EP3168532 - CAMERA-INTEGRATED LED LIGHTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2019 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gigatera Inc. 3, Dongtansandan 6-gil Dongtan-myeon, Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 18487 / KR | [2018/20] |
Former [2017/20] | For all designated states KMW Inc. 183-6, Yeongcheon-ro Dongtan-myeon Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-813 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAE, Jang Byung (Halla 2 Cha Apt. Sanbon-dong) 418-1901 328 Beonyeong-ro Gunpo-si Gyeonggi-do 435-760 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Chan Woo (Eunhasu Shinsung Apt. Bisan-dong) 303-601 40 Daran-ro, Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-733 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Geun Young (Daewol Jugong Apt. Jeongja-dong) 814-901 35 Cheoncheon-ro 74beon-gil, Jangan-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 440-729 / KR | 04 /
SON, Byung Jin (Maetan-dong) 201 40 Maeeoul-ro 67beon-gil Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-800 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Eun Joong (Daerimdong 1 Cha Hanshin Apt.) 101-802 13 Digital-ro 69-gil Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-759 / KR | 06 /
LEE, Hyun Woo (Jugong Apt. Dunchon-dong) 306-208 1340 Yangjae-daero, Gangdong-gu Seoul 134-771 / KR | [2017/20] | Representative(s) | Scheele Jaeger Wetzel Patentanwälte Goethestraße 21 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/20] | RatnerPrestia Altheimer Eck 2 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15818351.7 | 06.07.2015 | [2017/20] | WO2015KR06925 | Priority number, date | KR20140085324 | 08.07.2014 Original published format: KR 20140085324 | [2017/20] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016006887 | Date: | 14.01.2016 | Language: | KO | [2016/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3168532 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F21V33/00, H04N5/225 | [2017/20] | CPC: |
F21V15/00 (EP,US);
F21V21/15 (US);
F21S2/005 (US);
F21V17/02 (US);
F21V21/30 (EP,US);
F21V23/002 (EP,US);
F21V23/023 (EP,US);
F21V23/06 (US);
F21V31/00 (US);
F21V33/0052 (EP,US);
F21V33/0056 (EP,US);
H04N23/00 (US);
H04N23/57 (US);
H04R1/028 (US);
F21V23/0464 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/20] | Title | German: | KAMERAINTEGRIERTE LED-BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/20] | English: | CAMERA-INTEGRATED LED LIGHTING DEVICE | [2017/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE À DEL INTÉGRÉ À UNE CAMÉRA | [2017/20] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2017 | Translation filed | 02.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 02.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/20] | 02.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2007236869 (ANDERSON JAMES A [CA], et al) [I] 1 * figure 1 *; | [IAY]EP1881261 (CHAN SZE KEUN [CN]) [I] 1 * figure 1 * [A] 4-9 [Y] 2,3; | [YA]US2010302764 (YU CHING-HUI [TW], et al) [Y] 2,3 * figures 1-5 *[A] 1; | [IA]WO2012129243 (DIGITAL LUMENS INC [US], et al) [I] 1,4 * figures 17-20,33-40,52-55 * [A] 5-9; | [IAY]US8558413 (LEPARD DONALD E [US]) [I] 1 * figures 1-3 * [A] 4-9 [Y] 2,3 | International search | [A]KR20080000299U (AUGOX COMPANY LIMITED) [A] 1-9* See paragraphs [0017]-[0023], claim 1, and figure 1. *; | [A]KR20090011780U (JOO, Ho Geol) [A] 1-9 * See paragraph [0006], claims 1-3, and figure 3. *; | [Y]KR20110030850 (TOPLED CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 1-9 * See paragraph [0035], claims 2-3, and figures 2-4. *; | [Y]KR101336724B (VISION TECH INC [KR]) [Y] 1-9 * See paragraphs [0017]-[0025], and figure 1. *; | [A]JP2013242965 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-9 * See paragraphs [0021]-[0028], claims 1, 4, and figures 2-3. * |