EP3166486 - COMBINATORIAL SENSING OF SWEAT BIOMARKERS USING POTENTIOMETRIC AND IMPEDANCE MEASUREMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Cincinnati 2900 Reading Road, Suite 460 Cincinnati, OH 45206 / US | For all designated states United States of America as Represented by the Secretary of the Air Force 2240 B Street AFMCLO/JAZ Bldg. 11, Room D18 Wright-Patterson Air Force Base OH 45433-7109 / US | [2019/43] |
Former [2017/20] | For all designated states University of Cincinnati 2624 Clifton Avenue Cincinnati, OH 45221-0623 / US | ||
For all designated states United States of America as Represented by the Secretary of the Air Force 2240 B Street AFMCLO/JAZ Bldg. 11, Room D18 Wright-Patterson Air Force Base OH 45433-7109 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONNER, Zachary, Cole 6970 Poplar Drive Ypsilanti, MI 48197 / US | 02 /
HEIKENFELD, Jason, C. 1644 Clio Avenue Cincinnati, OH 45230 / US | 03 /
HAGEN, Joshua, A. 8341 Weller Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | [2018/08] |
Former [2017/20] | 01 /
SONNER, Zachary, Cole 7473 Valleyview Place Apt. 102 Cincinnati, OH 45244 / US | ||
02 /
HEIKENFELD, Jason, C. 1644 Clio Avenue Cincinnati, OH 45230 / US | |||
03 /
HAGEN, Joshua, A. 8341 Weller Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/20] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 15819306.0 | 13.07.2015 | [2017/20] | WO2015US40113 | Priority number, date | US201462023232P | 11.07.2014 Original published format: US 201462023232 P | [2017/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016007944 | Date: | 14.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3166486 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/05, A61B5/1468, A61B5/00, // A61B5/1486, A61B5/145 | [2018/11] | CPC: |
A61B5/4266 (EP,US);
A61B10/0064 (EP,US);
A61B5/02055 (US);
A61B5/0537 (EP,US);
A61B5/14517 (EP,US);
A61B5/14539 (EP,US);
A61B5/14546 (EP,US);
A61B5/14552 (US);
A61B5/1468 (EP);
A61B5/1477 (US);
A61B5/4519 (US);
A61B5/4866 (US);
A61B5/4875 (US);
A61B5/6833 (EP,US);
A61B5/68335 (EP);
A61B5/7275 (US);
A61B2560/0252 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0214 (US);
A61B2562/0219 (US);
A61B2562/242 (US);
A61B5/01 (EP,US);
A61B5/0205 (EP,US);
A61B5/02405 (US);
A61B5/08 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/20] | A61B5/05 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/20] | Title | German: | KOMBINATORISCHE MESSUNG VON SCHWEISSBIOMARKERN MIT POTENTIOMETRISCHEN UND IMPEDANZMESSUNGEN | [2017/20] | English: | COMBINATORIAL SENSING OF SWEAT BIOMARKERS USING POTENTIOMETRIC AND IMPEDANCE MEASUREMENTS | [2017/20] | French: | DÉTECTION COMBINATOIRE DE BIOMARQUEURS DE LA SUEUR PAR DES MESURES D'IMPÉDANCE ET POTENTIOMÉTRIQUES | [2017/20] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 09.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/20] | 09.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/26] | 23.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2010179403 (MARTINSEN ORJAN GROTTEM [NO], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0012] , [0 20] , [0 24] , [0 53] - [0055] - [0 64] , [0 66] * * figure 4 * [A] 4-18; | [XI]US2013245388 (RAFFERTY CONOR [US], et al) [X] 4-6,12-14,18 * paragraphs [0005] , [ 133] , [ 141] , [ 147] , [ 182] , [ 188] , [ 212] - [0214] * * figures 3-10 * [I] 7-11,15-17; | [A]WO2013152087 (UNIV CINCINNATI [US], et al) [A] 1-18* the whole document * | International search | [Y]EP0282349 (MEDISENSE INC [US]) [Y] 17-20, 41 , 43-49 * para [0011]-[0015] *; | [Y]US2006253011 (EDMONSON PETER J [CA], et al) [Y] 11-12, 14 * para [0005], [0011], [0030], [0032], [0034] *; | [YA]US2010130843 (CACERES GALVEZ ALEJANDRO [ES], et al) [Y] 45-46 * para [0019] * [A] 3-4; | [Y]US2011208458 (PINTER ROBERT [DE], et al) [Y] 47-48 * para [0078]-[0078], [0081] *; | [XA]US2012004570 (SHIMIZU SATOE [JP], et al) [X] 1-2 * para [0045]-[0046], [0224] -[0225], [0232]-[0233] * [A] 3-4; | [Y]US2013183399 (BLOW ANDREW [GB], et al) [Y] 49* para [0060] *; | [XYA]WO2013162087 (KANG DAE KYUM [KR], et al) [X] 9-10, 15 * para [0034]-[0039] * [Y] 11-12, 14, 17-20, 41, 43-49 [A] 13, 16 |