EP3235357 - FEED-THROUGH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hans-Erik Johansson I Hagstad Aktiebolag Läroverksgatan 42 335 42 Gnosjö / SE | [2017/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHANSSON, Hans-Erik Läroverksgatan 42 335 42 Gnosjö / SE | [2017/43] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [2023/23] |
Former [2017/43] | Awapatent AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 15819808.5 | 17.12.2015 | [2017/43] | WO2015EP80208 | Priority number, date | SE20140051594 | 19.12.2014 Original published format: SE 1451594 | SE20150050044 | 20.01.2015 Original published format: SE 1550044 | [2017/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016097137 | Date: | 23.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3235357 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3235357 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H05K9/00 | [2017/43] | CPC: |
H05K9/0018 (EP,US);
H05K9/0098 (US);
H05K9/0007 (US);
H05K9/0049 (US);
H05K9/0081 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DURCHFÜHRUNG | [2017/43] | English: | FEED-THROUGH | [2017/43] | French: | TRAVERSÉE | [2017/43] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/43] | 27.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M06) [2020/20] | 14.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US3830954 (CAUDILL H) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,9,14,16,20,22 * column 1, lines 14-18 * * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 40; figures 1-5 * [Y] 3,4,10-13,15,17-19,21 [I] 7; | [XI]DE3711937 (SVT BRANDSCHUTZ VERTRIEBSGMBH) [X] 1,2,5-8,10,14,17,18,20,22 * column 3, lines 25-49 * * column 4, lines 25-60; figure 1 * [I] 3,4,9,11-13,15,16,19,21; | [XY]EP0293042 (PIDOU BV [NL]) [X] 1,2,5-8,10,16,19,20,22 * column 1, lines 1-4 * * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 24; figures 5-7 * [Y] 3,4,9,11-15,17,18,21; | [XY]WO9945619 (BEELE ENG BV [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,5-9,14,19,20,22 * page 5, line 24 - page 5, line 8; figures 1-3 * [Y] 3,4,10-13,15-18,21; | [Y]US6713672 (STICKNEY WILLIAM [US]) [Y] 3,4,9-19,21 * column 3, lines 15-22 * * column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 63 * * column 8, lines 45-49; figures 1-17 *; | [A]US2009129042 (VITT DAVID P [US], et al) [A] 1-22* the whole document * | Examination | EP0358251 | US6713672 | US2009129042 | US2010154325 | CN201590084U | by applicant | US7793415 |