EP3162239 - SHOE UPPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.01.2019 [2019/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIMA SEIKI MFG., LTD. 85, Sakata, Wakayama-shi Wakayama 641-0003 / JP | [2017/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUMIBA, Isao c/o SHIMA SEIKI MFG., LTD. 85 Sakata Wakayama-shi Wakayama 641-0003 / JP | 02 /
SHIMASAKI, Yoshinori c/o SHIMA SEIKI MFG., LTD. 85 Sakata Wakayama-shi Wakayama 641-0003 / JP | 03 /
YUI, Manabu c/o SHIMA SEIKI MFG., LTD. 85 Sakata Wakayama-shi Wakayama 641-0003 / JP | [2017/18] | Representative(s) | Schmidbauer, Andreas Konrad Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/18] | Schmidbauer, Andreas Konrad Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15816046.5 | 23.06.2015 | [2017/18] | WO2015JP67998 | Priority number, date | JP20140133516 | 30.06.2014 Original published format: JP 2014133516 | [2017/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016002581 | Date: | 07.01.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3162239 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A43B23/02, A43D21/00, A43B1/04 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
A43B1/04 (EP);
A43C1/003 (KR);
A43B23/0285 (US);
A43B23/02 (EP,US);
A43B23/0225 (US);
A43B23/026 (US);
A43B23/028 (US);
A43B23/04 (US);
A43B23/045 (US);
A43C1/06 (KR);
A43C5/00 (KR);
A43C7/005 (KR);
A43D21/00 (EP,US);
D04B1/106 (EP);
D10B2501/043 (EP);
D10B2501/062 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/18] | A43B23/02, A43D21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] | Title | German: | SCHUHOBERTEIL | [2017/18] | English: | SHOE UPPER | [2017/18] | French: | TIGE DE CHAUSSURE | [2017/18] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2016 | Translation filed | 20.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/18] | 20.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/02] | 27.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH08131208 (FUKUOKA SUMIKO); | [IY]US2011078921 (GREENE PAMELA S [US], et al); | [Y]US2014173932 (BELL THOMAS G [US]) | International search | [A]JPS5460042 (KOHKOKU CHEM IND); | [A]JPS5577403U ; | [A]JPH1057109 (MOON STAR CO); | [A]JP2006511306 ; | [A]JP2012512698 |