EP3167277 - ULTRASHORT PEPTIDES AS EXOGENOUS SECOND HARMONIC PROBES FOR BIOIMAGING APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agency for Science, Technology and Research 1 Fusionopolis Way 20-10 Connexis Singapore 138632 / SG | [2017/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUSER, Charlotte c/o Institute of Bioengineering and Nanotechnology 31 Biopolis Way The Nanos 04-01 Singapore 138669 / SG | 02 /
NI, Ming c/o Institute of Bioengineering and Nanotechnology 31 Biopolis Way The Nanos 04-01 Singapore 138669 / SG | [2017/20] | Representative(s) | Engelhard, Markus Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/20] | Engelhard, Markus Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15818338.4 | 08.07.2015 | [2017/20] | WO2015SG50204 | Priority number, date | SG20141003924Q | 08.07.2014 Original published format: SG10201403924Q | [2017/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016007091 | Date: | 14.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3167277 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 14.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/63, C07K5/062, C07K5/083, C07K5/103, C07K7/06 | [2017/20] | CPC: |
C07K14/78 (EP,US);
A61K49/00 (US);
A61K47/42 (US);
A61K9/14 (US);
A61L26/0047 (US);
A61L26/008 (US);
A61L27/227 (US);
A61L27/52 (US);
C07K5/06034 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/20] | Title | German: | ULTRAKURZE PEPTIDE ALS EXOGENE SONDE ZWEITER HARMONISCHEN FÜR BIOABBILDUNGSANWENDUNGEN | [2017/20] | English: | ULTRASHORT PEPTIDES AS EXOGENOUS SECOND HARMONIC PROBES FOR BIOIMAGING APPLICATIONS | [2017/20] | French: | PEPTIDES ULTRACOURTS EN TANT QUE SONDES EXOGÈNES À DEUXIÈME HARMONIQUE POUR APPLICATIONS EN BIO-IMAGERIE | [2017/20] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 17.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/20] | 17.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/32] | 27.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2013004399 (AGENCY SCIENCE TECH & RES [SG], et al) [X] 9,10,12-14 * page 4, paragraph 1 * [Y] 1-16; | [XY]WO2013066274 (AGENCY SCIENCE TECH & RES [SG]) [X] 9,10,12-14 * claim 13 * [Y] 1-16; | [XY]WO2013126017 (AGENCY SCIENCE TECH & RES [SG]) [X] 9,10,12-14 * claim 51 * [Y] 1-16; | [XY]WO2014104981 (AGENCY SCIENCE TECH & RES [SG]) [X] 9,10,12-14,16 * the whole document * [Y] 1-16; | [XY] - TOKUTAKE S ET AL, "EFFICIENCY OF SECOND HARMONIC GENERATION FROM AMINO ACIDS, PEPTIDES, AND POLYPEPTIDES CARRYING POLARIZABLE AROMATIC GROUPS", MOLECULAR CRYSTALS AND LIQUID CRYSTALS(INC. NONLINEAR OPTICS ), GORDON AND BREACH SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, READING, GB, (19890501), vol. 170, pages 245 - 257, XP000068801 [X] 1,3-6,8-12,15 **see peptide Boc-LLD-OMe*; page 253, line 3 * [Y] 1-16 | [Y] - WEI JING ET AL, "Single amino acid mutation in alpha-helical peptide affect second harmonic generation hyperpolarizability", CHEMICAL PHYSICS LETTERS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, (20121127), vol. 556, doi:10.1016/J.CPLETT.2012.11.037, ISSN 0009-2614, pages 260 - 265, XP028963438 [Y] 1-16 * figure 3; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cplett.2012.11.037 | [Y] - AMIR HANDELMAN ET AL, "Nonlinear Optical Bioinspired Peptide Nanostructures", ADVANCED OPTICAL MATERIALS, DE, (20131101), vol. 1, no. 11, doi:10.1002/adom.201300282, ISSN 2195-1071, pages 875 - 884, XP055344853 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adom.201300282 | [XY] - Archana Mishra ET AL, "Influence of metal salts on the hydrogelation properties of ultrashort aliphatic peptides", RSC Advances, doi:10.1039/c3ra40598b, (20130101), page 9985, URL: http://www.rsc.org/suppdata/ra/c3/c3ra40598b/c3ra40598b.pdf, XP055432241 [X] 9,10,12-14 * the whole document * [Y] 1-16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c3ra40598b | International search | [X]WO2014104981 (AGENCY SCIENCE TECH & RES [SG]) [X] 25-27, 29-33, 36-39 * See claims 29, 41, 45, 51-55, 57, 60-64, 69, 71, 84, 92; Figure 24; page 29 lines 7-14; page 46 lines 15-22; page 71 lines 3-9 *; | [A] - LOISON C. et al., "Additive Model for the Second Harmonic Generation Hyperpolarizability Applied to a Collagen-Mimicking Peptide (Pro-Pro-Gly)10", The Journal of Physical Chemistry A, (20100000), vol. 114, no. 29, pages 7769 - 7779, XP055250870 [A] 1-39 * See whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jp100997q |