EP3236770 - FREEZING CYLINDER BEATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carrier Corporation 17900 Beeline Highway Jupiter, FL 33458 / US | [2017/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRISQUE, Robert E. 750 N. Blackhawk Blvd. Rockton, Illinois 61072 / US | 02 /
WADLE, Stephen M. 750 N. Blackhawk Blvd. Rockton, Illinois 61072 / US | [2017/44] | Representative(s) | Harris, Oliver John Richard Novagraaf UK Centrum Norwich Research Park Colney Lane Norwich NR4 7UG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/44] | Taylor, Adam David Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 15817695.8 | 10.12.2015 | [2017/44] | WO2015US64940 | Priority number, date | US201462095882P | 23.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462095882 P | [2017/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016105960 | Date: | 30.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3236770 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A23G9/12, A23G9/28, B01F7/00, F25C1/14 | [2017/44] | CPC: |
A23G9/28 (EP,CN,US);
A23G9/12 (EP,CN,US);
F25C1/14 (CN);
B01F27/726 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/44] | Title | German: | GEFRIERZYLINDERKLOPFER | [2017/44] | English: | FREEZING CYLINDER BEATER | [2017/44] | French: | BATTEUR CYLINDRIQUE DE CONGÉLATION | [2017/44] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/44] | 12.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/16] | 06.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IY]US4900158 (UGOLINI GIANCARLO [IT]) [I] 1-9,11,16-18 * column 3, line 31 - line 37; figures 1,2; claims 1,3 * [Y] 6; | [Y]US2746730 (SWENSON HARVEY F, et al) [Y] 6 * figure 1 * | Examination | US2064131 | CA395301 | by applicant | US7278276 | US2013068331 |