EP3166959 - TARGETING PEPTIDES THAT BIND S. MUTANS, CONSTRUCTS COMPRISING SUCH PEPTIDES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2018 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C3 Jian, Inc. 45030 Glencoe Avenue Marina del Rey, CA 90292 / US | [2017/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ECKERT, Randal H. 30637 Ganado Dr. Rancho Palos Verdes, California 90275 / US | 02 /
KAPLAN, Christopher W. 1617 S. Beverly Glen Blvd. 106 Los Angeles, California 90024 / US | 03 /
KYME, Pierre A. 3748 W. 9th St. 103 Los Angeles, California 90019 / US | 04 /
VARNUM, Brian C. 602 12th St. Santa Monica, California 90402 / US | [2017/20] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2017/20] | Application number, filing date | 15819743.4 | 07.07.2015 | [2017/20] | WO2015US39439 | Priority number, date | US201462023678P | 11.07.2014 Original published format: US 201462023678 P | [2017/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016007551 | Date: | 14.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3166959 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/08, C07K19/00, A61K38/10, A61K47/50, G01N33/569, G01N33/58, A61P31/00 | [2017/20] | CPC: |
C07K7/08 (EP,US);
A61K38/10 (EP,US);
A61K41/0057 (EP,US);
A61K47/64 (EP,US);
A61K8/64 (EP,US);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
A61Q17/005 (EP,US);
C07K14/315 (EP,US);
C07K7/06 (EP,US);
G01N33/56911 (EP,US);
A61K2800/81 (EP,US);
C07K2319/33 (EP,US);
G01N2333/315 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/20] | Title | German: | TARGETING VON S. MUTANS-BINDENDEN PEPTIDEN, KONSTRUKTE MIT SOLCHEN PEPTIDEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2017/20] | English: | TARGETING PEPTIDES THAT BIND S. MUTANS, CONSTRUCTS COMPRISING SUCH PEPTIDES AND USES THEREOF | [2017/20] | French: | PEPTIDES DE CIBLAGE QUI LIENT S. MUTANS, CONSTRUCTIONS COMPRENANT LESDITS PEPTIDES ET UTILISATIONS CORRESPONDANTES | [2017/20] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 02.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/20] | 02.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/01] | 17.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007178054 (SRINIVASA MADHYASTHA [CA], et al) [X] 1-4,11,12 * p. 3, paragraph [0056] - p. 6, paragraph [0077], claims 1-42 * [I] 5-10,13-15; | [XI]US2010202983 (JERNBERG GARY R [US]) [X] 1,4-9,11-14 * p. 2, paragraph [0024] - p. 5, paragraph [0066] * [I] 2,3,10,15; | [XI]US2010316643 (ECKERT RANDAL H [US], et al) [X] 1,4-9,11-15 * p. 6, paragraph [0057] - p. 44, paragraph [0153], Table 10 *[I] 2,3,10; | [XI]US8680058 (ECKERT RANDAL H [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-9,11-15 * col. 4, line 63 - col. 40, line 27 * [I] 3,10; | [XI] - ECKERT RANDAL ET AL, "Targeted killing of Streptococcus mutans by a pheromone-guided "smart" antimicrobial peptide", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, (20061101), vol. 50, no. 11, doi:10.1128/AAC.00622-06, ISSN 0066-4804, pages 3651 - 3657, XP002570505 [X] 1,2,4-9,11-15 * the whole document * [I] 3,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/aac.00622-06 | International search | [A]US2004105824 (GOODMAN STEVEN D [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 38, 67-72* See the whole document. *; | [A]US2012308638 (UPTON MATHEW [GB], et al) [A] 1-4, 38, 67-72 * See the whole document. *; | [X]US8680058 (ECKERT RANDAL H [US], et al) [X] 1-4, 38, 67-72 * See columns 6-9 and 19-38; and Tables 1, 7. *; | [A] - ECKERT et al., "Targeted killing of Streptococcus mutans by a pheromone-guided ''smart'' antimicrobial peptide", Antimicrobial Agents and Chemotherapy, (20060000), vol. 50, no. 11, doi:doi:10.1128/aac.00622-06, pages 3651 - 3657, XP 002570505 [A] 1-4, 38, 67-72 * See pages 3651-3652; and Table 1. * | [A] - DING et al., "Antimicrobial and anti-biofilm effect of Bac8c on major bacteria associated with dental caries and Streptococcus mutans biofilms", Peptides, vol. 52, (20131203), pages 61 - 67, XP028624021 [A] 1-4, 38, 67-72 * See the whole document. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.peptides.2013.11.020 |