filing date | 15814127.5 | 15.05.2015 | [2017/19] | WO2015JP64103 | Priority number, date | JP20140136103 | 01.07.2014 Original published format: JP 2014136103 | [2017/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016002366 | Date: | 07.01.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3166328 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3166328 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/10, G10K11/178 | [2017/19] | CPC: |
G10K11/17857 (EP,US);
G10K11/17825 (EP,US);
G10K11/17827 (EP,US);
G10K11/17853 (EP,US);
G10K11/17873 (EP,US);
G10K11/17875 (EP,US);
G10K11/17881 (EP,US);
G10K11/17885 (EP,US);
H04R1/10 (EP,US);
H04R1/1083 (EP);
H04R29/001 (US);
H04R5/04 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SIGNALVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, SIGNALVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM | [2017/19] | English: | SIGNAL PROCESSING APPARATUS, SIGNAL PROCESSING METHOD, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM | [2017/19] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAL, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAL, ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE | [2017/19] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2016 | Translation filed | 08.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 08.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/19] | 08.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.05.2015 | AL | 24.03.2021 | AT | 24.03.2021 | CY | 24.03.2021 | CZ | 24.03.2021 | DK | 24.03.2021 | EE | 24.03.2021 | ES | 24.03.2021 | FI | 24.03.2021 | HR | 24.03.2021 | IT | 24.03.2021 | LT | 24.03.2021 | LV | 24.03.2021 | MC | 24.03.2021 | MK | 24.03.2021 | MT | 24.03.2021 | NL | 24.03.2021 | PL | 24.03.2021 | RO | 24.03.2021 | RS | 24.03.2021 | SE | 24.03.2021 | SI | 24.03.2021 | SK | 24.03.2021 | SM | 24.03.2021 | TR | 24.03.2021 | IE | 15.05.2021 | LU | 15.05.2021 | BE | 31.05.2021 | CH | 31.05.2021 | LI | 31.05.2021 | BG | 24.06.2021 | NO | 24.06.2021 | GR | 25.06.2021 | IS | 24.07.2021 | PT | 26.07.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 15.05.2015 | |
AL | 24.03.2021 | ||
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CY | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
MK | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
TR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IE | 15.05.2021 | ||
LU | 15.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 15.05.2015 | |
AL | 24.03.2021 | ||
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CY | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
MK | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
IE | 15.05.2021 | ||
LU | 15.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 15.05.2015 | |
AL | 24.03.2021 | ||
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CY | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
IE | 15.05.2021 | ||
LU | 15.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 15.05.2015 | |
AL | 24.03.2021 | ||
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
IE | 15.05.2021 | ||
LU | 15.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
IE | 15.05.2021 | ||
LU | 15.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
IE | 15.05.2021 | ||
LU | 15.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
IE | 15.05.2021 | ||
LU | 15.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
IE | 15.05.2021 | ||
LU | 15.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
LU | 15.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
LU | 15.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
LU | 15.05.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 24.03.2021 | |
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
NO | 24.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008112569 (ASADA KOHEI [JP]) [Y] 3-9,12,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0071] , [0072] , [0080] , [0085] , [0092] , [0093] , [0132] , [0192] , [0222] *; | [XY]US2008137873 (GOLDSTEIN STEVEN W [US]) [X] 1,2,14,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0031] , [0034] - [0037] - [0041] * [Y] 3-13; | [Y]US2014146976 (RUNDLE NICHOLAS A [US]) [Y] 10,11 * abstract ** paragraphs [0071] , [0077] * | International search | [A]JP2008012229 (GE MED SYS GLOBAL TECH CO LLC) [A] 1-15 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2008/0112569 A1 & EP 1923864 A2 & CN 101184345 A *; | [A]JP2011146875 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-15* , paragraphs [0001] to [0012] & JP 4709927 B & US 2011/0170700 A1 * |