EP3247749 - YELLOW METHINE DYES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lanxess Deutschland GmbH Kennedyplatz 1 50569 Köln / DE | [2017/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORST, Hans-Ulrich Winterbach 101 50189 Elsdorf / DE | 02 /
LINKE, Frank Glatzer Strasse 38 51069 Köln / DE | 03 /
MICHAELIS, Stephan Mutzbroicher Strasse 15a 51519 Odenthal / DE | [2017/48] | Application number, filing date | 15817352.6 | 22.12.2015 | [2017/48] | WO2015EP80973 | Priority number, date | EP20150151917 | 21.01.2015 Original published format: EP 15151917 | [2017/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016116244 | Date: | 28.07.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3247749 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3247749 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/12, C08J3/12, C09B23/01, C09B23/14, C08J3/20, C08K5/3417, C08L77/02, C08L77/06, C08K5/00 | [2019/16] | CPC: |
C07D209/12 (EP,CN,US);
C09B23/0091 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C09B23/105 (CN,KR,US);
C08J3/12 (US);
C08J3/201 (US);
C08K5/3417 (EP,CN,US);
C08L77/02 (EP,US);
C08L77/06 (EP,US);
C09B23/0058 (EP,CN,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/3417, C08L33/12 (CN);
C08K5/3417, C08L77/00 (CN) |
Former IPC [2017/48] | C09B23/01, C09B23/10, C09B23/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GELBE METHINFARBSTOFFE | [2017/48] | English: | YELLOW METHINE DYES | [2017/48] | French: | COLORANTS AU MÉTHYLE JAUNES | [2019/16] |
Former [2017/48] | COLORANTS MÉTHINIQUES JAUNES | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/48] | 01.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 26.06.2019 | CY | 26.06.2019 | EE | 26.06.2019 | FI | 26.06.2019 | HR | 26.06.2019 | LT | 26.06.2019 | LV | 26.06.2019 | MC | 26.06.2019 | MK | 26.06.2019 | MT | 26.06.2019 | RS | 26.06.2019 | SM | 26.06.2019 | BG | 26.09.2019 | NO | 26.09.2019 | IS | 26.10.2019 | PT | 28.10.2019 | LU | 22.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CY | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
MT | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
LU | 22.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CY | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
LU | 22.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
LU | 22.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE677207 (IG FARBENINDUSTRIE AG) [X] 16 * example 1 * [A] 1-15; | [XI]GB929394 (BAYER AG) [X] 16 * example -; claim -; table 1 * [I] 1-16; | [I]US3255204 (RODERICH RAUE, et al) [I] 1-16* column 1, line 18 - line 27; example -; claim - *; | [XA]GB1377706 (NAYER AG) [X] 16 * page 5, line 40 - page 6, line 17 * * page 6, line 62 - line 66; example -; claim - * [A] 1-15; | [I]GB1404441 (BAYER AG) [I] 1-16 * example -; claim - *; | [I]US4016172 (HARNISCH HORST) [I] 1-16 * column 14, line 40 - column 15, line 62; example -; claim - *; | [XA]EP0113922 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 16 * page 9, line 6 - line 21; example -; claim - * [A] 1-15; | [XA]JP2014153441 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK) [X] 16 * example -; claim -; compound 7 * [A] 1-15; | [XA] - ANDRÉ ZITZLER-KUNKEL ET AL, "Comparative Studies on Optical, Redox, and Photovoltaic Properties of a Series of D-A-D and Analogous D-A Chromophores", ADVANCED FUNCTIONAL MATERIALS, WILEY - V C H VERLAG GMBH & CO. KGAA, DE, vol. 24, no. 29, doi:10.1002/ADFM.201400455, ISSN 1616-301X, (20140806), pages 4645 - 4653, (20140502), XP001591503 [X] 16 * compound 8 * [A] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adfm.201400455 | [XA] - ALEXANDER P. GORKA ET AL, "A Near-IR Uncaging Strategy Based on Cyanine Photochemistry", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20141008), vol. 136, no. 40, doi:10.1021/ja5065203, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 14153 - 14159, XP055181084 [X] 16 * page 14155; compound 16 * [A] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja5065203 | [XA] - KONSTANTIN ZYABREV ET AL, "New 2,2-difluoro-1,3,2(2)oxazaborines and merocyanines derived from them", DYES AND PIGMENTS, ELSEVIER APPLIED SCIENCE PUBLISHERS. BARKING, GB, vol. 92, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.DYEPIG.2011.05.025, ISSN 0143-7208, (20110528), pages 749 - 757, (20110613), XP028268187 [X] 16 * scheme 4; page 750 * [A] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.dyepig.2011.05.025 |