EP3200577 - FARM SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.06.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nedap N.V. Parallelweg 2 7141 DC Groenlo / NL | [2019/39] |
Former [2017/32] | For all designated states N.V. Nederlandsche Apparatenfabriek NEDAP Parallelweg 2 7141 DC Groenlo / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARSIJNS, Woltherus c/o Parallelweg 2 NL-7141 DC Groenlo / NL | 02 /
LAMMERS, Rudie Jan Hendrik c/o Parallelweg 2 NL-7141 DC Groenlo / NL | [2017/32] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 Carnegieplein 5 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2017/32] | Application number, filing date | 15818082.8 | 02.10.2015 | [2017/32] | WO2015NL50689 | Priority number, date | NL20142013560 | 02.10.2014 Original published format: NL 2013560 | [2017/32] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016053104 | Date: | 07.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3200577 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A01K11/00, A01K29/00 | [2017/32] | CPC: |
A01K11/006 (EP,US);
A01J5/007 (EP,US);
A01J7/00 (EP,US);
A01K1/0017 (US);
A01K1/0047 (EP,US);
A01K1/0128 (US);
A01K1/0158 (US);
A01K1/12 (US);
A01K29/005 (EP,US);
A01K5/02 (US);
B25J11/0045 (US);
B25J11/0085 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] | Title | German: | LANDWIRTSCHAFTSBETRIEBSSYSTEM | [2017/32] | English: | FARM SYSTEM | [2017/32] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉLEVAGE | [2017/32] | Entry into regional phase | 01.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 01.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/32] | 01.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI] - TREVARTHEN A ET AL, "The RFID-Enabled Dairy Farm: Towards Total Farm Management", MOBILE BUSINESS, 2008. ICMB '08. 7TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080707), ISBN 978-0-7695-3260-8, pages 241 - 250, XP031289095 [X] 1-5,7,8,17,19-21 * the whole document * [I] 6,9-16,18,22,23 | [XI] - "The SCR DataFlow(TM) II System is a real", (20140623), URL: http://www.scrdairy.com/images/PDF/broshures_24_6/DFII_8_A4_Eng_Jul14_low.pdf, (20150511), XP055188469 [X] 1,3,7,9-11,17,21 * the whole document * [I] 2,4-6,8,12-16,18-20,22,23 | [XI] - "Advanced Animal Management Systems GEA Milking & Cooling | WestfaliaSurge", (20101019), URL: http://www.westfalia.com/Images/7755-1000-012_US_CA_AnimalID_SortGate_091710_lores_tcm90-53206.pdf, (20150511), XP055188466 [X] 1,3,7 * the whole document * [I] 2,4-6,8-23 | [A] - WANG ET AL, "Wireless sensors in agriculture and food industry-Recent development and future perspective", COMPUTERS AND ELECTRONICS IN AGRICULTURE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20060101), vol. 50, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.COMPAG.2005.09.003, ISSN 0168-1699, pages 1 - 14, XP005211141 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.compag.2005.09.003 | [A] - JAMES FOULKES ET AL, "Livestock Management System", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON EMBEDDED SYSTEMS AND APPLICATIONS (ESA), Athens, (20130101), page 1, XP055188482 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * |