EP3226976 - TOPICAL SKIN CARE COMPOSITION COMPRISING TRIFLUOROACETYL TRIPEPTIDE-2 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mary Kay, Inc. 16251 N Dallas Parkway Addison, TX 75001 / US | [2017/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAN, David c/o Mary Kay Inc. 16251 Dallas Parkway Addison, TX 75001 / US | 02 /
SANCHEZ, Maria Milagros c/o Mary Kay Inc. 16251 Dallas Parkway Addison, TX 75001 / US | 03 /
ZHAO, Wanli c/o Mary Kay Inc. 16251 Dallas Parkway Addison, TX 75001 / US | [2017/41] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [2017/41] | Application number, filing date | 15817015.9 | 04.12.2015 | [2017/41] | WO2015US64004 | Priority number, date | US201462087658P | 04.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462087658 P | [2017/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016090252 | Date: | 09.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3226976 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q19/00, A61K36/00, A61K8/891, A61K8/04, A61K8/81, A61K8/894, A61K8/31, A61K8/42, A61K8/99 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
A61K8/42 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/64 (CN,KR,US);
A61K8/97 (CN);
A61K8/062 (KR,US);
A61K36/185 (EP,US);
A61K36/45 (EP,US);
A61K38/06 (EP,US);
A61K38/07 (EP,US);
A61K8/042 (EP,US);
A61K8/11 (KR);
A61K8/31 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/34 (CN,KR,US);
A61K8/342 (KR,US);
A61K8/345 (CN,KR,US);
A61K8/37 (CN,KR,US);
A61K8/375 (KR,US);
A61K8/39 (KR);
A61K8/41 (CN,KR,US);
A61K8/44 (KR,US);
A61K8/4973 (US);
A61K8/4993 (KR);
A61K8/55 (KR,US);
A61K8/585 (KR,US);
A61K8/602 (KR);
A61K8/606 (CN,KR);
A61K8/676 (KR);
A61K8/678 (CN);
A61K8/73 (CN);
A61K8/8111 (KR);
A61K8/8147 (KR);
A61K8/8152 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K8/8158 (KR);
A61K8/86 (CN,KR,US);
A61K8/891 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K8/894 (EP,US);
A61K8/895 (KR);
A61K8/922 (CN,KR,US);
A61K8/9789 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/99 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,CN,US);
A61Q19/005 (CN);
A61Q19/02 (CN,US);
A61Q19/08 (CN,KR,US);
A61K2800/522 (KR);
A61K2800/5922 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K36/185, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K36/45, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/41] | Title | German: | TOPISCHE HAUTPFLEGEZUSAMMESETZUNG MIT TRIFLUOROACETYL-TRIPEPTID-2 | [2017/41] | English: | TOPICAL SKIN CARE COMPOSITION COMPRISING TRIFLUOROACETYL TRIPEPTIDE-2 | [2017/41] | French: | COMPOSITION TOPIQUE DE SOIN DE LA PEAU COMPRENANT UN TRIFLUOROACÉTYL TRIPEPTIDE -2 | [2017/41] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/41] | 03.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2009046116 (GROSS DENNIS [US]); | [Y]WO2012038061 (LIPOTEC SA [ES], et al); | by applicant | US2798053 | US3755560 | US4421769 | US4509949 | US4599379 | US4628078 | US4835206 | US4849484 | US5011681 | US5087445 | US5100660 | US7998493 |